Ortiz v. Diaz et al
Plaintiff: Francisco Ortiz
Defendant: Ralph Diaz, Ron Davis, Ron Broomfield, A. Pachynski and Dean Borders
Case Number: 5:2024cv03082
Filed: May 22, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Referring Judge: PSLC HHL
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2024 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Francisco Ortiz. (kmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2024)
June 3, 2024 Filing 6 COMPLAINT (SIGNED) against Dean Borders, Ron Broomfield, Ron Davis, Ralph Diaz, A. Pachynski Filed by Francisco Ortiz. (kmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2024)
May 23, 2024 Filing 5 Prison Trust Fund Account Statement from CDCR Re #2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. (kmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2024)
May 22, 2024 Filing 4 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (kmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served the Notice of Assignment and copy of docket sheet by email to m_SQP.Filngs@cdcr.ca.gov
May 22, 2024 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE Signed Complaint on Form due by 7/1/2024. (kmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by email to m_SQP.Filngs@cdcr.ca.gov Modified on 5/23/2024 (ljf, COURT STAFF).
May 22, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Francisco Ortiz, CDCR # F06109.The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is directed to submit within 72 hours and in PDF form a certified Prison Trust Account statement for the plaintiff, reflecting the last six months activity, to cdcrfilings@cand.uscourts.gov. (kmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2024)
May 22, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (UNSIGNED) against Ralph Diaz, Dean Borders, Ron Broomfield, Ron Davis, A. Pachynski Filed by Francisco Ortiz. Consent/Declination due by 6/21/2024. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2024) Modified on 5/23/2024 (ljf, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortiz v. Diaz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Broomfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Pachynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Borders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?