Cruz et al v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Kevin Cruz and Cara Cruz
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 5:2024cv09241
Filed: December 19, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Eumi K Lee
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2025 Filing 12 NOTICE of Disassociation of Counsel for plaintiffs by Kevin Cruz, Cara Cruz (Carvalho, Tionna) (Filed on 1/23/2025) Modified on 1/23/2025 (anj, COURT STAFF).
December 23, 2024 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DEADLINE AND CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Statement due by 4/2/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/16/2025 at 01:30 PM before Judge Eumi K. Lee. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom meeting.Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at eklcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than April 14, 2025 at 5:00PM PT.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lrt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2024)
December 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Eumi K Lee for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to case, except for discovery purposes. (smc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2024)
December 20, 2024 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND WILL BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2024)
December 20, 2024 Filing 8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/12/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/19/2025 10:00 AM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2024)
December 20, 2024 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ford Motor Company.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Clayton, Trina) (Filed on 12/20/2024)
December 20, 2024 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/3/2025. (kxo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2024)
December 19, 2024 Answer to Removal Complaint Docket no. #1 -Exhibit I by Ford Motor Company. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2024) Modified on 12/20/2024 (anj, COURT STAFF).
December 19, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance filed by Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Hugret, Spencer) (Filed on 12/19/2024)
December 19, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance filed by Katherine Pollard Vilchez on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Vilchez, Katherine) (Filed on 12/19/2024)
December 19, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance filed by Trina Marie Clayton on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Clayton, Trina) (Filed on 12/19/2024)
December 19, 2024 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Ford Motor Company identifying Other Affiliate State Street Corporation (parent of State Street Bank and Trust Company, which is the trustee of the Ford defined contribution plans), Other Affiliate Black Rock, Inc. and certain affiliates, Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group and certain affiliates, Other Affiliate Evercore Trust Company, N.A. (fiduciary of the Ford defined contribution plans) for Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Clayton, Trina) (Filed on 12/19/2024)
December 19, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Plaintiffs from Santa Clara County Superior Court. Their case number is 24cv446096. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-20162217). Filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Atty iso Removal, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Civil Cover Sheet, #20 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Clayton, Trina) (Filed on 12/19/2024) Modified on 12/20/2024 (anj, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cruz et al v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Cruz
Represented By: Tionna Carvalho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cara Cruz
Represented By: Tionna Carvalho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Trina Marie Clayton
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Represented By: Katherine Pollard Vilchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?