Khankin v. CSL Behring, L.L.C.
Plaintiff: ELIYAHU KHANKIN
Defendant: CSL Behring, L.L.C.
Case Number: 5:2024cv04030
Filed: July 3, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2024 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MOTION TO DISMISS HEARING. The Motion to Dismiss #7 Hearing set for 8/20/2024 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor is VACATED; the Court will reset the hearing if necessary. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2024)
August 6, 2024 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING 10/1/24 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/1/2024 is continued to 10/8/2024 09:30 AM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Case Management Statement due by 10/1/2024. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/svk General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2024)
July 31, 2024 Filing 11 REPLY in Support (re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint) filed by CSL Behring, L.L.C.. (Darouian, Nima) (Filed on 7/31/2024)
July 24, 2024 Filing 10 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint ) PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed byEliyahu Khankin. (Ilg, Stephen) (Filed on 7/24/2024)
July 17, 2024 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Entities by Eliyahu Khankin (Ilg, Stephen) (Filed on 7/17/2024)
July 17, 2024 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Eliyahu Khankin.. (Wilberton, Sydney) (Filed on 7/17/2024)
July 10, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by CSL Behring, L.L.C.. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 8/20/2024 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. Responses due by 7/24/2024. Replies due by 7/31/2024. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint)(Darouian, Nima) (Filed on 7/10/2024)
July 10, 2024 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by CSL Behring, L.L.C... (Darouian, Nima) (Filed on 7/10/2024)
July 9, 2024 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/24/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/1/2024 at 09:30 AM in San Jose, via Videoconference Only. This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2024)
July 3, 2024 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/17/2024. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2024)
July 3, 2024 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CSL Behring, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent CL Limited for CSL Behring, L.L.C. re #1 Notice of Removal (Darouian, Nima) (Filed on 7/3/2024) Modified on 7/9/2024 (slh, COURT STAFF).
July 3, 2024 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by CSL Behring, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent CSL Limited for CSL Behring, L.L.C. re #1 Notice of Removal (Darouian, Nima) (Filed on 7/3/2024) Modified on 7/9/2024 (slh, COURT STAFF).
July 3, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from California Superior Court, Santa Clara County. Their case number is 24CV440236. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-19584562). Filed by CSL Behring, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Nima Darouian, #3 Declaration of Jesus Motilla)(Darouian, Nima) (Filed on 7/3/2024) Modified on 7/9/2024 (slh, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Khankin v. CSL Behring, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIYAHU KHANKIN
Represented By: Sydney Wilberton
Represented By: Stephen Noel Ilg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSL Behring, L.L.C.
Represented By: Nalee Xiong
Represented By: Nima Darouian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?