Chaparro v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Robert Chaparro
Defendant: United States of America and U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs
Case Number: 5:2022cv07153
Filed: November 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Edward J Davila
2 Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Robert Chaparro (Karlin, Marc) (Filed on 1/6/2023)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 2/16/2023 at 10:00 AM in-person, in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Show Cause Response due by 2/3/2023. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/6/2023. (crr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2023)
January 4, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE by Robert Chaparro Notice of Settlement (Karlin, Marc) (Filed on 1/4/2023)
January 4, 2023 Filing 11 CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/30/2023 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/17/2023. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (crr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2023)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 1/3/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2023)
January 3, 2023 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2023)
December 15, 2022 Filing 8 2ND CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff(s) shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 12/29/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2022)
November 30, 2022 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff(s) shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 12/14/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. Th ere is no document associated with this entry.) (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2022)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to case. (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2022)
November 15, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs, United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2022)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 11/15/2022. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2022)
November 15, 2022 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/8/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/15/2023 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2022)
November 15, 2022 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/29/2022. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2022)
November 15, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17726938.). Filed byRobert Chaparro. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Karlin, Marc) (Filed on 11/15/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chaparro v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Chaparro
Represented By: Marc Alan Karlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?