Rico v. Secretary of CDCR et al
Plaintiff: Jorge Andrade Rico
Defendant: Secretary of CDCR, H. Mosley, R. Bell, B. Diaz, E. Gonzales and M. Vaugh
Case Number: 5:2023cv02122
Filed: May 1, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: PSLC JNE
Referring Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2023 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jorge Andrade Rico. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2023)
May 10, 2023 Filing 5 Prison Trust Fund Account Statement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jrs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2023)
May 3, 2023 Filing 4 Prison Trust Fund Account Statement by Jorge Andrade Rico. (jrs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2023)
May 2, 2023 Clerks Notice mailed to Pro-Se party. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2023)
May 1, 2023 Filing 3 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
May 1, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jorge Andrade Rico, CDCR # AI3815.The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is directed to submit within 72 hours and in PDF form a certified Prison Trust Account statement for the plaintiff, reflecting the last six months activity, to cdcrfilings@cand.uscourts.gov. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2023)
May 1, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against R. Bell, B. Diaz, E. Gonzales, H. Mosley, Secretary of CDCR, M. Vaugh. Filed by Jorge Andrade Rico. Consent/Declination due by 5/31/2023. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2023)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rico v. Secretary of CDCR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Andrade Rico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of CDCR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Mosley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Vaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?