In re National Security Agency Telecommunications Records Litigation Featured Case

Plaintiff: Lycos, Inc., Wired News, Steve Dolberg, Mark Klein, Tash Hepting, Gregory Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Ray Anderson, Mark Baker, John Barrett, Anthony Bartelemy, William Betz, Fran Blamer, Trudy Bond, Kristen Brink, Shane Brink, Michael Brooks, Paul Bruney, Peter Catizone, Steve Christianson, John Clark, Kingsley Clark, Thomas M. Cleaver, Gerard P. Clerkin, Peter B. Collins, Kris Costa, Mark Costa, Julie Davis, Sharon L. Davis, Toni DiDona, Theresa R. Duffy, Thomas S. Dwyer, Thomas Michael Fain, Deadria Farmer-Paellmann, Shawn Fitzgibbons, John Fitzpatrick, Jennifer Florio, Margaret Franklin, Dawn Furler, C. Garifo, Diane Gavlinski, Joseph Gehring, Jane Gentile-Youd, Mark Gentile-Youd, G. Lawrence Gettier, Linda Gettier, Linda J. Gettier, Jit Gill, Mike Gilmore, Jayson Gleason, Marc Goldstone, Todd Graff, Janet Granja, Susan Grossman, Stephanie Gustave, Pam Haddon, Vern Haddon, Don Hawkings, Donna Hawkings, Jose V. Heinert, Lamar Henderson, Carolyn R. Hensley, Douglas S. Hensley, Donald Herron, Jennifer Hontz, Joyce Jackson, Andrew Jaffe, Randel James, Michael Johnson, Diane Juliano, Fay Kaiser, Rajendram Krishnan, Barbara Langer, Michael Lavo, Fred Leak, Ken Leha, Ben Lindsey, Lisa Lockwood, Lodge, Nancy K. Lorey, Michael T. Lyda, Eleanor M. Lynn, Esq., Terry Mancour, Charlene Mann, Rev., Brad Martson, Jon Paul McClellan, Alicia McCollum, James McGrattan, Joe McMurray, Stephanie Meket, Clyde Michael Morgan, Sharon Ann Morris, Theodore Jonathan Morris, Sheri A. Mueller, Robert Newby, Fran Nobile, Serge Popper, Ilene Pruett, Michael Reusch, Merrilyn Rome, Michele Rosen, Michele S. Rothmel, Kevin Shawler, Greg L. Smith, Harris Sondak, James Van Alstine, Chris Von Obenauer, Austin Chronicle (The), Louis Black, Richard A. Grigg, James C. Harrington, Michael Kentor, American Civil Liberties of Illinois, Inc., Barbara Flynn Currie, Diane C. Geraghty, Gary S. Gerson, James D. Montgomery, Studs Terkel, Quentin Young, Ron Antosko, James E. Chadden, Sr., Mary J. Trevino, Kathryn Potter, Pamela A. Mahoney, Edward Marck, Carol Waltuch, Associated Press, Bloomberg News, Los Angeles Times, San Francisco Chronicle, San Jose Mercury News, USA Today, Ramon Goggins, James Joll, Steven Schwarz, Darryl Hines, Ales Klabacka, Jana Klabacka, Charles F. Bissit, Sandra Bissit, Arthur Bouchard, Mary Ann Bouchard, Aldo Caparco, Janice Caparco, Jenna Caparco, Rose DeLuca, Christine Douquette, George Hayek, III, Maryanne Klaczynski, June Matrumalo, Paula Matrumalo, Vincent Matrumalo, Nicole Mirabella, Patricia Pothier, Paul Pothier, Gerard Thibeault, Jennifer Thomas, Marshall Votta, Center for Constitutional Rights, Debra Bolich, James Bolich, Mark Boulet, Lloyd Brown, Greg Conner, Stephen M. Kampmann, Claudia Salazar, Cheryl Scroggins, Sergio Vasquez, Diedre M. Wilten, Tina Herron, Brandy Sergi, Rhea Fuller, Shelly D. Souder, Elaine Spielfogel-Landis, Dennis P. Riordan, Edward Gerard De Bonis, Robert S. Gerstein, Rod Gorney, Robert Jacobson, Vincent J. Maniscalco, Carol Sobel, American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California, ACLU of Southern California, American Civil Liberties Union of San Diego/Imperial Counties, Tom Campbell, George Main, Margaret Russell, Robert Scheer, Peter Sussman, Richard Belzer, Marc Cooper, Stephen J. Mather, Sandra Richards, Curren Warf, Benson B. Roe, The Austin Chronicle, Paul Goltz, American Civil Liberties Union of Illinois, Inc., Melissa Scroggins, James Nurkiewicz, Ian Walker, Travis Cross, John Elder, Gabrielle Filippelli, Sam Goldstein, Healing Arts Center, David Kadlec, Libertarian party of Indiana, Tim Peterson, Carolyn W. Rader, Sam Goldstein Insurance Agency, Inc., Sean Shepherd, Sam Shepherd, Mark E. Guzzi, Heather Derosier, Charmaine Crockett, A. Joris Watland, William Massey, Herbert Waxman, Richard D. Suchanek, III, Christopher Bready, Anne Bready, Kyu Chun Kim, Claudis Artis, Jenet Artis, David Beverly, Jr., Mark P. Solomon, Theresa Fortnash, Joan Dubois, Christopher Yowtz, Rebecca Yowtz, Roslyn Payne, Sean Basinski, Electron Tubes, Inc., Glen Chulsky, Alejandro Trombley, Paul Robilotti, Samuel Fisher, Omar Moreno, Stephen Ternlund, D. Clive Hardy, All Plaintiffs, Claudia Mink, Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc., Wendell Belew, Asim Ghafoor, Brian Bradley, Cathy Bruning, Steven Bruning, Kim Coco Iwamoto, Anakalia Kaluna, Steven Lebow, Alan Toly Sapoznik, Jonnie Starkey, Barry Kaltman, Meredith Kaltman, Bell South Corporation, Cingular Wireless LLC, Virginia Shubert, Noha Arafa, Sarah Dranoff, Hilary Botein, Tina M. Foster, Gitanjali S. Gutierrez, Seema Ahmad, Maria LaHood, Rachel Meeropol, Robert Clayton, Steve Gaw, Richard Roche, United States of America, USA, Ms. Lodge, Brad Marston, Chris Von Obernauer, Dan Patton, Ray Pena, Constance Phillips, Mark Plante, Jeremy Puhlman, Martin Razo, Daniel Reimann, Mark Richards, Linda Rithkis, William Robinette, Fred Rogers, Darlene Rogers, Kathleen Rogers, Bronson Rosier, Josh Seefried, Anna F. Shallenberger, Royce Shepard, Robert Siden, Gregory L. Smith, Christian Stalberg, Michael L. Stephan, Robert Stewart, Donna A. Stone, Paul Sunberg, Regina Sunberg, William R. Sweeney, Jr., David Taylor, April Tipe, Allen T. Trader, III, Barry W. Tribble, Fred Trinkoff, Thomas Vilar, Vickie Votaw, Leon Dwight Wallace, Achieng Warambo, Ulrich Geister, David White, Beth White, Jane Winston, Kevin Wright, Joel Ainger, Carol Cose, Deborah Dougherty, James Flynn, Kraft, Gina De Miranda, Catalina R. Thompson, Mary Leah Weiss, Elizabeth Arnone, Eleanor Lynn, Jay H. Rowell, Vivian Phillips, Jeffrey G. Marsocci, Bridget Irving, James Hall, John McIntyre, Howard Jacobs, Laurence Kornblum, Kathleen Miller, Jane Youd, Mark Youd and Amidax Trading Group
Defendant: Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Global Networks, Inc., Verizon Northwest, Inc., BellSouth Communications Systems, LLC, BellSouth Corp., BellSouth Telecomminications, Inc., American Telephone & Telegraph Co., AT&T Communications, Inc., AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc., George W. Bush, National Security Agency, United States of America, AT&T Communications of California, Inc., AT&T Operations, Inc., Illinois Bell Telephone Company, MCI, LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services, Inc., Pacific Bell Telephone Company, SBC Long Distance, LLC, AT&T Communications of California, AT&T, Inc., AT&T Operations Inc., Verizon Communications Inc, American Telephone and Telegraph Company, Bellsouth Communication Systems, LLC, BellSouth Telecommunications, Inc., Illinois Bell Telephone Co., United States, Verizon, AT&T Teleholdings, Inc., Cingular Wireless, LLC, Indiana Bell Telephone Company Incorporated, MCI Communications Services, Inc., Nextel West Corp., Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P., MCI Worldcom Advanced Networks, LLC, Keith B. Alexander, Anakalia Kaluna, Kim Coco Iwamoto, Hawaiian Telecom Inc., Sprint Nextel Corporation, Verizon Maryland, Inc., Anatoly Sapoznik, AT&T Communications, AT&T Teleholdings, Cingular Wireless Corporation, Cingular Wireless LLC, Illinois Bell, Indiana Bell, Pac Bell Telephone Co., SBC Communications, AT&T Communications of the Southwest, Inc., Southwestern Bell Telephone, L.P., SBC Long Distrance, LLC, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Robert W. Werner, Federal Bureau of Investigation, AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Mobility Corporation, Pacific Bell Telephone Co., SBC Long Distance LLC, Michael V. Hayden, Alberto Gonzales, John Ashcroft, Defense Intelligence Agency, Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Homeland Security, John D. Negroponte, SBC Advanced Solutions, Inc., TCG St. Louis Holdings, Inc., Southwestern Bell Telephone, LP, TCG Kansas City, Inc., Robert M. Clayton, III, Anthony J. Palermino, Donald W. Downes, Jack R. Goldberg, John W. Betkoski, III, Anne C. George, Southern New England Telecommunications Corp., Woodbury Telephone Co., Verizon New York Inc., Maine Public Utilities Commission Chairman, Maine Public Utilities Commission Commissioner, Maine Public Utilities Commission Administrative Director, Verizon New England Inc., Cathleen O'Donnell, Qwest Communications International, Inc., Stuart Rabner, Stephen B. Nolan, James Volz, David C. Coen, John D. Burke, David O'Brien, AT&T Communications of New England, Inc., Verizon New England, Inc., BellSouth Corporation, Verizon Florida, Inc., Robert S. Mueller, III, Adam J Szubin and Barack Obama
Petitioner: Michael T. Lyda
Intervenor Dft: United States Of America, United States of America, Christopher Branson, David L. Cowie, James Douglas Cowie, Maureen Dea, Sally Dobres, John H. Donovan, Lisa Hicks, Maine Public Advocate, Thomas Mundhenk, Harold Noel, Gwethalyn M. Phillips, Paul Sarvis, Margaret Siegle, Lou Solebello, Ethan Strimling, Barbara Taylor, Kristen A. Tyson, Paul G. Tyson, James W. Woodworth, American Civil Liberties Union of CT, Connecticut Office of Consumer Counsel and Office of Consumer Counsel-CT
Miscellaneous: AT&T Corp., Tom Campbell, Eric Schneider, Willie H. Ellis, Daniel N. Gall, Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc., Wendell Belew and Asim Ghafoor
Amicus: Center for Constitutional Rights, Mark Klein, Amici Law Professors, Susan Freiwald, The Center for National Security Studies, California First Amendment Coalition, CNET News.com, United States of America, The Association of the Bar of the City of New York, Certain Members of Congress, Washington Legal Foundation, Louis Fisher, William G. Weaver, Professors of Ethics and Lawyers Practicing in the Professional Responsibility Field, Department of the Public Advocate, Brennan Center for Justice, Amici Curiae Law Professors, Steven G. Calabresi, Don Doernberg, Richard D. Freer, Stephen B. Presser, Robert J. Pushaw, Ronald D. Rotunda, Stephen F. Smith, Michael E. Solimine and William W. Van Alstyne
Intervenor: Associated Press, Bloomberg News, Los Angeles Times, San Francisco Chronicle, San Jose Mercury News, USA Today, Wired News, CondeNet Inc. and New York Times
Movant: Benson R. Roe, Paul Goltz, Roland Algrant, Adam Kanzer, Michael Kieschnick, Joe Sibilia, Peter Strugatz, Mal Warwick, American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee, Asian American Legal Defense and Education Fund, Japanese American Citizens League, League of United Latin American Citizens, National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, United for Peace and Justice, Maine Public Advocate and ACLU-NJ
3rd Party Defendant: Charlene Mann, Rev. and Irene King
Consol 3rd Pty Pla: Amicus Law Professors
Case Number: M:2006cv01791
Filed: August 14, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: MDL Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Unassigned
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 26, 2011 769 USCA Case Number 11-15956 USCA 9th Circuit (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2011)
April 18, 2011 768 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 766 Notice of Appeal (Attachments: # 1 06-1791 docket sheet, # 2 07-1115 docket sheet, # 3 cover letter, # 4 USCA appeal notification form)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2011)
April 18, 2011 767 Copy of Notice of Appeal and Docket sheet mailed to all counsel (Attachments: # 1 06-1791 docket sheet, # 2 07-1115 docket sheet)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2011)
April 15, 2011 766 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 758 Judgment by Center for Constitutional Rights. Filing fee $ 455, Receipt Number 34611058758. (Re CV-07-1115 VRW)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2011)
April 6, 2011 765 Featured Case ORDER of USCA (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2011)
March 4, 2011 764 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals by Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc.(an Oregon Nonprofit Corporation), Wendell Belew, Asim Ghafoor re (762 in 3:06-md-01791-VRW, 139 in 3:07-cv-00109-VRW) Notice of Cross Appeal, (Attachments: # 1 representation statement, # 2 06-1791 docket sheet, # 3 07-109 docket sheet, # 4 cover letter, # 5 appeal notification form)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2011)
March 4, 2011 763 Copy of Notice of Appeal and Docket sheet mailed to all counsel (Attachments: # 1 Representation Statement, # 2 06-1791 docket sheet, # 3 07-109 docket sheet)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2011)
March 3, 2011 762 NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL as to (759 in 3:06-md-01791-VRW, 136 in 3:07-cv-00109-VRW) Notice of Appeal by Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc.(an Oregon Nonprofit Corporation), Wendell Belew, Asim Ghafoor. Filing fee $ 455, Receipt Number 34611057043 (Attachments: # 1 Representation Statement)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
February 23, 2011 761 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re (759 in 3:06-md-01791-VRW) Notice of Appeal (Attachments: # 1 06-md-1791 docket sheet, # 2 07-109 docket sheet, # 3 cover letter, # 4 appeal notification form)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2011)
February 23, 2011 760 Copy of Notice of Appeal and Docket sheet mailed to all counsel (Attachments: # 1 06-md-1791 docket sheet, # 2 07-109 docket sheet)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2011)
February 18, 2011 759 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to (135 in 3:07-cv-00109-VRW) Judgment on Attorney Fees,(754 in 3:06-md-01791-VRW) Judgment on Attorney Fees by Barack Obama. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
