Webb v. Rejoice Delivers LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ian Webb
Defendant: Rejoice Delivers LLC, Amazon Logistics, Inc. and Amazon.com Services, LLC
Case Number: 5:2022cv07221
Filed: November 16, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Petition for Removal- Account Receivable
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING MOTION HEARING as to #21 MOTION to Compel Individual Arbitration, Dismiss Class Claims, and Dismiss or Stay Action. Motion Hearing set for 5/25/2023 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 1, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2023)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 EXHIBIT A re #21 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Compel Individual Arbitration, Dismiss Class Claims, and Dismiss or Stay Action filed by Rejoice Delivers LLC. (Related document(s) #21 ) (Johnson, Timothy) (Filed on 1/6/2023) Modified on 1/9/2023 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Joinder re #21 MOTION to Compel Individual Arbitration, Dismiss Class Claims, and Dismiss or Stay Action by Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com Services, LLC. (Fahy, Brian) (Filed on 1/6/2023)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION to Compel Individual Arbitration, Dismiss Class Claims, and Dismiss or Stay Action filed by Rejoice Delivers LLC. Responses due by 1/20/2023. Replies due by 1/27/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexis Cantwell-Badyna in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 to Cantwell-Badyna Decl., #3 Declaration of Kevin Hom in Support, #4 Exhibit 1 to Hom Decl., #5 Exhibit 2 to Hom Decl., #6 Exhibit 3 to Hom Decl., #7 Request for Judicial Notice, #8 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Timothy) (Filed on 1/6/2023)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING #18 JOINT STIPULATION REQUESTING THAT THE COURT CONTINUE SCHEDULED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, THE DEADLINE TO FILE JOINT CMC STATEMENT, AND DEADLINE FOR AMAZON TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT. Case Management Statement due by 5/18/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/25/2023 11:00 AM in San Jose, Videoconference Only. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/22/2022. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2022)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING #17 JOINT ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/22/2022. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2022)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE filed by Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com Services, LLC, Rejoice Delivers LLC and Ian Webb. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fahy, Brian) (Filed on 12/21/2022) Modified on 12/22/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF).
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Joint ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Increase the Page Limits filed by Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com Services, LLC, Rejoice Delivers LLC and Ian Webb. Responses due by 12/27/2022. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Joint Stipulation, #2 Proposed Order)(Fahy, Brian) (Filed on 12/21/2022) Modified on 12/22/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF).
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Certificate of Interested Entities by Ian Webb (Beall, Lawrence) (Filed on 12/8/2022)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AFTER REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Statement due by 2/23/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/2/2023 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 1, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2022)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 11/29/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2022)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2022)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Rejoice Delivers LLC.. (Johnson, Timothy) (Filed on 11/28/2022)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE RE: Consent or Declination. Defendants are requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 12/12/2022. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2022)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Joint Stipulation to Extend Amazon's Deadline to Respond to the Complaint Pursuant to Local Rule 6-1 filed by Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com Services, LLC and Ian Webb. (Zenewicz, Sarah) (Filed on 11/23/2022) Modified on 11/25/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Nikolas T Djordjevski (Djordjevski, Nikolas) (Filed on 11/23/2022)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ian Webb.. (Beall, Lawrence) (Filed on 11/23/2022)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Yousaf Muniz Jafri (Jafri, Yousaf) (Filed on 11/22/2022)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Lloyd Johnson (Johnson, Timothy) (Filed on 11/22/2022)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 2/8/2023 . Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/15/2023 10:00 AM. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2022)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/2/2022. (jrs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2022)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet by Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com Services, LLC . (Zenewicz, Sarah) (Filed on 11/17/2022)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order #Electronic filing error. No Civil Cover Sheet for USDC found. Please submit Civil Cover sheet. Re: #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Amazon.com Services, LLC, Amazon Logistics , Inc. (jrs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2022)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Amazon.com, Inc. for Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com Services, LLC. (Zenewicz, Sarah) (Filed on 11/16/2022)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL - CLASS ACTION Complaint with Jury Demand from Santa Clara Superior Court. Their case number is 22CV401850. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-17734621) filed by Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit D to Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit E to Notice of Removal, #6 Exhibit F to Notice of Removal, #7 Declaration of Peter Nickerson in Support of the Amazon Defendants' Notice of Removal, #8 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Zenewicz, Sarah) (Filed on 11/16/2022) Modified on 11/21/2022 (kkp, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Webb v. Rejoice Delivers LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ian Webb
Represented By: Douglas Han
Represented By: Lawrence Walter Beall
Represented By: Shunt Tatavos-Gharajeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rejoice Delivers LLC
Represented By: Timothy Lloyd Johnson
Represented By: Nikolas T Djordjevski
Represented By: Yousaf Muniz Jafri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah L. Zenewicz
Represented By: Max C. Fischer
Represented By: Brian David Fahy
Represented By: Brian D. Fahy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Services, LLC
Represented By: Sarah L. Zenewicz
Represented By: Brian D. Fahy
Represented By: Max C. Fischer
Represented By: Brian David Fahy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?