Shugars et al v. Walmart Inc.
Plaintiff: Crystal Shugars and Niccole Le'Roy
Defendant: Walmart Inc. doing business as Spark Driver formerly known as Delivery Drivers, Inc., and Delivery Drivers, Inc.,
Case Number: 5:2024cv02765
Filed: May 8, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING #23 STIPULATION FOR REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/5/24. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2024)
July 3, 2024 Filing 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration / Stipulation and Proposed Order Granting Leave to Exceed Page Limit filed by Walmart Inc.. (Voelz, Scott) (Filed on 7/3/2024)
July 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO COMPLY WITH STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/1/24. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2024)
June 28, 2024 Filing 21 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration ) filed byNiccole Le'Roy, Crystal Shugars. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 6/28/2024)
June 25, 2024 Filing 20 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 1/30/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/6/2025 11:00 AM before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2024)
June 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING #18 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/24/24. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2024)
June 24, 2024 Filing 18 JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND EARLY CASE DEADLINES AND CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Walmart Inc.. (Voelz, Scott) (Filed on 6/24/2024)
June 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING #16 STIPULATION TO EXTEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/14/24. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2024)
June 14, 2024 Filing 16 JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE; AND [PROPOSED] ORDER re #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Niccole Le'Roy, Crystal Shugars. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 6/14/2024)
May 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING WITH MODIFICATIONS #13 STIPULATION REGARDING BRIEFING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/28/24. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2024)
May 28, 2024 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING MOTION HEARING and CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AFTER REASSIGNMENT. Motion Hearing as to #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration reset for 10/10/2024 09:00 AM and Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/10/2024 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 1, 5th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 10/3/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2024)
May 28, 2024 Filing 13 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Briefing Schedule filed by Niccole Le'Roy, Crystal Shugars. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 5/28/2024)
May 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to case, except for discovery purposes. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(smc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2024)
May 24, 2024 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2024)
May 24, 2024 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Niccole Le'Roy, Crystal Shugars.. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 5/24/2024)
May 22, 2024 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Walmart Inc... (Voelz, Scott) (Filed on 5/22/2024)
May 15, 2024 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE RE: Consent or Declination. All parties are requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 5/22/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2024)
May 15, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Walmart Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/19/2024 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Responses due by 5/29/2024. Replies due by 6/5/2024. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ashley OBrien, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Declaration of Alonzo Cardenas, #8 Exhibit A, #9 Exhibit B, #10 Exhibit C, #11 Exhibit D, #12 Exhibit E, #13 Exhibit F, #14 Declaration of Scott Voelz, #15 Exhibit A, #16 Proposed Order)(Voelz, Scott) (Filed on 5/15/2024)
May 9, 2024 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 7/31/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/7/2024 10:00 AM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only. (sec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2024)
May 9, 2024 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/23/2024. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2024)
May 8, 2024 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Walmart Inc. re #3 Certificate of Interested Entities, #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, #1 Notice of Removal, (Voelz, Scott) (Filed on 5/8/2024)
May 8, 2024 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walmart Inc. (Voelz, Scott) (Filed on 5/8/2024)
May 8, 2024 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Walmart Inc. (Voelz, Scott) (Filed on 5/8/2024)
May 8, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Santa Clara County Superior Court. Their case number is 24cv432278. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-19397898). Filed by Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Voelz, Scott) (Filed on 5/8/2024)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shugars et al v. Walmart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc. doing business as Spark Driver formerly known as Delivery Drivers, Inc.,
Represented By: Scott Michael Voelz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delivery Drivers, Inc.,
Represented By: Scott Michael Voelz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Shugars
Represented By: Shannon Liss-Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Niccole Le'Roy
Represented By: Shannon Liss-Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?