February 15, 2011 758 JUDGMENT. IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that in accordance with the Court's January 31, 2011 Order, judgment is hereby entered in Case C07-1115 Center for Constitutional Rights, et al v Obama, et al, in favor of defendants and against plaintiffs. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2011)
February 14, 2011 757 NOTICE by Seema Ahmad, Center for Constitutional Rights, Tina M. Foster, Gitanjali S. Gutierrez, Maria LaHood, Rachel Meeropol re 756 Proposed Order (Statement re. Form of Judgment) (Kadidal, Shayana) (Filed on 2/14/2011)
February 7, 2011 756 Proposed Order re 755 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Submission of Proposed Form of Judgment by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Form of Judgment)(Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 2/7/2011)
January 31, 2011 755 Featured Case ORDER granting 731 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 742 Motion for Summary Judgment (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2011)
December 22, 2010 754 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in C07-0109 VRW in favor of Asim Ghafoor, Wendell Belew against Adam J Szubin, Barack Obama, Keith B. Alexander, Robert S. Mueller, III. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2010)
December 21, 2010 753 Featured Case ORDER granting 722 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 738 Motion for Attorney Fees. (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2010)
November 23, 2010 752 NOTICE by Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc., Wendell Belew, Asim Ghafoor (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit to notice of Submission to U.S. Supreme Court)(Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 11/23/2010)
October 22, 2010 751 Featured Case ORDER of USCA (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2010)
October 5, 2010 750 Reply Memorandum in Support of (Plaintiffs') Motion for Summary Judgment filed bySeema Ahmad, Center for Constitutional Rights, Tina M. Foster, Gitanjali S. Gutierrez, Maria LaHood, Rachel Meeropol. (Kadidal, Shayana) (Filed on 10/5/2010)
September 14, 2010 749 Memorandum in Opposition re 742 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Plaintiffs' Notice of Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment, with Proposed Order) MOTION for Summary Judgment (Plaintiffs' Notice of Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment, with Proposed Order), 731 MOTION for Summary Judgment Government Defendants' Notice of Motion and Renewed Motion to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment; Memorandum in Support thereof and Reply Brief filed byUnited States of America. (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 9/14/2010)
August 12, 2010 748 Reply to Opposition filed byAl-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc., Wendell Belew, Asim Ghafoor. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Supplemental Declaration of Thomas H. Nelson in Support of Motion for Attorneys Fees)(Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 8/12/2010)
August 9, 2010 747 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker granting Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Plaintiffs may file a memorandum in opposition to defendants' renewed motion for summary judgment of up to 30 pages. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2010)
August 5, 2010 746 Memorandum in Opposition re 738 MOTION for Attorney Fees Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorney's Fees (Al-Haramain v Obama) (09-cv-109-VRW) filed byUnited States. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Appendix, # 3 Appendix, # 4 Appendix, # 5 Appendix, # 6 Appendix, # 7 Appendix)(Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 8/5/2010)
August 2, 2010 745 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER. Pursuant to the foregoing stipulation, it is hereby ORDERED that the due date for Defendants' response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorney Fees (Dkts 738/128) shall be extended from August 4, 2010 to August 5, 2010. No further extensions should be sought as none will be granted, filed by Office of Foreign Assets Control, Robert S. Mueller, III, Barack Obama, Keith B. Alexander, Adam J Szubin, Federal Bureau of Investigation, National Security Agency. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 8/2/2010. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
July 30, 2010 744 Featured Case STIPULATION for One Day Extension for Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorney Fees (Al-Haramain v. Obama 07-cv-109-VRW) by United States. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 7/30/2010)
July 29, 2010 743 Featured Case Brief re 742 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Plaintiffs' Notice of Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment, with Proposed Order) MOTION for Summary Judgment (Plaintiffs' Notice of Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment, with Proposed Order), 731 MOTION for Summary Judgment Government Defendants' Notice of Motion and Renewed Motion to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment; Memorandum in Support thereof (Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss) filed bySeema Ahmad, Center for Constitutional Rights, Tina M. Foster, Gitanjali S. Gutierrez, Maria LaHood, Rachel Meeropol. (Related document(s) 742 , 731 ) (Kadidal, Shayana) (Filed on 7/29/2010)
July 29, 2010 742 Featured Case MOTION for Summary Judgment (Plaintiffs' Notice of Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment, with Proposed Order) filed by Seema Ahmad, Center for Constitutional Rights, Tina M. Foster, Gitanjali S. Gutierrez, Maria LaHood, Rachel Meeropol. (Kadidal, Shayana) (Filed on 7/29/2010)
July 29, 2010 741 Featured Case Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages with Stipulation Regarding Consent filed by Seema Ahmad, Center for Constitutional Rights, Tina M. Foster, Gitanjali S. Gutierrez, Maria LaHood, Rachel Meeropol. (Kadidal, Shayana) (Filed on 7/29/2010)
July 21, 2010 740 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker granting, doc 739 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. Upon consideration of the parties' revised stipulation and request to extend and to modify the current briefing schedule in this action, the court HEREBY REVISES the current briefing schedule set forth in its order of June 21, 2010 (Doc #737/042) as follows: (i) plaintiffs must file an opposition to defendants' renewed motion and may renew their cross-motion for summary judgment by July 29, 2010; (ii) defendants must file an opposition to plaintiffs' cross motion and may file a reply to plaintiffs' opposition by September 14, 2010; and (iii) plaintiffs may file a cross-reply by October 5, 2010. There now having been three stipulated extensions of briefing, the court will not permit any further extensions or delays. IT IS SO ORDERED. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2010)
July 16, 2010 739 Featured Case REVISED STIPULATION and REQUEST to Extend and Modify Briefing Schedule; [PROPOSED] ORDER by Seema Ahmad, Center for Constitutional Rights, Tina M. Foster, Gitanjali S. Gutierrez, Maria LaHood, Rachel Meeropol. (Kadidal, Shayana) (Filed on 7/16/2010) Modified on 7/16/2010 (far, COURT STAFF).
July 7, 2010 738 Featured Case MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc., Wendell Belew, Asim Ghafoor. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of William N. Hancock, # 2 Declaration of J. Ashlee Albies, # 3 Declaration of Jon B. Eisenbeg, # 4 Declaration of Kenneth A. Kreucher, # 5 Declaration of Lisa Jaskol, # 6 Declaration of Steven Goldberg, # 7 Declaration of Thomas H. Nelson, # 8 Declaration of Zaha S. Hassan, # 9 Certificate of Service)(Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 7/7/2010)
June 21, 2010 737 Featured Case REVISED STIPULATION AND ORDER re doc 41 . Plaintiffs file an opposition to Defendants' renewed motion and renew Plaintiffs' cross-motion for summary judgment by 7/22/2010. Defendants file a reply and file an opposition to Plaintiffs cross-motion by 9/2/2010. Plaintiffs may file a cross-reply by 9/23/2010. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 6/21/2010. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2010)
June 17, 2010 736 Featured Case STIPULATION and Request to Extend and Modify Briefing Schedule by Seema Ahmad, Center for Constitutional Rights, Tina M. Foster, Gitanjali S. Gutierrez, Maria LaHood, Rachel Meeropol. (Kadidal, Shayana) (Filed on 6/17/2010)
June 15, 2010 735 Featured Case ORDER on Stipulation. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 6/15/2010. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2010)
June 14, 2010 734 Featured Case STIPULATION re 732 Order and Request for Extension of Schedule for Briefing Attorney Fees by United States of America. (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
June 11, 2010 733 Featured Case CLERKS NOTICE Advising Counsel of Change in MDL Master Case Number Format (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2010)
June 4, 2010 732 Featured Case ORDER setting briefing on plaintiffs' fee application. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 6/4/2010. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2010)
May 27, 2010 731 Featured Case MOTION for Summary Judgment Government Defendants' Notice of Motion and Renewed Motion to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment; Memorandum in Support thereof filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 5/27/2010)
May 21, 2010 730 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Request for Punitive Damages (Al-Haramain et al v. Obama et al (07-cv-00109-VRW) filed byUnited States of America. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 5/21/2010)
May 7, 2010 729 Featured Case Brief Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points Authorities in Support of Claim for Punitive Damages Correction of Docket # 121 filed byAl-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc., Wendell Belew, Asim Ghafoor. (Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 5/7/2010) . Modified on 5/11/2010 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2010 728 Featured Case Letter from Jon B. Eisenberg, Esq.. (Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 5/7/2010)
April 30, 2010 727 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition Government Defendants' Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Proposed Judgment and Re: Alternative Form of Judgment; Accompanying Alternative Form of Judgment Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation v. Obama et al. (07-cv-109-VRW) filed byUnited States. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 4/30/2010)
April 28, 2010 726 Featured Case ORDER revising briefing schedule pursuant to stipulation. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 4/28/2010. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2010)
April 22, 2010 725 Featured Case STIPULATION and REQUEST to Extend and Modify Briefing Schedule in Center for Constitutional Rights et al v. Obama et al (07-cv-1115-VRW) by United States. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 4/22/2010) Modified on 4/26/2010 (far, COURT STAFF).
April 19, 2010 724 Featured Case ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Vaughn R. Walker on 4/19/2010. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 16, 2010 723 Featured Case Proposed Order Plaintiffs' Proposed Judgment by Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc., Wendell Belew, Asim Ghafoor. (Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 4/16/2010)
April 16, 2010 722 Featured Case MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Request for Dismissal of Second, Third, Fourth, Fifth and Sixth Claims for Relief filed by Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc., Wendell Belew, James Bolich, Asim Ghafoor. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Proof of Service)(Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 4/16/2010)
March 31, 2010 721 Featured Case ORDER by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker granting (657) Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (668) Defendants' Fourth Motion to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment in MDL Docket M:06-cv-01791-VRW; granting (99) Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (103) Defendants' Fourth Motion to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment in case 3:07-cv-00109-VRW (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2010)
March 26, 2010 720 Featured Case ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 3/26/2010. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2010)
March 23, 2010 719 Featured Case Copy of Notice of Appeal and Docket sheet mailed to all counsel (Attachments: # 1 docket sheet, # 2 cover letter, # 3 USCA appeal notification form)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2010)
March 22, 2010 718 Featured Case Copy of Notice of Appeal and Docket sheet mailed to all counsel (Attachments: # 1 docket sheet)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2010)
March 19, 2010 717 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEAL as to (46 in 3:07-cv-00693-VRW) Order on Motion to Dismiss (47 in 3:07-cv-00693-VRW) Judgment by Virginia Shubert. Appeal Fee $455, Receipt Number 34611043712. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2010)
March 19, 2010 716 Featured Case JOINT STATUS REPORT in Center for Constitutional Rights et al. v. Obama et al. (07-cv-1115-VRW) by United States. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 3/19/2010) Modified on 3/22/2010 (far, COURT STAFF).
