Spatz v. Super Micro Computer, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michael Spatz
Defendant: Super Micro Computer, Inc., David Weigand and Charles Liang
Case Number: 5:2024cv06193
Filed: August 30, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan van Keulen
Referring Judge: P Casey Pitts
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 78 m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Michael Spatz (O'Mara, Brian) (Filed on 10/28/2024)
October 21, 2024 Filing 13 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 5:24-cv-06147-EJD. Signed by Judge P. Casey Pitts on 10/21/2024. (nmc, COURT USER) (Filed on 10/21/2024)
September 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Stipulation Extending Defendants' Time to Respond to Complaint and Continuing Initial Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge P. Casey Pitts on 9/27/2024. (nmc, COURT USER) (Filed on 9/27/2024)
September 26, 2024 Filing 11 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #1 Complaint, 7 Clerk's Notice,, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings, Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Defendants' Time to Respond to Complaint, and Continuing Initial Case Management Conference filed by Super Micro Computer, Inc., David Weigand. (Tang, John) (Filed on 9/26/2024)
September 25, 2024 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Michael Spatz. Service waived by David Weigand waiver sent on 9/19/2024, answer due 11/18/2024. (O'Mara, Brian) (Filed on 9/25/2024)
September 25, 2024 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Michael Spatz. Service waived by Charles Liang waiver sent on 9/19/2024, answer due 11/18/2024. (O'Mara, Brian) (Filed on 9/25/2024)
September 25, 2024 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Spatz. Super Micro Computer, Inc. served on 9/9/2024, answer due 9/30/2024. (O'Mara, Brian) (Filed on 9/25/2024)
September 3, 2024 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DEADLINE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/27/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/12/2024 at 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (nmc, COURT USER) (Filed on 9/3/2024)
September 3, 2024 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING DEADLINE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/21/2024 to comply with Judge Pitts's Standing Order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (nmc, COURT USER) (Filed on 9/3/2024)
September 3, 2024 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/28/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/5/2024 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor. (krp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2024)
September 3, 2024 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Charles Liang, Super Micro Computer, Inc., David Weigand. (krp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2024)
September 3, 2024 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge P. Casey Pitts. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (smc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2024)
August 30, 2024 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (O'Mara, Brian) (Filed on 8/30/2024)
August 30, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Charles Liang, Super Micro Computer, Inc., David Weigand (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt number ACANDC-19798787). Filed by Michael Spatz. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Plaintiff, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(O'Mara, Brian) (Filed on 8/30/2024) Modified on 9/3/2024 (krp, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spatz v. Super Micro Computer, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Super Micro Computer, Inc.
Represented By: John C. Tang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Weigand
Represented By: John C. Tang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Liang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Spatz
Represented By: Brian O. O'Mara
Represented By: Steven M. Jodlowski
Represented By: Ruben Pena
Represented By: Hani Farah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?