Elliott v. Future Motion, Inc.
Plaintiff: Schuyler Elliott
Defendant: Future Motion, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2023cv06426
Filed: December 14, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 3:23-cv-00789. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order MEMBER CASE OPENED MDL 3087: Florida Middle, 3:23-cv-00789, Elliott v. Future Motion, Inc., Opened in California Northern District as 5:23-cv-06426-BLF pursuant to Transfer Order cc: JPMDL (krp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2023)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER: In light of the parties' Joint Response to Court Order #16 , the parties shall file an updated status report on or before December 14, 2023. The requirement to file a case management report is suspended. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 10/31/2023. (AMP)
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Joint RESPONSE re 15 Order on Motion to Stay filed by Schuyler Elliott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Goldrosen, Eitan) Modified on 10/31/2023 (SPM).
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER: #14 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Stay is GRANTED. The deadlines in this case are suspended. If this case has not been transferred by October 27, 2023, the parties shall file an amended case management report no later than November 14, 2023. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 9/12/2023. (AMP)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Transfer and Coordination Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by Future Motion, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Motion to Transfer to MDL)(Holt, Michael)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. (JDR)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Mediator selection due by 11/5/203; Discovery due by 2/9/2024; Dispositive motions due by 2/20/2024; Conduct mediation hearing by 4/5/2024; Pretrial statement due by 7/17/2024; Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/24/2024 at 10:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 12 C before Judge Brian J. Davis; Jury Trial set for trial term commencing on 8/5/2024 at 9:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 12 C before Judge Brian J. Davis. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 8/21/2023. (Attachments: #1 Mediation Report Form, #2 Docket Sheets)(AMP)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Goldrosen, Eitan)
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Eitan Goldrosen on behalf of Schuyler Elliott (Goldrosen, Eitan)
July 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Schuyler Elliott. (Goldrosen, Eitan)
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CKS)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 COMPLAINT against Future Motion, Inc. with Jury Demand filed by Schuyler Elliott. (Filed in state court 5/24/23.)(LNR)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Future Motion, Inc.. Related case(s): Yes (Holt, Michael)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Future Motion, Inc.. (Holt, Michael)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Future Motion, Inc..(Holt, Michael)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Michael R. Holt on behalf of Future Motion, Inc.. Lead Counsel: Michael R. Holt. (Holt, Michael)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Brian J. Davis and Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert. New case number: 3:23-cv-789-BJD-LLL. (AET)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from the 4th Judicial Circuit, Duval County, case number 2023-CA-008890 filed in State Court on 5/24/2023. Filing fee $402, receipt number AFLMDC-21021762 filed by Future Motion, Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT Exhibit A, #2 State Court Docket Sheet Exhibit B, #3 State Court Other Documents Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C - Discovery Responses, #5 Exhibit D - Proposal for Settlement, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Holt, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elliott v. Future Motion, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Schuyler Elliott
Represented By: Eitan Goldrosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Future Motion, Inc.
Represented By: Michael R. Holt
Represented By: Ligianette Cordova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?