March 9, 2010 715 Featured Case ORDER of USCA (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2010)
March 5, 2010 714 Featured Case ORDER Dismissing Guzzi v. Bush, et al., Case No. C 06-6225 VRW, pursuant to Stipulation of Dismissal (26 in 3:06-cv-06225-VRW) (713 in M:06-cv-01791-VRW). Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R. Walker on 3/5/2010. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2010)
March 5, 2010 713 Featured Case STIPULATION of Dismissal Filed by All Parties in Guzzi v. Bush et al (06-cv-06225-VRW) Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by United States of America. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 3/5/2010)
February 26, 2010 710 Featured Case ORDER re (709 in M:06-cv-01791-VRW) (33 in 3:07-cv-01115-VRW) Stipulation. Date by which to file joint status report and proposed schedule extended to March 19, 2010. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R. Walker on 2/26/2010. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2010)
February 25, 2010 709 Featured Case STIPULATION re 702 Order, to Extend Time to Submit Joint Status Report by Seema Ahmad, Center for Constitutional Rights, Tina M. Foster, Gitanjali S. Gutierrez, Maria LaHood, Rachel Meeropol. (Kadidal, Shayana) (Filed on 2/25/2010)
February 22, 2010 712 Featured Case Amended Transcript of Proceedings held on 9/23/09, before Judge Walker. Court Reporter/Transcriber James Yeomans, Telephone number (415) 863-5179. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/24/2010. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
February 18, 2010 708 Featured Case STIPULATION (re extension of time for compliance with order, dkt 702) by Seema Ahmad, Center for Constitutional Rights, Tina M. Foster, Gitanjali S. Gutierrez, Maria LaHood, Rachel Meeropol. (Kadidal, Shayana) (Filed on 2/18/2010)
February 4, 2010 707 Featured Case ORDER re (Doc #46 in 3:07-cv-00693-VRW, Doc #703 in M:06-cv-01791-VRW) 1/21/2010 Order on Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Vaughn R. Walker on 2/4/2010. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2010)
February 1, 2010 706 Featured Case RESPONSE to re 701 Order Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss in 06-cv-6225-VRW by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Motion to Dismiss, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Response to Motion to Dismiss, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Reply to Motion to Dismiss)(Ahern, Paul) (Filed on 2/1/2010)
January 25, 2010 705 Featured Case JUDGMENT. IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that in accordance with the Court's January 21, 2010 Order, judgment is hereby entered in member caseShubert et al v Bush et al, No C 07-0693 in favor of defendants and against plaintiffs. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2010)
January 25, 2010 704 Featured Case JUDGMENT (C08-4373 Jewel et al v NSA et al). IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that in accordance with the Court's January 21, 2010 Order, judgment is hereby entered in this case in favor of defendants and against plaintiffs. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2010)
January 21, 2010 703 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Vaughn R. Walker granting (680) Motion to Dismiss in case M:06-cv-01791-VRW; granting (38) Motion to Dismiss in case 3:07-cv-00693-VRW; granting Motion to Dismiss in 3:08-cv-4373 VRW. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix) (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2010)
January 20, 2010 702 Featured Case ORDER in C07-1115 VRW CCR v Bush. The parties are directed to submit to the court, on or before 2/26/2010, a joint status report advising the court of the status of this case, what proceedings are necessary to resolve it and proposing a tentative schedule for such proceedings if applicable. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 1/20/2010. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2010)
December 31, 2009 701 Featured Case ORDER re 700 status report and stipulated briefing schedule. (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2009)
December 31, 2009 700 Featured Case STATUS REPORT and Stipulation to Set Supplemental Briefing Schedule and Hearing date in 06-cv-6225 by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ahern, Paul) (Filed on 12/31/2009)
December 18, 2009 699 Featured Case STATUS REPORT ORDER Status Report due by 12/31/2009. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 12/18/2009. (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2009)
December 15, 2009 698 Featured Case ORDER of USCA (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2009)
December 11, 2009 697 Featured Case ORDER of USCA (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2009)
December 8, 2009 696 Featured Case Reply Memorandum re 680 MOTION to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment in 07-cv-693 filed byUnited States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Ahern, Paul) (Filed on 12/8/2009)
December 3, 2009 695 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition re 680 MOTION to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment in 07-cv-693 filed byNoha Arafa, Hilary Botein, Sarah Dranoff, Virginia Shubert. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Maazel, Ilann) (Filed on 12/3/2009)
November 23, 2009 694 Featured Case NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Plaintiffs' Notice of Submission to United States District Court for the District of Columbia (Reply Memorandum) (Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 11/23/2009)
November 23, 2009 693 Featured Case NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Plaintiffs' Notice of Order by Court of Appeals (Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 11/23/2009)
November 12, 2009 692 Featured Case NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Ronald Paltin Schiller on behalf of Defendant, Verizon Communications, Inc. (Schiller, Ronald) (Filed on 11/12/2009)
November 11, 2009 691 Featured Case CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ACLU of Southern California, ACLU of Southern California(a nonprofit corporation), American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California(a nonprofit corporation), American Civil Liberties Union of San Diego/Imperial Counties(a nonprofit corporation), American Civil Liberties Union of San Diego/Imperial Counties, Richard Belzer, Tom Campbell, Marc Cooper, Edward Gerard De Bonis, Robert S. Gerstein, Rod Gorney, Robert Jacobson, George Main, Vincent J. Maniscalco, Stephen J. Mather, Sandra Richards, Dennis P. Riordan, Margaret Russell, Robert Scheer, Carol Sobel, Peter Sussman, Curren Warf re 688 Notice of Appearance and Reassignment of Counsel Within Same Office; Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel and Request for order of Withdrawal; [Proposed] Order (Mass, Julia) (Filed on 11/11/2009)
November 11, 2009 690 Featured Case NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Plaintiffs' Notice of Submission to the United States District Court for the District of Columbia (Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 11/11/2009)
November 11, 2009 689 Featured Case NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Plaintiffs' Notice of Submission to Court of Appeals (Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 11/11/2009)
November 10, 2009 688 Featured Case NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Harumi Mass, Esq Notice of Appearance and Reassignment of Counsel Within Same Office; Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel and Request for Order of Withdrawal; [Proposed] Order (Mass, Julia) (Filed on 11/10/2009)
November 10, 2009 687 Featured Case NOTICE by Keith B. Alexander(its Director), Federal Bureau of Investigation, Robert S. Mueller, III, National Security Agency(Ltg Keith B. Alexander, Director), Barack Obama, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Adam J Szubin Government Defendants' Notice of Submission to Court of Appeals Al-Haramain v. Obama 07-cv-109-VRW (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 11/10/2009)
November 6, 2009 686 Featured Case NOTICE by United States of America of Withdrawal of Counsel (Haas, Alexander) (Filed on 11/6/2009)
November 5, 2009 685 Featured Case STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF FENWICK & WEST LLP AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS DENNIS RIORDAN, ET AL. AND TOM CAMPBELL, ET AL. by ACLU of Southern California, ACLU of Southern California(a nonprofit corporation), American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California(a nonprofit corporation), American Civil Liberties Union of San Diego/Imperial Counties(a nonprofit corporation), Richard Belzer, Tom Campbell, Robert S. Gerstein, Rod Gorney, George Main, Vincent J. Maniscalco, Dennis P. Riordan, Robert Scheer, Carol Sobel, Peter Sussman. (Pulgram, Laurence) (Filed on 11/5/2009)
November 3, 2009 684 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re C07-0693 Shubert v United States of America et al, THIRD STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RENEWED MOTION TO DISMISS AND FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 11/2/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2009)
October 30, 2009 683 Featured Case NOTICE by United States of America re 680 MOTION to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment in 07-cv-693 of Lodging of In Camera, Ex Parte Classified Supplemental Memorandum of Points and Authorities (Ahern, Paul) (Filed on 10/30/2009)
October 30, 2009 682 Featured Case NOTICE by United States of America re 680 MOTION to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment in 07-cv-693 of Lodging of In Camera, Ex Parte Classified Declaration of Lieutenant General Keith B. Alexander, Director of the National Security Agency (Ahern, Paul) (Filed on 10/30/2009)
October 30, 2009 681 Featured Case NOTICE by United States of America re 680 MOTION to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment in 07-cv-693 of Lodging of In Camera, Ex Parte Classified Declaration of Dennis C. Blair, Director of National Intelligence (Ahern, Paul) (Filed on 10/30/2009)
October 30, 2009 680 Featured Case MOTION to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment in 07-cv-693 filed by United States of America. Motion Hearing set for 12/15/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, Public Declaration of Dennis C. Blair, Director of National Intelligence, # 2 Exhibit 2, Public Declaration of Lieutenant General Keith B. Alexander, Director of the National Security Agency, # 3 Exhibit 3, Policies and Procedures Governing Invocation of the State Secrets Privilege)(Ahern, Paul) (Filed on 10/30/2009)
October 29, 2009 679 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 676 Stipulation filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 10/28/09. Government's motion due 10/30/09; plaintiffs' opposition due 12/04/09; reply due 12/08/09; hearing 12/15/09 at 10:00 am. (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2009)
October 28, 2009 678 Featured Case NOTICE by United States of America in 08-cv-4373 of Order by the Court of Appeals Granting Rehearing En Banc (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Ahern, Paul) (Filed on 10/28/2009)
October 26, 2009 677 Featured Case Statement /Certificate by Joe McMurray. (Schwarz, Steven) (Filed on 10/26/2009)
October 26, 2009 676 Featured Case STIPULATION (Third) in 07-cv-693-VRW to Extend Time to Renew Motion to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ahern, Paul) (Filed on 10/26/2009)
October 16, 2009 675 Featured Case STIPULATION in 07-cv-693 to Extend Time to Renew Motion to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Ahern, Paul) (Filed on 10/16/2009)
October 7, 2009 674 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER granting doc 32 in C07-0693 Shubert v Bush filed by United States of America. The government defendants' renewed motion to dismiss and for summary judgment shall be filed no later than 10/20/2009. The plaintiffs' opposition to that motion shall be filed no later than 11/24/2009. Reply shall be filed no later than 12/4/2009. The hearing shall remain set for 12/15/2009 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 10/7/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2009)
October 6, 2009 711 Featured Case Transcript of Proceedings held on 9/23/09, before Judge Walker. Court Reporter/Transcriber James Yeomans, Telephone number (415) 863-5179. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/4/2010. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2009)
October 2, 2009 673 Featured Case STIPULATION in 07-cv-693 to Extend Time to Renew Motion to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment by United States of America. (Ahern, Paul) (Filed on 10/2/2009)
September 14, 2009 672 Featured Case Reply Memorandum re 668 Fourth MOTION for Summary Judgment Government Defendants Notice of Motion and Fourth Motion to Dismiss and For Summary Judgment; Memorandum in Support Thereof and in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment in Al-Haramain et filed byKeith B. Alexander(its Director), Federal Bureau of Investigation(Robert S. Mueller, III, Director), Robert S. Mueller, III, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Adam J Szubin. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 9/14/2009)
September 10, 2009 Featured Case APPEAL Filing fee Received: $ 455.00, receipt number 34611036488. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2009)
September 8, 2009 Featured Case FILING FEE RECEIVED re 667 & re 665 Joint Notice of Appeal: $2,730.00, Receipt Number 34611036308. (tn, COURT STAFF)
September 8, 2009 Featured Case FILING FEE RECEIVED re 667 & re 665 Joint Notice of Appeal: $455.00, Receipt Number 34611036309. (tn, COURT STAFF)
September 8, 2009 671 Featured Case Reply to Opposition Plaintiffs' Reply to Government Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; Plaintiffs' Opposition to Government Defendants' Fourth Motion to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment filed byAl-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Supplemental Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit CC, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit DD, # 4 Affidavit Proof of Service)(Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 9/8/2009)
September 2, 2009 Featured Case FILING FEE RECEIVED re: 665 Joint Notice of Appeal: $455.00, Receipt Number 34611036181. (tn, COURT STAFF)
August 31, 2009 Featured Case FILING FEE RECEIVED re: 666 Notice of Appeal: $455.00, Receipt Number 346110336047. (tn, COURT STAFF)
August 31, 2009 Featured Case FILING FEE RECEIVED re: 667 Joint Notice of Appeal: $455.00, Receipt Number 34611036085. (tn, COURT STAFF)
August 31, 2009 670 Featured Case Transcript Designation and Ordering Form for proceedings held on 9/12/08; 12/2/08 before Judge Walker, (Wiebe, Richard) (Filed on 8/31/2009)
August 27, 2009 669 Featured Case JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT in Shubert et al. v. United States et al. (07-cv-00693-VRW) filed by United States of America. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 8/27/2009)
August 20, 2009 668 Featured Case Fourth MOTION for Summary Judgment Government Defendants Notice of Motion and Fourth Motion to Dismiss and For Summary Judgment; Memorandum in Support Thereof and in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment in Al-Haramain et al. v. Obama et al. (07-cv-109-VRW) filed by Keith B. Alexander(its Director), Federal Bureau of Investigation, Robert S. Mueller, III, National Security Agency(Ltg Keith B. Alexander, Director), Barack Obama, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Adam J Szubin. Motion Hearing set for 9/23/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 8/20/2009)
August 4, 2009 664 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER (as modified) to modify and extend the current schedule in C07-0109. The Government Defendants response to the partial motion for summary judgment is due on 8/20/2009. Reply due 9/8/2009. The matter will be heard on Wednesday, 9/23/2009 at 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 8/3/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2009)
July 31, 2009 667 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEAL. Filing fee $ 455. (Attachments: # 1 2nd half of notice of appeal)(gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2009)
July 31, 2009 666 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEAL as to (639 in M:06-cv-01791-VRW) Order on Motion to Dismiss, (640 in M:06-cv-01791-VRW) Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, (27 in 3:06-cv-05576-VRW) Judgment. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2009)
July 31, 2009 665 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEAL. Filing fee $ 455. (Attachments: # 1 2nd part of Notice of Appeal)(gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2009)
July 31, 2009 663 Featured Case STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Modify and Extend the Current Schedule in Al-Haramain v. Obama (07-cv-109-VRW) by Keith B. Alexander(its Director), Federal Bureau of Investigation, Robert S. Mueller, III, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Adam J Szubin. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 7/31/2009)
July 31, 2009 662 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Request to Schedule Case Management Conference in Shubert v. United States (07-cv-00693-VRW) filed by United States of America. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 7/31/2009)
July 27, 2009 661 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 583 Motion to Dismiss; denying 584 Motion to Dismiss; granting 588 Motion to Dismiss (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2009)
July 20, 2009 660 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker denying 648 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2009)
July 10, 2009 659 Featured Case Proposed Order re 658 Notice (Other) [Proposed] Judgment by AT&T Corp., Sprint Communications Company L.P., Verizon. (Axelbaum, Marc) (Filed on 7/10/2009)
July 10, 2009 658 Featured Case NOTICE by AT&T Corp., Sprint Communications Company L.P., Verizon Notice of Proposed Judgment (Axelbaum, Marc) (Filed on 7/10/2009)
July 9, 2009 657 Featured Case MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc., Wendell Belew, Asim Ghafoor. Motion Hearing set for 9/1/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Eisenberg Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits A-I, # 3 Exhibit Exhibits J-S, # 4 Exhibit Exhibits T-Z, # 5 Exhibit Exhibits AA-BB, # 6 Affidavit Ghafoor Declaration, # 7 Affidavit Belew Declaration, # 8 Affidavit Proof of Service)(Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 7/9/2009)
July 9, 2009 656 Featured Case *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 657 . *** MOTION for Summary Judgment Eisenberg Declaration Exhibits A-I filed by Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc., Wendell Belew, Asim Ghafoor. Motion Hearing set for 9/1/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 7/9/2009) Modified on 7/9/2009 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
July 9, 2009 655 Featured Case *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 657 . *** MOTION for Summary Judgment Declaration of Jon B. Eisenberg in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc., Wendell Belew, Asim Ghafoor. Motion Hearing set for 9/1/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 7/9/2009) Modified on 7/9/2009 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
July 9, 2009 654 Featured Case *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 657 . *** MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc.(an Oregon Nonprofit Corporation), Wendell Belew, Asim Ghafoor. Motion Hearing set for 9/1/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 7/9/2009) Modified on 7/9/2009 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
July 7, 2009 653 Featured Case NOTICE by Joe McMurray re 648 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration (Schwarz, Steven) (Filed on 7/7/2009)
July 2, 2009 652 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re doc 97 in C07-0109 filed by Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc. as follows: 7/10 - plaintiff file motion. 8/5 - file opposition. 8/19 - file reply. Page limit for the motion and opposition has been enlarged to 35 pages. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 7/2/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2009)
July 1, 2009 651 Featured Case NOTICE by All Plaintiffs that Certain MDL Plaintiffs Decline to Amend Complaints (Moore, Thomas) (Filed on 7/1/2009)
June 19, 2009 650 Featured Case Brief (Supplemental) in Opposition to Motions to Dismiss filed byJoe McMurray. (Schwarz, Steven) (Filed on 6/19/2009)
June 19, 2009 649 Featured Case Brief Supplemental Brief in McMurray et al v. Verizon Comm. Inc. et al. (09-cv-00131-VRW) filed byNational Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 6/19/2009)
June 17, 2009 648 Featured Case MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration filed by Joe McMurray. Motion Hearing set for 9/3/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Schwarz, Steven) (Filed on 6/17/2009)
June 16, 2009 647 Featured Case STIPULATION and Request for Briefing Schedule and Extended Page Limits on Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc.. (Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 6/16/2009)
June 11, 2009 646 Featured Case Proposed Order re 640 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Proposed Judgment in State Cases by United States of America. (Haas, Alexander) (Filed on 6/11/2009)
June 8, 2009 645 Featured Case Transcript of Proceedings held on 05/07/09, before Judge Chief Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sahar McVickar, Telephone number (415) 626-6060/sahar_mcvickar@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/3/2009. (McVickar, Sahar) (Filed on 6/8/2009)
June 8, 2009 644 Featured Case Transcript of Proceedings held on 06/03/09, before Judge Chief Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sahar McVickar, Telephone number (415) 626-6060/sahar_mcvickar@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/3/2009. (McVickar, Sahar) (Filed on 6/8/2009)
June 5, 2009 643 Featured Case ORDER. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 6-5-2009. (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2009)
June 3, 2009 642 Featured Case Minute Entry: Show Cause Hearing. C07-0109 Al Haramain v George Bush et al. The Court heard argument from counsel. Plaintiff shall file a motion for summary judgment.Hearing is set for 9/1/09 at 10:00 am. (Court Reporter Sahar McVickar.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/3/2009).
