Green v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Lisa Marie Green
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi and SSA (INTERESTED PARTY / NEF)
Case Number: 5:2023cv04477
Filed: August 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: P Casey Pitts
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2023 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kilolo Kijakazi.. (Marriott, Michael) (Filed on 10/2/2023)
August 31, 2023 Filing 3 SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2023)
August 30, 2023 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge P. Casey Pitts. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/13/2023. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2023)
August 30, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18598845.). Filed byLisa Marie Green. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Benavides, Francesco) (Filed on 8/30/2023)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Marie Green
Represented By: Francesco Paulo Benavides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Michael Kramer Marriott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSA (INTERESTED PARTY / NEF)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?