Tonneyck et al v. ChargePoint Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Reony Tonneyck, Robert Hann and Ronald Hinton
Defendant: ChargePoint Holdings, Inc., Roxanne Bowman, Elaine L. Chao, Bruce Chizen, Axel Harries, Jeffrey Harris, Susan Heystee, Rex S. Jackson, Mark Leschly, Michael Linse, Pasquale Romano, Ekta Singh-Bushell, G. Richard Wagoner, Jr. and Rick Wilmer
Case Number: 5:2024cv02619
Filed: May 2, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: P Casey Pitts
Referring Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2024 Filing 30 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/8/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/22/2024 at 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (nmc, COURT USER) (Filed on 6/20/2024)
June 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge P. Casey Pitts for all further proceedings. Judge William Alsup no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 6/13/2024. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2024)
June 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER RELATING CASE as to 5:23-cv-06172-PCP. Signed by Judge P. Casey Pitts on 6/12/2024. (nmc, COURT USER) (Filed on 6/12/2024)
June 6, 2024 Filing 27 NOTICE by Robert Hann, Ronald Hinton, Reony Tonneyck (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related)(Fortunato, Melissa) (Filed on 6/6/2024)
May 24, 2024 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Robert Hann, Reony Tonneyck, Ronald Hinton. Service waived by Rick Wilmer waiver sent on 5/22/2024, answer due 7/22/2024. (Fortunato, Melissa) (Filed on 5/24/2024)
May 24, 2024 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Robert Hann, Reony Tonneyck, Ronald Hinton. Service waived by G. Richard Wagoner, Jr waiver sent on 5/22/2024, answer due 7/22/2024. (Fortunato, Melissa) (Filed on 5/24/2024)
May 24, 2024 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Robert Hann, Reony Tonneyck, Ronald Hinton. Service waived by Pasquale Romano waiver sent on 5/22/2024, answer due 7/22/2024. (Fortunato, Melissa) (Filed on 5/24/2024)
May 24, 2024 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Robert Hann, Reony Tonneyck, Ronald Hinton. Service waived by Michael Linse waiver sent on 5/22/2024, answer due 7/22/2024. (Fortunato, Melissa) (Filed on 5/24/2024)
May 24, 2024 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Robert Hann, Reony Tonneyck, Ronald Hinton. Service waived by Mark Leschly waiver sent on 5/22/2024, answer due 7/22/2024. (Fortunato, Melissa) (Filed on 5/24/2024)
May 24, 2024 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Robert Hann, Reony Tonneyck, Ronald Hinton. Service waived by Rex S. Jackson waiver sent on 5/22/2024, answer due 7/22/2024. (Fortunato, Melissa) (Filed on 5/24/2024)
May 24, 2024 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Robert Hann, Reony Tonneyck, Ronald Hinton. Service waived by Susan Heystee waiver sent on 5/22/2024, answer due 7/22/2024. (Fortunato, Melissa) (Filed on 5/24/2024)
May 24, 2024 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Robert Hann, Reony Tonneyck, Ronald Hinton. Service waived by Jeffrey Harris waiver sent on 5/22/2024, answer due 7/22/2024. (Fortunato, Melissa) (Filed on 5/24/2024)
May 24, 2024 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Robert Hann, Reony Tonneyck, Ronald Hinton. Service waived by Axel Harries waiver sent on 5/22/2024, answer due 7/22/2024. (Fortunato, Melissa) (Filed on 5/24/2024)
May 24, 2024 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Robert Hann, Reony Tonneyck, Ronald Hinton. Service waived by Bruce Chizen waiver sent on 5/22/2024, answer due 7/22/2024. (Fortunato, Melissa) (Filed on 5/24/2024)
May 24, 2024 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Robert Hann, Reony Tonneyck, Ronald Hinton. Service waived by ChargePoint Holdings, Inc. waiver sent on 5/22/2024, answer due 7/22/2024. (Fortunato, Melissa) (Filed on 5/24/2024)
May 24, 2024 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Robert Hann, Reony Tonneyck, Ronald Hinton. Service waived by Elaine L. Chao waiver sent on 5/22/2024, answer due 7/22/2024. (Fortunato, Melissa) (Filed on 5/24/2024)
May 24, 2024 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Robert Hann, Reony Tonneyck, Ronald Hinton. Service waived by Ekta Singh-Bushell waiver sent on 5/22/2024, answer due 7/22/2024. (Fortunato, Melissa) (Filed on 5/24/2024)
May 24, 2024 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Robert Hann, Reony Tonneyck, Ronald Hinton. Service waived by Roxanne Bowman waiver sent on 5/22/2024, answer due 7/22/2024. (Fortunato, Melissa) (Filed on 5/24/2024)
May 22, 2024 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON REASSIGNMENT: Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/15/2024 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/8/2024. Parties may download Judge Alsup's standing orders from the Court's webpage: https://cand.uscourts.gov/judges/alsup-william-wha/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2024)
May 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William Alsup for all further proceedings. Judge Charles R. Breyer no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 5/22/24. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2024)
May 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/21/2024. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2024)
May 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by The Clerk on 5/17/2024. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(wsm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2024)
May 16, 2024 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2024)
May 15, 2024 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Robert Hann, Ronald Hinton, Reony Tonneyck.. (Fortunato, Melissa) (Filed on 5/15/2024)
May 2, 2024 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Roxanne Bowman, Elaine L. Chao, ChargePoint Holdings, Inc., Bruce Chizen, Axel Harries, Jeffrey Harris, Susan Heystee, Rex S. Jackson, Mark Leschly, Michael Linse, Pasquale Romano, Ekta Singh-Bushell, G. Richard Wagoner, Jr, Rick Wilmer. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2024)
May 2, 2024 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/24/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2024 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2024)
May 2, 2024 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/16/2024. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2024)
May 2, 2024 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Robert Hann, Ronald Hinton, Reony Tonneyck (Fortunato, Melissa) (Filed on 5/2/2024)
May 2, 2024 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Fortunato, Melissa) (Filed on 5/2/2024)
May 2, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19377838.). Filed by Robert Hann, Reony Tonneyck, Ronald Hinton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fortunato, Melissa) (Filed on 5/2/2024)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tonneyck et al v. ChargePoint Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reony Tonneyck
Represented By: Melissa Ann Fortunato
Represented By: Marion Curry Passmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Hann
Represented By: Melissa Ann Fortunato
Represented By: Marion Curry Passmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Hinton
Represented By: Melissa Ann Fortunato
Represented By: Marion Curry Passmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ChargePoint Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roxanne Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elaine L. Chao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Chizen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Axel Harries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Heystee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rex S. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Leschly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Linse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pasquale Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ekta Singh-Bushell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Richard Wagoner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Wilmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?