June 3, 2009 641 Featured Case Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 6/3/2009 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker re 11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint in 09-cv-0131-VRW filed by United States of America, National Security Agency, re 16 MOTION to Dismiss of Telecommunications Carrier Defendants filed by AT&T Inc., Verizon Communications Inc, et al. The Court heard argument from counsel. The court invite the parties to simultaneous submission of memoranda re the Court's order in section 802 cases filed today, by no later than 6/19/2009. Upon the filing of the memoranda, the matter will stand submitted. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS:Bruce Afran (by telephone). Steven Schwarz, Carl Mayer (on the phone). COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT:Federal Def:Anthony Coppolino, T Stinson. Verizon: Brian Boynton, R Moss (by phone). AT&T: Eric Shumsky (by phone) (Court Reporter Sahar McVickar.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/3/2009)
June 3, 2009 640 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 536 Motion for Summary Judgment (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2009)
June 3, 2009 639 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 469 Motion to Dismiss (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2009)
June 1, 2009 638 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 635 Motion to Appear by Telephone (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2009)
June 1, 2009 637 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 633 Motion to Appear by Telephone (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2009)
May 29, 2009 636 Featured Case RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Keith B. Alexander, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Federal Bureau of Investigation, National Security Agency, Robert S. Mueller, III, Adam J Szubin, Barack Obama Government Defendants' Response to Court's Order to Show Cause of May 22, 2009 (Dkts. 620/90) in Al-Haramain v. Obama (07-109).. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
May 29, 2009 635 Featured Case MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc.(an Oregon Nonprofit Corporation). Motion Hearing set for 6/3/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
May 29, 2009 634 Featured Case Brief Plaintiffs Memorandum Addressing Appropriateness and Feasibility of Motion by Plaintiffs for Summary Judgment of Liability Under 50 U.S.C. 1810 filed byAl-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc.. (Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
May 27, 2009 633 Featured Case MOTION to Appear by Telephone Administrative Motion filed by Joe McMurray. Motion Hearing set for 6/3/2009 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Schwarz, Steven) (Filed on 5/27/2009)
May 26, 2009 632 Featured Case Statement MDL Plaintiffs' Statement of Recent Decision Re Motion by the United States Seeking to Apply 50 U.S.C. § 1885a to Dismiss These Actions by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 5/26/2009)
May 22, 2009 631 Featured Case Reply Memorandum re 588 MOTION to Dismiss of Telecommunications Carrier Defendants filed byVerizon Communications Inc, BellSouth Corporation, AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc.. (Boynton, Brian) (Filed on 5/22/2009)
May 22, 2009 630 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 6/3/2009 02:00 PM. Defendants' Show Cause Response due by 5/29/2009. Plaintiffs' memorandum due 5/29/2009. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 5/22/2009. (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2009)
May 22, 2009 629 Featured Case Reply to Opposition Government Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss 09-cv-0131-VRW - McMurray et al v. Verizon Comm. Inc. et al. filed byNational Security Agency, United States of America, Barack Obama. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 5/22/2009)
May 19, 2009 628 Featured Case ORDER requiring resubmission of chambers copy of 624 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 5/19/2009. (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2009)
May 18, 2009 627 Featured Case NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re 483 Memorandum in Opposition Notice of New Factual Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion of the United States Seeking to Apply 50 U.S.C. § 1885a To Dismiss These Actions (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 5/18/2009)
May 15, 2009 626 Featured Case RESPONSE to Plaintiffs and Government Defendants Joint Submission in Response to 600 Court's April 17, 2009 Order in Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation of Oregon v. Obama et al. by United States of America. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 5/15/2009) Modified on 5/18/2009 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
May 15, 2009 625 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER AS TO AT&T INC & BELLSOUTH CORP'S MOTION TO DISMISS TAKEN OFF the Court's 6/3/2009 motion calendar re Stipulation filed by AT&T Corp., BellSouth Corporation. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 5/15/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2009)
May 15, 2009 624 Featured Case NOTICE by United States of America of Submission of Materials referenced at May 7, 2009 Hearing in State Cases (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attach#1--VT Letters, # 2 Exhibit Attach#2 -- CT interrogatories/responses)(Haas, Alexander) (Filed on 5/15/2009)
May 14, 2009 623 Featured Case ORDER re 610 Letter filed by Hilary Botein, Virginia Shubert, Sarah Dranoff, Noha Arafa. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 5/14/2009. (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2009)
May 13, 2009 622 Featured Case STIPULATION JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING AT&T INC. & BELLSOUTH CORP.'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION; [PROPOSED] ORDER by BellSouth Corporation, AT&T Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Axelbaum, Marc) (Filed on 5/13/2009)
May 13, 2009 621 Featured Case Transcript of Proceedings held on 05/07/09, before Judge Chief Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sahar McVickar, Telephone number (415) 626-6060/sahar_mcvickar@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/10/2009. (McVickar, Sahar) (Filed on 5/13/2009)
May 12, 2009 620 Featured Case NOTICE by Joe McMurray of Filing of Corrected Response to Government Defendants' and Telecom Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Response to Government Defendants' and Telecom Defendants' Motions to Dismiss)(Schwarz, Steven) (Filed on 5/12/2009)
May 11, 2009 619 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition to Government Defendants' and Telecom Defendants' Motions to Dismiss filed byJoe McMurray. (Schwarz, Steven) (Filed on 5/11/2009)
May 8, 2009 618 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker GRANTING docs 614 and 615 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Responses due by 5/11/2009. Replies due by 5/22/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2009)
May 8, 2009 617 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition re 615 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 588 MOTION to Dismiss of Telecommunications Carrier Defendants Administrative Motion MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 588 MOTION to Dismiss of Telecommunications Carrier Defendants Administrative Motion, 614 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 583 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint in 09-cv-0131-VRW (McMurray et al. v. Verizon Comm. Inc. et al.) by Government Defendants MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complai MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 583 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint in 09-cv-0131-VRW (McMurray et al. v. Verizon Comm. Inc. et al.) by Government Defendants MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complai MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 583 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint in 09-cv-0131-VRW (McMurray et al. v. Verizon Comm. Inc. et al.) by Government Defendants MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complai Government Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend Time (McMurray Action 09-cv-0131-VRW) filed byNational Security Agency(Ltg Keith B. Alexander, Director), United States of America. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 5/8/2009)
May 7, 2009 616 Featured Case Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 5/7/2009 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker. PROCEEDINGS: 1. United States' Motion for Summary Judgment in State cases,doc no 536 in C06-1791. 2. AT&T's motion to dismiss Application to Compel, doc no 22 in C07-1187. 3. The court heard argument from counsel. 4. The court submitted the matters, the court to issue written ruling. (Court Reporter Sahar McVickar.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/7/2009)
May 7, 2009 615 Featured Case MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 588 MOTION to Dismiss of Telecommunications Carrier Defendants Administrative Motion filed by Joe McMurray. Motion Hearing set for 6/3/2009 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Schwarz, Steven) (Filed on 5/7/2009)
May 7, 2009 614 Featured Case MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 583 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint in 09-cv-0131-VRW (McMurray et al. v. Verizon Comm. Inc. et al.) by Government Defendants MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint in 09-cv-0131-VRW (McMurray et al. v. Verizon Comm. Inc. et al.) by Government Defendants Administrative Motion filed by Joe McMurray. Motion Hearing set for 6/3/2009 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Schwarz, Steven) (Filed on 5/7/2009)
May 7, 2009 613 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition to 584 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed byJoe McMurray. (Schwarz, Steven) (Filed on 5/7/2009) Modified on 5/11/2009 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
May 5, 2009 612 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 611 Motion to Appear by Telephone (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2009)
May 5, 2009 611 Featured Case MOTION to Appear by Telephone to Participate in Oral Argument filed by James Douglas Cowie. (Paterson, John) (Filed on 5/5/2009)
May 5, 2009 610 Featured Case Letter from Ilann M. Maazel re: Recent 9th Circuit Authority. (Maazel, Ilann) (Filed on 5/5/2009)
May 4, 2009 609 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 605 Motion to Appear by Telephone (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2009)
May 1, 2009 608 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER approving 607 Stipulation, filed by Robert S. Mueller, III, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Barack Obama, Keith B. Alexander, Adam J Szubin, Federal Bureau of Investigation, National Security Agency. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 5/1/2009. (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2009)
April 30, 2009 607 Featured Case STIPULATION to Extend Time in Response to April 17 Order in Al-Haramain v Obama by Keith B. Alexander, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Federal Bureau of Investigation, National Security Agency, Robert S. Mueller, III, Adam J Szubin, Barack Obama. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 4/30/2009)
April 29, 2009 606 Featured Case NOTICE by Qwest Communications International, Inc. WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE (by Christine Varney) (Benson, Robert) (Filed on 4/29/2009)
April 29, 2009 605 Featured Case MOTION to Appear by Telephone on behalf of Vermont and New Jersey State Officials filed by James Volz, David C. Coen, John D. Burke, David O'Brien. Motion Hearing set for 5/7/2009 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Donofrio, Michael) (Filed on 4/29/2009)
April 25, 2009 604 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 599 Stipulation, filed by Joe McMurray. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 4/25/09. Plaintiffs' response to the pending motions to dismiss now due 5/7/2009; reply briefs due 2/21/2009; hearing continued from 5/14/2009 to 6/3/2009 at 10:30 am. (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2009)
April 23, 2009 603 Featured Case RESPONSE in Support of 594 Unopposed Motion of Defendants AT&T Communications of Southwest, Inc., et al., to Dismiss Plaintiff's Application to Compel filed byAT&T Communications of the Southwest, Inc., SBC Long Distance, LLC, SBC Advanced Solutions, Inc., TCG St. Louis Holdings, Inc., TCG Kansas City, Inc. (Axelbaum, Marc) (Filed on 4/23/2009) Modified on 4/24/2009 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
April 23, 2009 602 Featured Case REPLY to Response to Motion re 536 MOTION for Summary Judgment in the State Cases filed byRobert Clayton. (Heintz, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/23/2009)
April 22, 2009 601 Featured Case REPLY to Response to Motion re 536 MOTION for Summary Judgment in the State Cases on behalf of all states filed byJames Volz, David C. Coen, John D. Burke, David O'Brien. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Donofrio, Michael) (Filed on 4/22/2009)
April 17, 2009 600 Featured Case ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO SUBMIT A STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER ON OR BEFORE MAY 8, 2009. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 4-17-2009. (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2009)
April 15, 2009 599 Featured Case STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Hearing Date and Briefing Schedule on Government's and Telecommunication Carrier Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by Joe McMurray. (Schwarz, Steven) (Filed on 4/15/2009)
April 15, 2009 598 Featured Case NOTICE by Roland Algrant, Adam Kanzer, Michael Kieschnick, Joe Sibilia, Peter Strugatz, Mal Warwick Of Ronald M. Daignault's Withdrawal As Counsel (Daignault, Ronald) (Filed on 4/15/2009)
April 9, 2009 597 Featured Case Statement of Non-Opposition to the United States' Motion for Summary Judgment, Dkt. 536 filed byVerizon, Qwest Communications International, Inc., Sprint Nextel Corporation, AT&T Corp.. (Axelbaum, Marc) (Filed on 4/9/2009)
April 9, 2009 596 Featured Case Reply to Opposition re 536 MOTION for Summary Judgment in the State Cases, 594 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Application to Compel; Supporting Memorandum filed byUnited States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh. A, # 2 Exhibit Exh. B, # 3 Exhibit Exh. C, # 4 Exhibit Exh. D, # 5 Exhibit Exh. E, # 6 Exhibit Exh. F, # 7 Exhibit Exh. G, # 8 Exhibit Exh. H, # 9 Exhibit Exh. I, # 10 Exhibit Exh. J)(Haas, Alexander) (Filed on 4/9/2009)
April 2, 2009 595 Featured Case Proposed Order re 594 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Application to Compel; Supporting Memorandum by AT&T Communications of the Southwest, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), TCG St. Louis Holdings, Inc., TCG Kansas City, Inc., SBC Advanced Solutions, Inc., SBC Long Distance, L.L.C.. (Axelbaum, Marc) (Filed on 4/2/2009)
