Poslof v. Arce et al
Plaintiff: Lonnie Lee Poslof, Jr.
Defendant: R. Gamboa, J. Ortega, Angelo, Howard Moseley, R. Mojica, J. Gonzalez, Fonseca, Warden Charles Schuyler, R. Parin, M. Meyer, Hector Mora, Trent Allen, Angel, E. Borla, Jose Ruiz, Carlos Arce, S. Sawyer, J. San Juan, F. Vaquez, LVN Miranda, Dr. Coffey, CEO Langevin, R. Castillo, Lupe Lopez and Global Tel*Link Corporations doing business as Viapath
Case Number: 5:2024cv06004
Filed: August 26, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: PSLC MBI
Referring Judge: P Casey Pitts
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2024 Filing 26 REQUEST to Receive Back Copy of Every Document Plaintiff has Filed by Lonnie Lee Poslof, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2024)
October 1, 2024 Filing 25 Letter from Lonnie Lee Poslof, Jr.. regarding copy of exhibits. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2024)
October 1, 2024 Filing 24 MOTION for contempt for violation of TRO and Preliminary filed by Lonnie Lee Poslof, Jr. Responses due by 10/29/2024. Replies due by 11/12/2024. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2024)
October 1, 2024 Filing 23 MOTION for Order to Show Cause why Carlos Arce, S Tomlinson, et.al. should not be held in contempt. filed by Lonnie Lee Poslof, Jr. Responses due by 10/29/2024. Replies due by 11/12/2024. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2024)
October 1, 2024 Remark - mailed request for Copies of Documents to plaintiff. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2024)
September 30, 2024 Filing 22 MOTION for defendants response to TRO re #14 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Plaintiff's Motion TRO Ruling on his TRO filed by Lonnie Lee Poslof, Jr. Responses due by 10/28/2024. Replies due by 11/12/2024. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2024)
September 25, 2024 Filing 21 MOTION to Expedite filed by Lonnie Lee Poslof, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2024)
September 19, 2024 Filing 20 MOTION For Evidence Rule 201(e) Hearing on matter of judicial notice, MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Exhibits. filed by Lonnie Lee Poslof, Jr. Responses due by 10/17/2024. Replies due by 10/31/2024. (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2024)
September 16, 2024 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE to dispense with notice by Lonnie Lee Poslof, Jr re #14 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2024)
September 16, 2024 Filing 18 Letter dated 9/11/24 from Lonnie Lee Poslof, Jr.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2024)
September 16, 2024 Filing 17 MOTION for an order to enjoin interference with his first amendment rights filed by Lonnie Lee Poslof, Jr. Responses due by 10/15/2024. Replies due by 10/29/2024. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2024)
September 16, 2024 Filing 16 REQUEST for copies by Lonnie Lee Poslof, Jr. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2024)
September 16, 2024 Filing 15 Request for Judicial Notice filed byLonnie Lee Poslof, Jr. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2024)
September 16, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Lonnie Lee Poslof, Jr. Responses due by 10/15/2024. Replies due by 10/29/2024. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2024)
September 13, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint re #1 Complaint, MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Lonnie Lee Poslof, Jr. Responses due by 10/11/2024. Replies due by 10/25/2024. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2024)
September 13, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to Amend #1 Complaint to Add Defendants Dr. Mendez and S. Tomlinson All Other Defendants Remain and All Claims are the Same filed by Lonnie Lee Poslof, Jr. Responses due by 10/11/2024. Replies due by 10/25/2024. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2024)
September 13, 2024 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Relief filed byLonnie Lee Poslof, Jr. (Related document(s) #6 ) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2024)
September 12, 2024 Filing 10 Letter from Lonnie Lee Poslof, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2024)
September 10, 2024 Filing 9 EXHIBITS in Support of #1 Complaint, filed by Lonnie Lee Poslof, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits Part 2, #2 Exhibits Part 3, #3 Envelope)(Related document(s) #1 ) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2024)
September 10, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION to Lodge Exhibits in Support of Civil Rights Complaint, and for Return of Originals Due to Special Circumstances filed by Lonnie Lee Poslof, Jr. Responses due by 10/8/2024. Replies due by 10/22/2024. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2024)
September 10, 2024 Filing 7 Letter from Lonnie Lee Poslof, Jr. Re: Emergency Motion to Lodge Exhibits to Protect the Evidence Before Possible Destruction. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2024)
September 5, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Lonnie Lee Poslof, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2024)
September 3, 2024 Filing 5 Letter from Lonnie Lee Poslof, Jr.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2024)
August 27, 2024 Filing 4 CDCR Inmate Statement Report by Lonnie Lee Poslof, Jr. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2024)
August 27, 2024 Copy of docket sheet emailed to S.V.S.P. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2024)
August 26, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Lonnie Lee Poslof, Jr, CDCR # BE-0659.The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is directed to submit within 72 hours and in PDF form a certified Prison Trust Account statement for the plaintiff, reflecting the last six months activity, to cdcrfilings@cand.uscourts.gov. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2024)
August 26, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Emergency Protective Order, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Lonnie Lee Poslof, Jr. Responses due by 9/23/2024. Replies due by 10/7/2024. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2024)
August 26, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Trent Allen, Angel, Angelo, Carlos Arce, E. Borla, R. Castillo, Coffey, Fonseca, R. Gamboa, Global TelLink Corporations, J. Gonzalez, Langevin, Lupe Lopez, M. Meyer, Miranda, R. Mojica, Hector Mora, Howard Moseley, J. Ortega, R. Parin, Jose Ruiz, J. San Juan, S. Sawyer, Charles Schuyler, F. Vaquez. (No Process. In forma pauperis pending) Filed by Lonnie Lee Poslof, Jr. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2024)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poslof v. Arce et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Gamboa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Moseley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Mojica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fonseca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Charles Schuyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Parin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hector Mora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trent Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Borla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Arce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. San Juan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Vaquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LVN Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Coffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CEO Langevin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupe Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Tel*Link Corporations doing business as Viapath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lonnie Lee Poslof, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?