Moreno v. Macomber
Plaintiff: Jose Moreno
Defendant: Jeff Macomber, Guillermo Viera Rosa, Cory Alvarez, Paul Baltazar and Anthony Gutierrez
Case Number: 5:2023cv00407
Filed: January 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of CDCR Report of E-Service Waiver Received. This document is restricted to court users only; no NEF has been issued, and the document is not available electronically. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
March 14, 2023 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 3/28/2023. (amk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
March 10, 2023 Copies of #9 Order Setting Hearing Date, #7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support emailed to CDCR and DOJ. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2023)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Setting Hearing Date and Briefing Schedule. Motion Hearing as to Dkt. No. #7 set for 6/13/2023 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Responses due by 5/19/2023. Replies due by 5/26/2023. Signed by Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 3/9/2023. (vkdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
February 27, 2023 Service packet emailed CDCR and DOJ. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2023)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Screening Complaint; and Ordering Service. (vkdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
February 16, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Jose Moreno. Responses due by 3/2/2023. Replies due by 3/9/2023. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Envelope)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2023)
February 13, 2023 Filing 6 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Damages; Demand for Jury Trial against Jeff Macomber (Filing fee IFPP) Filed by Jose Moreno. Consent/Declination due by 2/10/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-3, #2 Exhibit 4-13, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2023)
January 27, 2023 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/25/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/2/2023 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2023) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
January 27, 2023 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jose Moreno re #1 Complaint. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2023)
January 27, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jose Moreno. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2023)
January 27, 2023 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support of #1 Complaint, filed by Jose Moreno. (Related document(s) #1 ) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2023)
January 27, 2023 Filing 1 ***DISREGARD - SEE ECF 6 FOR CORRECTION*** COMPLAINT for Declaratory Damages; Demand for Jury Trial against Jeff Macomber (Filing fee IFPP). Filed by Jose Moreno. Consent/Declination due by 2/10/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-7, #2 Exhibits 8-13, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2023) Modified on 2/13/2023 (sp, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moreno v. Macomber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Moreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Macomber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guillermo Viera Rosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cory Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Baltazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?