April 2, 2009 594 Featured Case MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Application to Compel; Supporting Memorandum filed by SBC Long Distance, L.L.C., AT&T Communications of the Southwest, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), TCG St. Louis Holdings, Inc., SBC Advanced Solutions, Inc., TCG Kansas City, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/7/2009 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Axelbaum, Marc) (Filed on 4/2/2009)
March 20, 2009 593 Featured Case NOTICE by Tash Hepting Association of Counsel (Moore, Thomas) (Filed on 3/20/2009)
March 20, 2009 592 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition re 536 MOTION for Summary Judgment in the State Cases filed byRobert Clayton. (Heintz, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/20/2009)
March 20, 2009 591 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition re 536 MOTION for Summary Judgment in the State Cases filed byJames Douglas Cowie. (Paterson, John) (Filed on 3/20/2009)
March 20, 2009 590 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition re 536 MOTION for Summary Judgment in the State Cases on behalf of all States filed byMaine Public Utilities Commission Chairman, Maine Public Utilities Commission Commissioner, Maine Public Utilities Commission Administrative Director. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Response of Verizon to MePUC Complaint))(Taub, Christopher) (Filed on 3/20/2009)
March 16, 2009 589 Featured Case Proposed Order re 588 MOTION to Dismiss of Telecommunications Carrier Defendants by Verizon Communications Inc, BellSouth Corporation, AT&T Corp., AT&T, Inc.. (Axelbaum, Marc) (Filed on 3/16/2009)
March 16, 2009 588 Featured Case MOTION to Dismiss of Telecommunications Carrier Defendants filed by Verizon Communications Inc, BellSouth Corporation, AT&T Corp., AT&T, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/14/2009 02:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Axelbaum, Marc) (Filed on 3/16/2009)
March 16, 2009 587 Featured Case Proposed Order re 584 MOTION to Dismiss of Specially Appearing Defendants AT&T Inc. and BellSouth Corporation to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by BellSouth Corporation, AT&T, Inc.. (Axelbaum, Marc) (Filed on 3/16/2009)
March 16, 2009 586 Featured Case Declaration of Thomas Koch in Support of 584 MOTION to Dismiss of Specially Appearing Defendants AT&T Inc. and BellSouth Corporation to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed byBellSouth Corporation, AT&T, Inc.. (Related document(s) 584 ) (Axelbaum, Marc) (Filed on 3/16/2009)
March 16, 2009 585 Featured Case Declaration of James Lacy in Support of 584 MOTION to Dismiss of Specially Appearing Defendants AT&T Inc. and BellSouth Corporation to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed byBellSouth Corporation, AT&T, Inc.. (Related document(s) 584 ) (Axelbaum, Marc) (Filed on 3/16/2009)
March 16, 2009 584 Featured Case MOTION to Dismiss of Specially Appearing Defendants AT&T Inc. and BellSouth Corporation to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by BellSouth Corporation, AT&T, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/14/2009 02:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Axelbaum, Marc) (Filed on 3/16/2009)
March 13, 2009 583 Featured Case MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint in 09-cv-0131-VRW (McMurray et al. v. Verizon Comm. Inc. et al.) by Government Defendants filed by National Security Agency, United States of America. Motion Hearing set for 5/14/2009 02:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 3/13/2009)
March 10, 2009 582 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER. The Telecommunication Carrier Defendants shall have until 4/3/2009 to file an Answer or otherwise Respond to the Complaint in McMurray v Verizon Communication, Inc et al., C09-0131 VRW re 9 filed by Joe McMurray, AT&T Corporation, Verizon Communications Inc, National Security Agency. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 3/10/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2009)
March 3, 2009 Featured Case Set Schedule/Time for Hearing: Opposition to the United States' motion for summary judgment in the State Cases - 3/20/2009. United States Replies in support or its motion and Telecomm carrier defendants Respond to the govt's motion and any Responses thereto - 4/9/2009. Sur-reply of the State Officials - 4/23/2009. Hearing on the United States' Motion set for 5/7/2009 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2009)
February 27, 2009 581 Featured Case NOTICE by Office of Foreign Assets Control, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Keith B. Alexander, National Security Agency, Robert S. Mueller, III, Adam J Szubin, Barack Obama Government Defendants' Notice of Lodging of In Camera, Ex Parte Classified Declaration of Andrea M. Gacki, Department of the Treasury (Al-Haramain et al. v. Obama et al. 07-cv-109-VRW) (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 2/27/2009)
February 27, 2009 580 Featured Case NOTICE by Keith B. Alexander, National Security Agency, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Robert S. Mueller, III, Adam J Szubin, Barack Obama Government Defendants' Notice of Lodging of In Camera, Ex Parte Classified Declaration of Anthony J. Coppolino, Department of Justice (Al-Haramain et al. v. Obama et al. (07-cv-109-VRW) (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 2/27/2009)
February 27, 2009 579 Featured Case NOTICE by Keith B. Alexander, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Federal Bureau of Investigation, National Security Agency, Robert S. Mueller, III, Adam J Szubin, Barack Obama Government Defendants' Notice of Lodging of In Camera, Ex Parte Classified Declaration of John F. Hackett, Office of the Director of National Intelligence (Al-Haramain et al. v. Obama et al. 07-cv-109-VRW) (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 2/27/2009)
February 27, 2009 578 Featured Case NOTICE by Keith B. Alexander, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Federal Bureau of Investigation, National Security Agency, Robert S. Mueller, III, Adam J Szubin, Barack Obama Government Defendants' Notice of Lodging of In Camera, Ex Parte Classified Declaration of Joseph J. Brand, National Security Agency (Al-Haramain et. al. v. Obama et al. 07-cv-109-VRW) (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 2/27/2009)
February 27, 2009 577 Featured Case Brief Government Defendants' Report on Declassification Review (Al-Haramain et al. v. Obama et al. (07-cv-109-VRW) filed byKeith B. Alexander, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Federal Bureau of Investigation, National Security Agency, Robert S. Mueller, III, Adam J Szubin, Barack Obama. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Joseph J. Brand, National Security Agency, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of John F. Hackett, Office of the Director of National Intelligence)(Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 2/27/2009)
February 27, 2009 576 Featured Case Brief Government Defendants' Response to Court Orders Concerning Compliance with the January 5 Order (Dkt. 71) and Response to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Case Management Report (Dkt. 75) in Al-Haramain et al. v. Obama et al. (070cv0109-VRW) filed byKeith B. Alexander, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Federal Bureau of Investigation, National Security Agency, Robert S. Mueller, III, Adam J Szubin, Barack Obama. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 2/27/2009)
February 27, 2009 575 Featured Case STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Extending Response Date for the Telecommunications Carriers by United States, Verizon, Joe McMurray, AT&T Corp.. (Axelbaum, Marc) (Filed on 2/27/2009)
February 26, 2009 574 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER approving 570 Stipulation filed by United States of America to modify briefing and hearing schedule. Opposition now due 3/20/2009; reply briefs due 4/9/2009; surreply due 4/23/2009; hearing 5/7/2009. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 2/24/2009. (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2009)
February 25, 2009 573 Featured Case Brief MDL Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief Opposing The Motion of the United States Seeking Summary Judgment Under 50 U.S.C. § 1885a, Pursuant to the Court's February 11, 2009 Supplemental Briefing Order filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 2/25/2009)
February 25, 2009 572 Featured Case Brief United States' Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment filed byUnited States Of America. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 2/25/2009)
February 25, 2009 571 Featured Case Brief SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF OF TELECOMMUNICATIONS CARRIER DEFENDANTS IN SUPPORT OF THE UNITED STATES' MOTION TO DISMISS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed byVerizon, Sprint Communications Company L.P., AT&T Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A)(Axelbaum, Marc) (Filed on 2/25/2009)
February 24, 2009 570 Featured Case STIPULATION re 539 Clerks Notice Continuing Motion Hearing,, to reset briefing and hearing schedule by United States of America. (Haas, Alexander) (Filed on 2/24/2009)
February 23, 2009 569 Featured Case NOTICE by United States of America Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance (Orleans, Renee) (Filed on 2/23/2009)
February 20, 2009 568 Featured Case NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Jennifer Leigh Heintz (Heintz, Jennifer) (Filed on 2/20/2009)
February 20, 2009 567 Featured Case ORDER by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 564 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Government Defendants' unopposed motion for an extension of time to submit a report on the declassification review previously ordered by the Court, Order dated 1/5/2009, shall be and hereby is GRANTED, and the required report shall be due by no later than 2/27/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2009)
February 19, 2009 566 Featured Case ORDER In its submission to the court re 562 Order on Motion to Stay, the United States is directed to address points made in plaintiffs supplemental case management statement filed on February 18, 2009 (Doc #563). Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 2/19/09. (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2009)
February 19, 2009 565 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker denying 557 Motion to treat pending dispositive motion (docket #469) as applicable to newly-transferred case and extending United States' time to plead or otherwise respond until April 3, 2009 (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2009)
February 19, 2009 564 Featured Case Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Government Defendants' Unopposed Administrative Motion to Extend Time to Submit Report on Declassification Review in Al-Haramain et al. v. Obama et al., 07-cv-109) filed by Keith B. Alexander, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Federal Bureau of Investigation, National Security Agency, Robert S. Mueller, III, Adam J Szubin, Barack Obama. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 2/19/2009)
February 18, 2009 563 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Plaintiffs' Supplemental Case Management Statement filed by Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc.(an Oregon Nonprofit Corporation). (Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 2/18/2009)
February 13, 2009 562 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker denying 545 motion to certify interlocutory appeal pursuant to 29 USC § 1292(b) and motion to stay proceedings (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2009)
February 11, 2009 561 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition to United States' Administrative 557 Motion filed byAmidax Trading Group, Jane Gentile-Youd, Mark Gentile-Youd, G. Lawrence Gettier, Linda Gettier, Jit Gill, Mike Gilmore, Jayson Gleason, Marc Goldstone, Todd Graff, Janet Granja, Susan Grossman, Stephanie Gustave, Pam Haddon, Vern Haddon, Don Hawkings, Donna Hawkings, Jose V. Heinert, Lamar Henderson, Carolyn R. Hensley, Douglas S. Hensley, Donald Herron, Joyce Jackson, Andrew Jaffe, Randel James, Michael Johnson, Diane Juliano, Fay Kaiser, Rajendram Krishnan, Barbara Langer, Michael Lavo, Fred Leak, Ken Leha, Ben Lindsey, Lisa Lockwood, Nancy K. Lorey, Michael T. Lyda, Eleanor M. Lynn, Esq, Terry Mancour, Charlene Mann, Rev, Alicia McCollum, James McGrattan, Joe McMurray, Stephanie Meket, Clyde Michael Morgan, Sharon Ann Morris, Theodore Jonathan Morris, Sheri A. Mueller, Fran Nobile, Serge Popper, Ilene Pruett, Michael Reusch, Michele Rosen, Michele S. Rothmel, Kevin Shawler, Greg L. Smith, Harris Sondak, James Van Alstine, Chris Von Obenauer, Ray Anderson, Collin Baber, Julie Davis, Sharon L. Davis, Dawn Furler, C. Garifo, Mark Baker, Jennifer Hontz, Ms. Lodge, Brad Marston, Jon Paul McClellan, Robert Newby, Merrilyn Rome, Dan Patton, Ray Pena, Constance Phillips, Mark Plante, Jeremy Puhlman, Martin Razo, Daniel Reimann, Mark Richards, Linda Rithkis, William Robinette, Fred Rogers, Darlene Rogers, Kathleen Rogers, Bronson Rosier, Josh Seefried, Anna F. Shallenberger, Royce Shepard, Robert Siden, Christian Stalberg, Michael L. Stephan, Robert Stewart, Donna A. Stone, Paul Sunberg, Regina Sunberg, William R. Sweeney, Jr, David Taylor, April Tipe, Allen T. Trader, III, Barry W. Tribble, Fred Trinkoff, Thomas Vilar, Vickie Votaw, Leon Dwight Wallace, Achieng Warambo, Ulrich Geister, David White, Beth White, Jane Winston, Kevin Wright, Joel Ainger, Carol Cose, Deborah Dougherty, James Flynn, Kraft, Gina De Miranda, Catalina R. Thompson, Mary Leah Weiss, Elizabeth Arnone, Eleanor Lynn, Jay H. Rowell, Vivian Phillips, Jeffrey G. Marsocci, Bridget Irving, James Hall, John McIntyre, John Barrett, Anthony Bartelemy, William Betz, Fran Blamer, Trudy Bond, Kristen Brink, Shane Brink, Michael Brooks, Paul Bruney, Peter Catizone, Steve Christianson, John Clark, Kingsley Clark, Thomas M. Cleaver, Gerard P. Clerkin, Peter B. Collins, Kris Costa, Mark Costa, Toni DiDona, Theresa R. Duffy, Thomas S. Dwyer, Thomas Michael Fain, Deadria Farmer-Paellmann, Shawn Fitzgibbons, John Fitzpatrick, Jennifer Florio, Margaret Franklin, Diane Gavlinski, Joseph Gehring. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Amnesty International Complaint, # 2 Exhibit B - McMurray Complaint, # 3 Exhibit C - Jewel Complaint)(Schwarz, Steven) (Filed on 2/11/2009) Modified on 2/13/2009 (aaa, Court Staff).
February 11, 2009 560 Featured Case Reply to Opposition Government Defendants' Reply in Support of 545 Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal and for Certification of Interlocutory Review under 28 USC 1292(b) (Al-Haramain et al. v. Obama et al.) filed byKeith B. Alexander, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Federal Bureau of Investigation, National Security Agency, Robert S. Mueller, III, Adam J Szubin, Barack Obama. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 2/11/2009) Modified on 2/13/2009 (aaa, Court Staff).
