Roy v. Liang et al
Plaintiff: Anand Roy
Defendant: Super Micro Computer, Inc., Robert Blair, Charles Liang, Yih-Shyan Liaw, Hwei-Ming Tsai, Daniel W. Fairfax, Michael S. McAndrews, Sara Liu, Shiu Leung Chan, David Weigand, Judy Lin, Sherman Tuan, Saria Tseng and Tally Liu
Petitioner: Lawrence Hollin
Case Number: 5:2024cv08006
Filed: November 14, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Edward J Davila
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. § 78 m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2025 Filing 16 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Lawrence Hollin. (Tramontano, Alex) (Filed on 1/10/2025)
January 10, 2025 Filing 15 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Adjourn January 23, 2025 Initial Case Management Conference filed by Lawrence Hollin. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Tramontano, Alex) (Filed on 1/10/2025)
December 2, 2024 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/23/2025 at 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/10/2025. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (crr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2024)
November 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RELATING CASE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/29/2024. (crr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2024)
November 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to case, except for discovery purposes. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(smc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2024)
November 27, 2024 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND WILL BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2024)
November 27, 2024 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Anand Roy.. (Moest, Robert) (Filed on 11/27/2024)
November 22, 2024 Filing 9 SUA SPONTE Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Case re 5:24-cv-06147 EJD with 5:24-cv-08006 NC. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 11/22/2024. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2024)
November 20, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE by David Weigand, Super Micro Computer, Inc., Charles Liang, Daniel W. Fairfax, Robert Blair Notice Regarding Stay of Proceedings Pursuant to November 5, 2024 Order in Related Action (Tang, John) (Filed on 11/20/2024)
November 18, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anand Roy. Super Micro Computer, Inc. served on 11/18/2024, answer due 12/9/2024. (Moest, Robert) (Filed on 11/18/2024)
November 18, 2024 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Entities by Anand Roy (Moest, Robert) (Filed on 11/18/2024)
November 15, 2024 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Robert Blair, Shiu Leung Chan, Daniel W. Fairfax, Charles Liang, Yih-Shyan Liaw, Judy Lin, Sara Liu, Tally Liu, Michael S. McAndrews, Super Micro Computer, Inc., Hwei-Ming Tsai, Saria Tseng, Sherman Tuan, David Weigand. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2024)
November 15, 2024 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/12/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/19/2025 10:00 AM in San Jose, - Telephonic Only. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2024)
November 15, 2024 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/29/2024. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2024)
November 14, 2024 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Moest, Robert) (Filed on 11/14/2024)
November 14, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20051665.). Filed by Anand Roy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moest, Robert) (Filed on 11/14/2024)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roy v. Liang et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Super Micro Computer, Inc.
Represented By: John C. Tang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Blair
Represented By: John C. Tang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Liang
Represented By: John C. Tang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yih-Shyan Liaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hwei-Ming Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel W. Fairfax
Represented By: John C. Tang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael S. McAndrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shiu Leung Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Weigand
Represented By: John C. Tang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherman Tuan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saria Tseng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tally Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anand Roy
Represented By: Timothy Brown
Represented By: Robert Charles Moest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lawrence Hollin
Represented By: Alex J. Tramontano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?