Corona v. Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Luis Cairo Alonso Corona
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 5:2022cv07032
Filed: November 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416 Denial of Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2023 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT by US Marshall's. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2023)
December 7, 2022 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Luis Cairo Alonso Corona.. (Benavides, Francesco) (Filed on 12/7/2022)
December 7, 2022 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Luis Cairo Alonso Corona. Service waived by Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security waiver sent on 11/22/2022, answer due 1/23/2023. (Benavides, Francesco) (Filed on 12/7/2022)
November 22, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 USM285)(anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2022)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER IFP Application and Screening Complaint; ORDERING Service on Defendant. Re: ECF #3 . Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2022)
November 14, 2022 Filing 5 SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER: (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2022)
November 14, 2022 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/28/2022. (jrs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2022)
November 10, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Luis Cairo Alonso Corona. (Benavides, Francesco) (Filed on 11/10/2022)
November 10, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Benavides, Francesco) (Filed on 11/10/2022)
November 10, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security. Filed by Luis Cairo Alonso Corona. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Benavides, Francesco) (Filed on 11/10/2022) Modified on 11/14/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corona v. Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Cairo Alonso Corona
Represented By: Francesco Paulo Benavides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?