February 11, 2009 559 Featured Case ORDER requesting supplemental briefing re 469 MOTION to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment filed by United States Of America. The parties are to submit to the court, on or before 2/25/2009, supplemental briefs not to exceed 20 pages on constitutional question. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 2/11/2009. (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2009)
February 11, 2009 558 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker denying 543 Ex Parte Application for continuance of hearing date. State officials' opposition brief due 3/11/2009; United States' reply AND telecommunication carriers' brief due 3/18/2009; state officials' surreply due 3/25/2009. (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2009)
February 6, 2009 557 Featured Case MOTION United States' Administrative Motion to Treat Recently Transferred McMurray Action As Subject to Pending Dispositive Motion re 541 Clerks Notice filed on behalf of all Government Defendants filed by National Security Agency(Ltg Keith B. Alexander, Director), United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Appendix)(Freeborne, Paul) (Filed on 2/6/2009)
February 6, 2009 556 Featured Case MEMORANDUM in Opposition Plaintiffs' Opposition to 545 Defendants' Motion for Stay Pending Appeal and for Certification of an Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b) filed byAl-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc.. (Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 2/6/2009) Modified on 2/9/2009 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
January 28, 2009 555 Featured Case ORDER by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker DENYING AS MOOT [Doc 19 in C07-1115] Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to supplement their complaint. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2009)
January 28, 2009 554 Featured Case ORDER by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker DENYING [Doc 533] Mohamed Abdullah Warsame and Jonathan Lee Riches' Motion to Intervene. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2009)
January 26, 2009 553 Featured Case RESPONSE in Support re 543 Joint Ex Parte Application re 536 MOTION for Summary Judgment in the State CasesJoint Ex Parte Application re 536 MOTION for Summary Judgment in the State Cases filed byDavid L. Cowie. (Paterson, John) (Filed on 1/26/2009)
January 22, 2009 552 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Corrected) filed by Barack Obama, Keith B. Alexander, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Robert S. Mueller, III, Adam J Szubin. (Haas, Alexander) (Filed on 1/22/2009)
January 22, 2009 551 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Keith B. Alexander, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Federal Bureau of Investigation, George W. Bush, National Security Agency, Robert S. Mueller, III. (Haas, Alexander) (Filed on 1/22/2009)
January 21, 2009 550 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT CELLCO PARTNERSHIP in McMurray v Verizon, C09-0131 VRW re [Doc #542] Stipulation filed by AT&T Inc., BellSouth Corp., AT&T Corp. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 1/21/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2009)
January 21, 2009 549 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition re 543 Joint Ex Parte Application re 536 MOTION for Summary Judgment in the State CasesJoint Ex Parte Application re 536 MOTION for Summary Judgment in the State Cases filed byUnited States of America. (Haas, Alexander) (Filed on 1/21/2009)
January 20, 2009 548 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc.. (Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 1/20/2009)
January 20, 2009 547 Featured Case *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 548 . *** CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc.. (Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 1/20/2009) Modified on 1/21/2009 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
January 19, 2009 546 Featured Case NOTICE by Keith B. Alexander, George W. Bush(President of the United States), Office of Foreign Assets Control, Federal Bureau of Investigation, National Security Agency, Robert S. Mueller, III, Adam J Szubin Govrnment Defendants' Notice of Filing Correspondence re Al-Haramain v. Bush (07-cv-109) (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 1/19/2009)
January 19, 2009 545 Featured Case MOTION to Stay re 544 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Notice of Motion and Motion for a Stay Pending Appeal and for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal in Al-Haramain v Bush (07-cv-109) filed by Keith B. Alexander, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Federal Bureau of Investigation, George W. Bush, National Security Agency, Robert S. Mueller, III, Adam J Szubin. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Stay Pending Appeal and Certification of Interlocutory Appeal)(Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 1/19/2009)
January 16, 2009 544 Featured Case NOTICE by Keith B. Alexander, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Federal Bureau of Investigation, George W. Bush, National Security Agency, Robert S. Mueller, III, Adam J Szubin Notice of Appeal by Government Defendants in Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation of Oregon et al v. Bush et al (07-cv-109) (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 1/16/2009)
January 15, 2009 543 Featured Case Joint Ex Parte Application re 536 MOTION for Summary Judgment in the State Cases filed by Robert M. Clayton, III. Motion Hearing set for 4/1/2009 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Whipple, Peggy) (Filed on 1/15/2009)
January 13, 2009 542 Featured Case STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING NEW CASE AND NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT CELLCO PARTNERSHIP by AT&T Corp., BellSouth Corp., AT&T Inc.. (Axelbaum, Marc) (Filed on 1/13/2009)
January 13, 2009 541 Featured Case CLERKS NOTICE Advising Counsel of Receipt of the Action Rev. Joe McMurray, et al -v- Verizon Communications, Inc. from the Southern District of New York. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2009)
January 5, 2009 539 Featured Case CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing : YOU ARE NOTIFIED THAT the Court has rescheduled the hearing on the United States Motion for Summary Judgment on the telecommunication carrier cases listed above for April 1, 2009 at 10:30 A.M. Please report to Courtroom 6, on the 17th floor, 450 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco, California. Parties requesting a continuance shall submit a stipulation and proposed order. If parties are unable to reach a stipulation, the requesting party shall submit an exparte application with a proposed order. Motion Hearing set for 4/1/2009 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2009)
January 5, 2009 538 Featured Case Reply Memorandum United States' Response to Plaintiffs' Notice of New Legal and Factual Authorities (Dkt. 535) filed byUnited States Of America. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 1/5/2009)
January 5, 2009 537 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 472 Motion to discover or obtain material relating to electronic surveillance -- § 1806(f); denying 475 Motion to Dismiss (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2009)
December 23, 2008 Featured Case Set/Reset Hearings: United States' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc #536) hearing rescheduled for 4/1/2009 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2008)
December 23, 2008 540 Featured Case TRANSFER ORDER to the Northern District of California from Southern District of New York for inclusion in MDL 1791. Reverend Joe McMurray, et al. v. Verizon Communications, Inc., et al. S.D. New York No. 1:08-6264. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2008)
December 23, 2008 536 Featured Case MOTION for Summary Judgment in the State Cases filed by United States of America. Motion Hearing set for 3/26/2009 02:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Haas, Alexander) (Filed on 12/23/2008)
December 19, 2008 535 Featured Case NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of New Legal and Factual Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion of the United States Seeking to Apply 50 U.S.C. §1885a to Dismiss These Actions (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 12/19/2008)
December 10, 2008 534 Featured Case Letter from The Electronic Frontier Foundation Re: In Re NSA Telecomm. Records Litig., MDL Docket No. 06-1791 VRW. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 12/10/2008)
December 9, 2008 532 Featured Case Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/02/08, before Judge Chief Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sahar McVickar, Telephone number (415) 626-6060/sahar_mcvickar@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/6/2009. (McVickar, Sahar) (Filed on 12/9/2008)
December 9, 2008 531 Featured Case Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/02/08, before Judge Chief Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sahar McVickar, Telephone number (415) 626-6060/sahar_mcvickar@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/6/2009. (McVickar, Sahar) (Filed on 12/9/2008)
December 5, 2008 533 Featured Case MOTION for Reconsideration and Clarification; MOTION to Intervene filed by Jonathan Lee Riches. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2008)
December 2, 2008 530 Featured Case Minute Entry: Hearing Pertaining to Govt's Motion to Dismiss and/or Motion for Summary Judgment and Plaintiffs' Motion to Discover or Obtain Materials Relating to Electronic Surveillance under FISA Section 1806(f) in the Al-Haramain case held on 12/2/2008 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker. The court heard argument from counsel.The matter has been submitted.The court to issue written order. (Court Reporter Sahar McVickar.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/2/2008)
December 2, 2008 529 Featured Case Minute Entry: Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and/or Motion for Summary Judgment held on 12/2/2008 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker. The court heard argument from counsel.The matter has been submitted.The court to issue written order. (Court Reporter Sahar McVickar.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/2/2008)
December 1, 2008 528 Featured Case ORDER SETTING QUESTIONS FOR HEARING 12-2-08. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 12/1/08. (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2008)
November 26, 2008 527 Featured Case ORDER. Plaintiffs herein have submitted a request for voluntary dismissal without prejudice of their claims against defendants AT&T Corp and AT&T Inc on the ground that they "no longer desire to prosecute their suit, as filed, against defendants." MDL Doc #518. Good cause appearing, the motion for voluntary dismissal is GRANTED under the authority of FRCP 41(a)(2).. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 11/26/2008. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2008)
November 25, 2008 526 Featured Case Joinder re 483 Memorandum in Opposition by New York Times. (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 11/25/2008)
November 24, 2008 525 Featured Case CLERKS NOTICE : TO ALL PARTIES AND COUNSEL OF RECORD;YOU ARE NOTIFIED THAT the Court has set the following schedule:December 2, 2008 - Hearing at 10:00 A.M. MDL Telecom Carrier Cases (including Hepting v AT&T (06-0672 VRW) - Govt's motion to dismiss or for Summary Judgment. December 2, 2008 - Hearing at 2:00 P.M. Al-Haramain et al v George Bush (07-0109 VRW) - Govt's motion to dismiss or for Summary Judgment. Plaintiffs' Motion for Discovery under FISA Section 1806(f). Please report to Courtroom No.6, on the 17th floor at 450 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco, California. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2008)
November 20, 2008 524 Featured Case RESPONSE to Briefs of the Carriers and of the United States Seeking to Apply 50 U.S.C. § 1885a To Dismiss These Actions by All Plaintiffs. (Opsahl, Kurt) (Filed on 11/20/2008)
November 20, 2008 523 Featured Case Joinder re 483 Memorandum in Opposition by Associated Press, Los Angeles Times, San Jose Mercury News, USA Today. (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 11/20/2008)
November 20, 2008 522 Featured Case NOTICE by Tash Hepting of Withdrawal of Appearance and Request for Removal From Electronic Notification Service List (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Fram, Robert) (Filed on 11/20/2008)
November 19, 2008 521 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 513 Motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Howard M. Wasserman representing Amici Curiae Law Professors collectively. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2008)
November 19, 2008 520 Featured Case Reply to Opposition Corrected Version United States' Reply in Support of 469 Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment (Dkt. 509) filed by United States of America. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 11/19/2008) Modified on 11/20/2008 (slh, COURT STAFF).
November 14, 2008 517 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re [Doc #471]. Plaintiffs herein have filed an unopposed request (Doc #514) to modify the subject matters of their forthcoming "response to carrier brief" from what is specified in the stipulation and order dated 9/24/2008 (Doc #471). Any party may devote its briefs in this matter to any subject or subjects so long as the previously ordered page limits are observed. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 11/14/2008. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2008)
November 14, 2008 516 Featured Case Reply to Opposition re 475 Third MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, for Summary Judgment Government Defendants' Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Government Defendants' Third Motion to Dismiss or For Summary Judgment (Al-Haramain v. Bush Case O7-cv-109) filed byUnited States of America. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 11/14/2008)
November 14, 2008 515 Featured Case Reply to Opposition Plaintiffs Reply to Defendants Opposition to 472 Motion Pursuant to 50 U.S.C. § 1806(f) to Discover or Obtain Material Relating to Electronic Surveillance filed by Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc.. (Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 11/14/2008) Modified on 11/20/2008 (slh, COURT STAFF).
November 13, 2008 514 Featured Case Letter from Plaintiffs Request to Include Plaintiffs' Response to Government Reply Brief in Carrier Response Brief Due November 20, 2008. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 11/13/2008)
November 12, 2008 519 Featured Case Proposed Order granting 518 MOTION to Dismiss by Ron Antosko, James E. Chadden, Sr, Mary J. Trevino. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2008)
November 12, 2008 518 Featured Case MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice filed by Mary J. Trevino, Ron Antosko, James E. Chadden, Sr. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2008) (slh, COURT STAFF).
November 6, 2008 512 Featured Case Transcript of Proceedings held on 9-12-2008, before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, Telephone number (415) 431-1477. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/2/2009. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 11/6/2008)
November 6, 2008 511 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Vaughn R. Walker granting 506 Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2008)
November 5, 2008 513 Featured Case MOTION of Howard M. Wasserman for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611025204) filed by Steven G. Calabresi, Don Doernberg, Richard D. Freer, Stephen B. Presser, Robert J. Pushaw, Ronald D. Rotunda, Stephen F. Smith, Michael E. Solimine, William W. Van Alstyne. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2008)
November 5, 2008 510 Featured Case NOTICE by United States of America re 509 Reply to Opposition, United States' Notice of Lodging Classified Supplemental Reply for In Camera, Ex Parte Review (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 11/5/2008)
November 5, 2008 509 Featured Case Reply to Opposition re 469 MOTION to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment United States' Reply to Plaintiffs' Opportion to United States' Motion to Dismiss or For Summary Judgment (Dkt 469) filed byUnited States of America. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 11/5/2008)
November 5, 2008 508 Featured Case Brief re 469 MOTION to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment of Telecommunications Carrier Defendants filed byVerizon, Sprint Communications Company L.P., AT&T Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) 469 ) (Boynton, Brian) (Filed on 11/5/2008)
November 5, 2008 507 Featured Case Brief re 506 First MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief In Support of (1) the Constitutionality of SCC 802 of the Foreign Intelligence Surveillance Act of 1978 Amendments Act of 2008, and (2) The motion of the United States to Dismiss (Dkt. 469); [Proposed] Order
November 5, 2008 506 Featured Case First MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief In Support of (1) the Constitutionality of SCC 802 of the Foreign Intelligence Surveillance Act of 1978 Amendments Act of 2008, and (2) The motion of the United States to Dismiss (Dkt. 469); [Proposed] Order filed by Amici Curiae Law Professors. Motion Hearing set for 12/1/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Chun, Brian) (Filed on 11/5/2008)
November 5, 2008 505 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Vaughn R. Walker granting 504 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2008)
October 28, 2008 504 Featured Case MOTION of Aziz Huq for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611024834) filed by Brennan Center for Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2008)
October 24, 2008 503 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO INTERVENE. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 10-24-08. (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2008)
