Averza v. Super Micro Computer, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Averza
Defendant: Charles Liang, Super Micro Computer, Inc. and David Weigand
Case Number: 5:2024cv06147
Filed: August 30, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward J Davila
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 5:24-cv-06779-BLF. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on October 25, 2024. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2024)
October 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Remark: Hearing re Motion for Lead Plaintiff and Counsel to be set for 12/19/2024 at 9:00 AM (crr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2024)
October 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 5:24-cv-07274-PCP. Signed by Judge P. Casey Pitts on 10/21/2024. (nmc, COURT USER) (Filed on 10/21/2024)
October 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 5:24-cv-06410-PCP. Signed by Judge P. Casey Pitts on 10/21/2024. (nmc, COURT USER) (Filed on 10/21/2024)
October 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 5:24-cv-06193-PCP. Signed by Judge P. Casey Pitts on 10/21/2024. (nmc, COURT USER) (Filed on 10/21/2024)
October 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING HEARING. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/5/2024 is CONTINUED to 1/23/2025 at 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/10/2025. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges/davila-edward-j-ejd/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (crr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2024)
October 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Joseph Averza. Service waived by Charles Liang waiver sent on 10/2/2024, answer due 12/2/2024. (Apton, Adam) (Filed on 10/9/2024)
October 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Joseph Averza. Service waived by David Weigand waiver sent on 10/2/2024, answer due 12/2/2024. (Apton, Adam) (Filed on 10/9/2024)
October 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Joseph Averza. Service waived by Super Micro Computer, Inc. waiver sent on 10/2/2024, answer due 12/2/2024. (Apton, Adam) (Filed on 10/9/2024)
September 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/28/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/5/2024 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2024)
September 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Super Micro Computer, Inc. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2024)
August 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Edward J. Davila. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2024)
August 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Apton, Adam) (Filed on 8/30/2024)
August 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Joseph Averza . (Apton, Adam) (Filed on 8/30/2024)
August 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Charles Liang, Super Micro Computer, Inc., David Weigand ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19794155.). Filed by Joseph Averza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification)(Apton, Adam) (Filed on 8/30/2024)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Averza v. Super Micro Computer, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Liang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Super Micro Computer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Weigand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Averza
Represented By: Adam Marc Apton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?