October 24, 2008 502 Featured Case ORDER by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker GRANTING 500 Motion for Leave to File Brief on Behalf of Amicus Curiae Brennan Center for Justice. Brief not to exceed 20 pages. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2008)
October 24, 2008 501 Featured Case Brief re 500 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief In Opposition to Gov't Motion to Dismiss filed byBrennan Center for Justice. (Related document(s) 500 ) (Hong, Kari) (Filed on 10/24/2008)
October 24, 2008 500 Featured Case MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief filed by Brennan Center for Justice. Motion Hearing set for 12/2/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Hong, Kari) (Filed on 10/24/2008)
October 23, 2008 499 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition re 472 MOTION Pursuant to 50 USC §1806(f) to Discover or Obtain Material Relating to Electronic Surveillance MOTION Pursuant to 50 USC §1806(f) to Discover or Obtain Material Relating to Electronic Surveillance MOTION Pursuant to 50 USC §1806(f) to Discover or Obtain Material Relating to Electronic Surveillance Government Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion Pursuant to 50 U.S.C. 1806(f) to Discover or Obtain Material Relating to Electronic Surveillance filed byUnited States of America. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 10/23/2008)
October 23, 2008 498 Featured Case Response Response of AT&T Corp. to Hepting Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Relate Jewel to Hepting [Docket Nos. 383-84] byAT&T Corp.. (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 10/23/2008)
October 23, 2008 497 Featured Case *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 498 . *** Response re 383 Transcript Response of AT&T Corp. to Hepting Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Relate Jewel to Hepting [Docket Nos. 383-84] byAT&T Corp.. (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 10/23/2008) Modified on 10/24/2008 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
October 23, 2008 496 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Third Party Motion to Dismiss, or, in the Alternative, For Summary Judgment filed byAl-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc.. (Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 10/23/2008)
October 17, 2008 483 Featured Case MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 482 Memorandum in Opposition Corrected Memorandum in Opposition to Motion of the United States Seeking to Apply FISAAA 802 filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Related document(s) 482 ) (Opsahl, Kurt) (Filed on 10/17/2008)
October 16, 2008 495 Featured Case Evidence in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion of the United States Seeking to Apply FISAAA Section 802 (50 U.S.C. Section 1885 A) to Dismiss These Actions 2 books filed by Counsel for AT&T Class Plaintiffs and Co-Lead Coordinating Counsel. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2008)
October 16, 2008 494 Featured Case Evidence in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion of the United States Seeking to Apply FISAAA Section 802 (50 U.S.C. Section 1885 A) to Dismiss These Actions 2 books filed by Counsel for AT&T Class Plaintiffs and Co-Lead Coordinating Counsel.(gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2008)
October 16, 2008 493 Featured Case Evidence in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion of the United States Seeking to Apply FISAAA Section 802 (50 U.S.C. Section 1885 A) to Dismiss These Actions Volume VIII: Exhibits 87-98 filed by Counsel for AT&T Class Plaintiffs and Co-Lead Coordinating Counsel. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2008)
October 16, 2008 492 Featured Case Evidence in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion of the United States Seeking to Apply FISAAA Section 802 (50 U.S.C. Section 1885 A) to Dismiss These Actions Volume VII: Exhibit 86 filed by Counsel for AT&T Class Plaintiffs and Co-Lead Coordinating Counsel.(gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2008)
October 16, 2008 491 Featured Case Evidence in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion of the United States Seeking to Apply FISAAA Section 802 (50 U.S.C. Section 1885 A) to Dismiss These Actions Volume VI: Exhibits 79-85 filed by Counsel for AT&T Class Plaintiffs and Co-Lead Coordinating Counsel.(gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2008)
October 16, 2008 490 Featured Case Evidence in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion of the United States Seeking to Apply FISAAA Section 802 (50 U.S.C. Section 1885 A) to Dismiss These Actions Volume V: Exhibits 76-78 filed by Counsel for AT&T Class Plaintiffs and Co-Lead Coordinating Counsel. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2008)
October 16, 2008 489 Featured Case Evidence in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion of the United States Seeking to Apply FISAAA Section 802 (50 U.S.C. Section 1885 A) to Dismiss These Actions Volume IV: Exhibits 41-75 filed by Counsel for AT&T Class Plaintiffs and Co-Lead Coordinating Counsel.(gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2008)
October 16, 2008 488 Featured Case Evidence in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion of the United States Seeking to Apply FISAAA Section 802 (50 U.S.C. Section 1885 A) to Dismiss These Actions Volume III: Exhibits 18-40 filed by Counsel for AT&T Class Plaintiffs and Co-Lead Coordinating Counsel.(gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2008)
October 16, 2008 487 Featured Case Evidence in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion of the United States Seeking to Apply FISAAA Section 802 (50 U.S.C. Section 1885 A) to Dismiss These Actions Volume II: Exhibits 11-17 filed by Counsel for AT&T Class Plaintiffs and Co-Lead Coordinating Counsel. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2008)
October 16, 2008 486 Featured Case Evidence in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion of the United States Seeking to Apply FISAAA Section 802 (50 U.S.C. Section 1885 A) to Dismiss These Actions Volume I: Exhibits 1-10 filed by Counsel for AT&T Class Plaintiffs and Co-Lead Coordinating Counsel. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2008) Modified on 10/22/2008 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
October 16, 2008 485 Featured Case CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 484 Notice (Other) by Plaintiffs. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2008)
October 16, 2008 484 Featured Case NOTICE of Manual Filing by Plaintiffs (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2008)
October 16, 2008 482 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition to Motion of the United States Seeking to Apply FISAAA 802 filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Opsahl, Kurt) (Filed on 10/16/2008)
October 16, 2008 481 Featured Case Appendix FRE 1006 Summary of Voluminous Evidence in Support of Plaintiffs Opposition filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Opsahl, Kurt) (Filed on 10/16/2008)
October 16, 2008 480 Featured Case CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs via Federal Express of Notice of Manual Filing and Evidence in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion of the United States seeking to Apply FISAAA § 802 (50 U.S.C. § 1885a) to Dismiss These Actions (Opsahl, Kurt) (Filed on 10/16/2008)
October 16, 2008 479 Featured Case Declaration of Kurt Opsahl Regarding Plaintiff's Evidence Rule 1006 Summary of Voluminous Evidence Filed in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion of the United States Seeking to Apply FISAAA § 802 (50 U.S.C. § 1885a) to Dismiss These Actions filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-98 (Notice of Manual Filing))(Opsahl, Kurt) (Filed on 10/16/2008)
October 16, 2008 478 Featured Case DECLARATION of Cindy Cohn Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(f) In Opposition to Motion of the United States Seeking to Apply FISAAA § 802 (50 U.S.C. § 1885a) to Dismiss These Actions filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Opsahl, Kurt) (Filed on 10/16/2008)
October 16, 2008 477 Featured Case OBJECTIONS to re 469 MOTION to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs' Evidentiary Objections to Certifications (Public and Ex Parte In Camera) by the Attorney General of the United States; and to Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment by All Plaintiffs. (Opsahl, Kurt) (Filed on 10/16/2008)
October 1, 2008 476 Featured Case NOTICE by Verizon Communications, Inc. Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance and Request for Removal from Electronic Notification Service List (Heller, William) (Filed on 10/1/2008)
September 30, 2008 475 Featured Case Third MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, for Summary Judgment filed by Keith B. Alexander, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Federal Bureau of Investigation, George W. Bush, National Security Agency, Robert S. Mueller, III. Motion Hearing set for 12/2/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits 1-12, # 3 Exhibit Exhibits 13-19)(Haas, Alexander) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
September 30, 2008 474 Featured Case AMENDED MINUTE ORDER re (468 in M:06-cv-01791-VRW): SCHEDULE: Al-Haramain v Bush (07-0109 VRW): 9/30/08 - Govt Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment (30 pages)9/30/08 - Plaintiffs' Motion for Discovery under FISA Section 1806(f) (30 pages)10/23/08 - Govt Defendants' Opposition (30 pages)10/23/08 - Plaintiffs' Opposition (30 pages)11/14/08 - Govt Defendants' and Plaintiffs' Reply Briefs (15 pages)12/2/08 - Hearing at 10:00 A.M. SCHEDULE: MDL Telecom Carrier Cases (MDL06-1791 ) (including Hepting v ATT (06-0672 VRW): 9/19/08 - Govt's Motion to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment(filed 9/9/08) (25 pages)10/16/08 - Plaintiffs' Opposition (50 pages per stipulation)11/5/08 - Govt's Reply (35 pages per stipulation)11/5/08 - Brief of Telecom Carrier Defendants (30 pages)11/20/08 - Plaintiffs' Reply to Telecom Carriers (35 pages per stipulation)12/2/08 - Hearing at 10:00 A.M. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
September 30, 2008 473 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER RE BRIEF LENGTH re (471 in M:06-cv-01791-VRW) filed by All Plaintiffs. Based upon the stipulation, the following shall be the page limits for the remaining briefs: Plaintiffs' Opposition: 50 pages. Government Reply: 35 pages. Carrier Brief: 30 pages. Plaintiffs' response to Carrier brief: 35 pages. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 9/30/2008. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
September 30, 2008 472 Featured Case MOTION Pursuant to 50 USC §1806(f) to Discover or Obtain Material Relating to Electronic Surveillance filed by Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc.(an Oregon Nonprofit Corporation), Wendell Belew, Asim Ghafoor. Motion Hearing set for 12/2/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Jon B. Eisenberg, # 2 Exhibit Eisenberg Exhibits A-H, # 3 Exhibit Eisenberg Exhibits I-P, # 4 Exhibit Eisenberg Exhibits Q-V, # 5 Exhibit Eisenberg Exhibits W-CC, # 6 Affidavit Declaration of Wendell Belew, # 7 Affidavit Declaration of Asim Ghafoor, # 8 Affidavit Declaration of Shayana Kadidal, # 9 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
September 24, 2008 471 Featured Case STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Re Brief Length on 469 Defendants Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment by All Plaintiffs. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 9/24/2008) Modified on 9/25/2008 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2008 470 Featured Case NOTICE by United States of America re 469 MOTION to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment Notice of Lodging of Classified In Camera, Ex Parte Certification of the Attorney General of the United States (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 19, 2008 469 Featured Case MOTION to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment filed by United States Of America. Motion Hearing set for 12/2/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Legislative Materials, # 2 Affidavit Public Certification of the Attorney General of the United States)(Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 12, 2008 Featured Case Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 12/2/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2008)
September 12, 2008 468 Featured Case Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 9/12/2008 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker. SCHEDULE:Al-Haramain and Telecomm Cases:Defs file motion to dismiss or for summary judgment - 9/30/08. Plas file motion for discovery under 1806 (f) - 9/30/08. Plas file opposition to defs motion to dismiss/sj - 10/23/08. Defs file opposition to plas motion for discovery (1806(f)) - 10/23/08. File reply memorandum - 11/14/08. Hearing: 12/2/2008 at 10:00 A.M. Page limits:Government - 25,30,30 = total 85 pages.Plaintiffs - 40, 45 = total 85 pages. (Court Reporter Debra Pas.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/12/2008)
September 5, 2008 467 Featured Case NOTICE by Verizon Communications Inc, Verizon Global Networks, Inc., Verizon Northwest, Inc., MCI Communications Services, Inc., Verizon Maryland, Inc., Verizon Florida, Inc., MCI, LLC of Attorney (John Rogovin) No Longer Associated With Case (Boynton, Brian) (Filed on 9/5/2008)
September 2, 2008 466 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Case Management Statement MDL 06-cv-1791-VRW filed by United States Of America. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 9/2/2008)
August 22, 2008 465 Featured Case NOTICE of Hearing: Case Management Conference set for 9/12/2008 11:00 AM. in Hepting et al v AT&T Corp et al. and pending Carrier cases. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2008)
August 19, 2008 Featured Case Set/Reset Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 9/12/2008 11:00 AM., courtroom no. 6, 17th floor, San Francisco, California. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2008)
August 18, 2008 464 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Case Management Statement in Al-Haramain v. Bush (07-CV-109-VRW) filed by United States of America. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 8/18/2008)
July 31, 2008 463 Featured Case ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed -Acceptance of Service of Summons and First Amended Complaint to defendant Robert S. Mueller, III Acknowledgement filed by Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc.(an Oregon Nonprofit Corporation), Wendell Belew, Asim Ghafoor. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Summons)(Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 7/31/2008)
July 31, 2008 462 Featured Case STIPULATION to Extend Time for Government Defendants to Respond to Amended Complaint in Al-Haramain v. Bush 07-CV-109-VRW by United States of America. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 7/31/2008)
July 31, 2008 461 Featured Case STIPULATION Regarding Acceptance of Service and Response Deadline for Defendant Robert S. Mueller, III in his Individual Capacity by Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc., Wendell Belew, Asim Ghafoor, Robert S. Mueller, III. (Meeks, J.) (Filed on 7/31/2008)
July 30, 2008 460 Featured Case NOTICE of Appearance by J. Marcus Meeks and Mary H. Mason on behalf of Defendant Robert S. Mueller, III in his individual capacity (Meeks, J.) (Filed on 7/30/2008)
July 29, 2008 459 Featured Case CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc., Wendell Belew, Asim Ghafoor re 458 Amended Complaint, (Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 7/29/2008)
July 29, 2008 458 Featured Case AMENDED COMPLAINT against Robert S. Mueller, III, Adam J Szubin, Keith B. Alexander, Office of Foreign Assets Control, George W. Bush, Federal Bureau of Investigation(Robert S. Mueller, III, Director), National Security Agency. Filed byAl-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc.(an Oregon Nonprofit Corporation), Wendell Belew, Asim Ghafoor. (Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 7/29/2008)
July 8, 2008 457 Featured Case ORDER correcting 453 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 7/8/2008. See document # 453. (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2008)
July 3, 2008 456 Featured Case CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sam Goldstein, Heather Derosier, Paul Robilotti, Cathy Bruning, Steven Bruning, Anakalia Kaluna, Steven Lebow, Alan Toly Sapoznik, Austin Chronicle (The), Louis Black, Richard A. Grigg, James C. Harrington, Michael Kentor, Howard Jacobs, Laurence Kornblum, Michael Kentor(on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated) to Stipulation and 1st Amended Master Complaint (George, R.) (Filed on 7/3/2008)
July 3, 2008 455 Featured Case AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Master Consolidated Complaint Against Defendantsn against Cingular Wireless Corporation, New Cingular Wireless Services, Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC. Filed bySam Goldstein, Heather Derosier, Paul Robilotti, Cathy Bruning, Steven Bruning, Kim Coco Iwamoto, Anakalia Kaluna, Steven Lebow, Alan Toly Sapoznik, Austin Chronicle (The), Louis Black, Richard A. Grigg, James C. Harrington, Michael Kentor, Howard Jacobs, Laurence Kornblum, Michael Kentor(on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated). (George, R.) (Filed on 7/3/2008)
July 3, 2008 454 Featured Case STIPULATION and Proposed Order Regarding First Amended Master Complaint Against Cingular by Sam Goldstein, Heather Derosier, Paul Robilotti, Brian Bradley, Cathy Bruning, Steven Bruning, Kim Coco Iwamoto, Anakalia Kaluna, Steven Lebow, Alan Toly Sapoznik, Austin Chronicle (The), Louis Black, Richard A. Grigg, James C. Harrington, Howard Jacobs, Laurence Kornblum, Michael Kentor(on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated). (George, R.) (Filed on 7/3/2008) Modified on 7/7/2008 (CB, COURT STAFF).
July 2, 2008 453 Featured Case SEE #457 FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATIONORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker granting in part and denying in part 432 motion to dismiss; granting 447 motion for an extension of time to serve defendants individually (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2008) Modified on 7/8/2008 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
May 14, 2008 452 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION for proceedings held on 4/23/08 before Judge Vaughn R. Walker; Court Reporter Katherine A. Powell.(re case: 07-1115) (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2008)
April 23, 2008 451 Featured Case Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 4/23/2008 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker, the court submitted the matter, court to issue order re 30 MOTION Extend Time for Service Pursuant to F.R.Civ.P. 4(m); 17 Second MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment filed by Office of Foreign Assets Control, Robert S. Mueller, III, Keith B. Alexander, Robert W. Werner, Federal Bureau of Investigation, National Security Agency, George W. Bush. (Court Reporter Kathy Powell.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/23/2008)
April 22, 2008 450 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition re 447 MOTION Extend Time for Service Pursuant to F.R.Civ.P. 4(m) MOTION Extend Time for Service Pursuant to F.R.Civ.P. 4(m) filed byKeith B. Alexander, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Robert W. Werner, Federal Bureau of Investigation, George W. Bush, National Security Agency. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh A -- Gov't Stay Motion, # 2 Exhibit Exh B -- AHF Opp to Stay, # 3 Exhibit Exh C -- Pages from AHF CA9 Brief, # 4 Exhibit Exh D -- Pages from Gov't CA9 Reply)(Haas, Alexander) (Filed on 4/22/2008)
April 22, 2008 449 Featured Case NOTICE of Change of Address by Peter Jay Eliasberg and Clare Pastore (Eliasberg, Peter) (Filed on 4/22/2008)
April 21, 2008 448 Featured Case NOTICE by Pamela A. Mahoney(individually, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Darryl Hines, Charles F. Bissit, Sandra Bissit, George Hayek, III, June Matrumalo, Gerard Thibeault, Arthur Bouchard, Mary Ann Bouchard, Aldo Caparco, Janice Caparco, Jenna Caparco, Rose DeLuca, Nicole Mirabella, Patricia Pothier, Marshall Votta, Vincent Matrumalo, Paula Matrumalo, Jennifer Thomas, Christine Douquette, Maryanne Klaczynski, Rhea Fuller(on behalf of herself and all othres similarly situated), Jit Gill, Todd Graff, Susan Grossman, Stephanie Gustave, Ian Walker, Don Hawkings, Donna Hawkings, Charmaine Crockett, A. Joris Watland, Joyce Jackson, Mark P. Solomon, Roslyn Payne, Sean Basinski, Eleanor M. Lynn, Esq, Terry Mancour, Charlene Mann, Rev, Brad Martson, Alicia McCollum, Joe McMurray, Kim Coco Iwamoto, Stephanie Meket, Theodore Jonathan Morris, Robert Newby, Serge Popper, Michael Reusch, Merrilyn Rome, Michele Rosen, Michele S. Rothmel, Greg L. Smith, Harris Sondak, James Van Alstine, Pamela A. Mahoney, Ray Anderson, Edward Marck, Carol Waltuch, John Barrett, Trudy Bond, Michael Brooks, Peter Catizone, Sharon L. Davis, Toni DiDona, Theresa R. Duffy, Thomas S. Dwyer, Margaret Franklin, Diane Gavlinski, Brad Marston, Dan Patton, Martin Razo, Daniel Reimann, Mark Richards, Fred Rogers, Darlene Rogers, Paul Sunberg, Regina Sunberg, Barry W. Tribble, Fred Trinkoff, Vickie Votaw, Leon Dwight Wallace, Achieng Warambo, Ulrich Geister, Beth White, Kevin Wright, James Flynn, Elizabeth Arnone, Jay H. Rowell, Vivian Phillips, Jeffrey G. Marsocci, Paul Pothier, Lloyd Brown, Stephen M. Kampmann, Rhea Fuller, Pamela A. Mahoney(on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated) Of Appearance of Kimberly B. Baden as Counsel for Verizon Subscriber Plaintiffs (Parrett, Vincent) (Filed on 4/21/2008)
April 17, 2008 447 Featured Case MOTION Extend Time for Service Pursuant to F.R.Civ.P. 4(m) filed by Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc., Wendell Belew, Asim Ghafoor. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Declaration of Steven Goldberg, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 4/17/2008)
April 14, 2008 446 Featured Case Reply Memorandum re 432 Second MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Notice of Motion and Second Motion to Dismiss or, in the alternative, for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in support thereof in Al-Haramain v. Bush 07-CIV-109 filed byKeith B. Alexander, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Robert W. Werner, Federal Bureau of Investigation, George W. Bush, National Security Agency. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1--Excerpts from House Rep No 95-1283, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2--Excerpts from House Conf. Rep 95-1720, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3--Excerpts from Senate Rep 95-701, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4--Excerpts from Senate Rep 95-604)(Haas, Alexander) (Filed on 4/14/2008)
April 14, 2008 445 Featured Case Answer to Amicus Curiae Brief of Telecommunications Carriers filed byAl-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc., Wendell Belew, Asim Ghafoor. (Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 4/14/2008) Modified on 4/15/2008 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
April 10, 2008 444 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 443 . Pursuant to the parties stipulation, the page limitation for Defendants' reply in support of second motion to dismiss or for summary judgment is hereby extended to 25 pages. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 4/10/2008. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2008)
April 9, 2008 443 Featured Case STIPULATION to extend page limits for Defendants' Reply by Keith B. Alexander, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Robert W. Werner, Federal Bureau of Investigation, George W. Bush, National Security Agency. (Haas, Alexander) (Filed on 4/9/2008)
April 7, 2008 442 Featured Case Brief Amicus Curiae of Telecommunications Carrier Defendants Regarding Whether The Foreign Intelligence Surveillance Act Preempts The State Secrets Privilege filed byVerizon Global Networks, Inc., Verizon Northwest, Inc., MCI Communications Services, Inc., Verizon Maryland, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Florida, Inc., AT&T Corp.. (Rogovin, John) (Filed on 4/7/2008)
April 7, 2008 441 Featured Case Declaration of JENNIFER L. KELLY in Support of 440 Brief, Amici Curiae Memorandum of MDL Plaintiffs Addressing the Application of the Protocol of Section 1806(F), Title 50 U.S.C., to Civil Actions for Unlawful Surveillance filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, Pyle, Wash. Monthly (1970), # 2 Exhibit 2 116 Cong. Rec. 26329 (1970), # 3 Exhibit 3. 01.03.1975 Wilderotter Memo., # 4 Exhibit 4. Hersh NYT Article.pdf, # 5 Exhibit 5. Book II, S. Rep. No. 94-755 (1976), # 6 Exhibit 6. Book III, S. Rep. No. 94-755 (1976), # 7 Exhibit 7. S. Rep. No. 95-604, # 8 Exhibit 8. PFAW Amicus Brief, # 9 Exhibit 9. S. Rep. No. 94-1035, # 10 Exhibit 10. P. Swire, 72 Geo. Wash. L. Rev. 1306, # 11 Exhibit 11. 1974 S. Judiciary Hearings, Title, # 12 Exhibit 12. H. Rep. 95-1283, # 13 Exhibit 13. FISA of 1977 Hearings, # 14 Exhibit 14. H. Conference Rep. 95-1720, # 15 Exhibit 15. S. Rep. No. 95-701, # 16 Exhibit 16. S. 1566 3.14.78, # 17 Exhibit 17. House Bill from 124 Cong Rec, # 18 Exhibit 18. 10.26.2007 Senate Intel Report 110-209, # 19 Exhibit 19. 3.10.2008 NSA's Domestic Spying Grows)(Related document(s) 440 ) (Kelly, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/7/2008)
April 7, 2008 440 Featured Case Brief Amici Curiae Memorandum of MDL Plaintiffs' Addressing the Application of the Protocol of Section 1806(f), Title 50 U.S.C., To Civil Actions for Unlawful Electronic Surveillance filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 4/7/2008)
April 1, 2008 439 Featured Case NOTICE by Steven Lebow Steven Bruning, Jonnie Starkey, Brian Bradley, Cathy Bruning (Evangelista, James) (Filed on 4/1/2008)
March 31, 2008 438 Featured Case ORDER. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 3-28-08. (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2008)
March 28, 2008 437 Featured Case CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc., Wendell Belew, Asim Ghafoor Opposition to Defendants' Second Motion to Dismiss or, in the alternative, for Summary Judgment (Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 3/28/2008)
March 28, 2008 436 Featured Case DECLARATION of Jon B. Eisenberg in Support of 435 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Second Motion to Dismiss or, in the alternative, for Summary Judgment filed byAl-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc., Wendell Belew, Asim Ghafoor. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-H, # 2 Exhibit I-J, # 3 Exhibit K)(Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 3/28/2008) Modified on 3/31/2008 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2008 435 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition to 432 Defendants' Second Motion to Dismiss or, in the alternative, for Summary Judgment filed byAl-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc., Wendell Belew, Asim Ghafoor. (Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 3/28/2008) Modified on 3/31/2008 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
March 25, 2008 434 Featured Case REVISED PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER re (370 in M:06-cv-01791-VRW) Order filed September 10, 2007 signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 3-24-08. (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2008)
March 14, 2008 433 Featured Case NOTICE by Keith B. Alexander, George W. Bush(President of the United States), Robert W. Werner, Federal Bureau of Investigation, National Security Agency re 432 Second MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Notice of Motion and Second Motion to Dismiss or, in the alternative, for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in support thereof in Al-Haramain v. Bush 07-CIV-109 Defendants' Notice of Lodging of In Camera, Ex Parte Submission in Al-Haramain v. Bush (07-CIV-109) (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 3/14/2008)
March 14, 2008 432 Featured Case Second MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Notice of Motion and Second Motion to Dismiss or, in the alternative, for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in support thereof in Al-Haramain v. Bush 07-CIV-109 filed by Keith B. Alexander, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Robert W. Werner, Federal Bureau of Investigation, George W. Bush, National Security Agency. Motion Hearing set for 4/23/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 3/14/2008)
February 25, 2008 431 Featured Case Proposed Order re 370 Order Revised Practice and Procedure Order by All Plaintiffs. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 2/25/2008)
February 20, 2008 430 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 2/7/08 before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter: Connie Kuhl. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2008)
February 14, 2008 429 Featured Case ORDER by Judge VRW granting 294 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; granting 342 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; granting 353 Motion for Leave to File; granting 360 Motion for Leave to File (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2008)
February 11, 2008 428 Featured Case NOTICE of Change of Address by Jessica Ashlee Albies (Albies, Jessica) (Filed on 2/11/2008)
February 7, 2008 Featured Case Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 4/23/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2008)
February 7, 2008 427 Featured Case Minute Entry: Case Management and Status Conference held on 2/7/2008 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker. RESULTS:Further briefing re 1806(f) in Al-Haramain case only.Amici were permitted to file their briefs.Schedule: File brief : 3/14/08. Opposition: 3/28/08. Reply: 4/14/08. Hearing: 4/23/2008 at 10:00 AM.Filing of the briefs limited to the master MDL case and the individual case only.Page limitation has been set by the court to up to 40page limit. (Court Reporter Connie Kuhl.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/7/2008)
February 6, 2008 426 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Defendants' Case Management Statement in Al-Haramain v. Bush (only) (07-109) filed by Keith B. Alexander, George W. Bush(President of the United States), National Security Agency, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Federal Bureau of Investigation, United States of America. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 2/6/2008)
February 5, 2008 425 Featured Case NOTICE by United States of America of Withdrawal of Counsel (Tannenbaum, Andrew) (Filed on 2/5/2008)
February 4, 2008 424 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Supplemental) and [Proposed] Order filed by Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc., Wendell Belew, Asim Ghafoor. (Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 2/4/2008)
January 22, 2008 423 Featured Case CLERKS Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2008)
January 18, 2008 422 Featured Case USCA JUDGMENT - 06-36083 - It is now here ordered and adjudged by this Court, that the judgment of the said District Court in this cause be, and hereby is REVERSED, REMANDED. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2008) (gsa, COURT STAFF).
January 10, 2008 421 Featured Case AFFIDAVIT Declaration of John R. Gillespie in Compliance with Preservation Order by Theresa Fortnash. (Gillespie, John) (Filed on 1/10/2008)
December 19, 2007 414 Featured Case Declaration of Cindy A. Cohn in Support of 393 Order filed by Hepting plaintiffs. RE 06-6224 VRW and 06-6253 VRW. FILED UNDER SEAL. (Related document(s) 393 ) (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2007) Modified on 12/21/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
December 17, 2007 417 Featured Case Declaration of Gary E. Mason in Support of 393 Order filed by Sprint Subscribers. FILED UNDER SEAL. (Related document(s) 393 ) (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2007) Modified on 12/21/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
December 17, 2007 405 Featured Case NOTICE by Richard D. Suchanek, III Notice of Manual Filing (Mason, Gary) (Filed on 12/17/2007)
December 17, 2007 404 Featured Case NOTICE by Qwest Communications International, Inc. of Manual Filing (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Zaetta, Christopher) (Filed on 12/17/2007)
December 15, 2007 403 Featured Case NOTICE by Jane Youd, Mark Youd, Linda Gettier, James Nurkiewicz, Douglas S. Hensley, Lisa Lockwood, Joe McMurray, Steven Bruning, Steven Lebow, Clyde Michael Morgan, Cathy Bruning, Jonnie Starkey, Barry Kaltman, Meredith Kaltman, Ilene Pruett, Carolyn R. Hensley, Fred Rogers, Darlene Rogers, Jane Winston, Anthony Bartelemy, Tina Herron, Brandy Sergi, John Clark, Thomas Michael Fain, John Fitzpatrick of Manual Filing of Declaration of Steven E. Schwarz in compliance with Preservation Order, on behalf of Plaintiff BellSouth Subscribers (Schwarz, Steven) (Filed on 12/15/2007)
December 14, 2007 420 Featured Case Response of the United States to the Court's Order of November 6, 2007 concerning document preservation 393 filed byUnited States. FILED UNDER SEAL. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2007)
December 14, 2007 419 Featured Case Declaration of R. James George, Jr. in Support of 393 Order filed by Cingular Subscribers. FILED UNDER SEAL (Related document(s) 393 ) (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2007) Modified on 12/21/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
December 14, 2007 418 Featured Case Declaration of Steven E. Schwarz in Support of 393 Order filed by BellSouth Subscribers. FILED UNDER SEAL. (Related document(s) 393 ) (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2007) Modified on 12/21/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
December 14, 2007 416 Featured Case Verizon's Statement in Response to the Court's Intrim Order on Preversation of Documents 393 by Verizon Global Networks, Inc., Verizon Northwest, Inc., MCI Communications Services, Inc., Verizon Maryland, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Florida, Inc., MCI, LLC re 393 Order re: 06-6434 VRW, 06-5066 VRW, 06-6313 VRW, 06-6570 VRW, 06-5576 VRW, 06-6254 VRW, 06-9622 VRW 06-6224 VRW, 06-6387 VRW, 06-5267 VRW, 06-5343 VRW, 06-5341 VRW, 06--5485 VRW, 06-5064 VRW, 06-5063 VRW, 07-2029 VRW, 06-6435 VRW, 06-3574, VRW, 06-6388 VRW, 06-4221 VRW, 07-2538 VRW, 07-1323 VRW, 07-1324 VRW, 07-1326 VRW, 07-1396 VRW. FILED UNDER SEAL. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2007)
December 14, 2007 415 Featured Case Statement of Counsel for AT&T, Cingular, and Bellsouth by AT&T Communications, Cingular Wireless Corporation, BellSouth Communications Systems, LLC re 393 Order RE: 06-672 VRW, 06-3467 VRW, 06-3596 VRW, 06-5065 VRW, 06-5067 VRW 06-5268 VRW, 06-5269 VRW, 06-5340 VRW, 06-5343 VRW, 06-5452 VRW, 06-5485 VRW, 06-5576 VRW, 06-6222 VRW, 06-6224 VRW, 06-6253 VRW, 06-6454 VRW 06-6294 VRW, 06-6385 VRW, 06-6387 VRW, 06-6570 VRW, 06-6924 VRW, 06-7934 VRW, 07-464 VRW 07-1187 VRW, 07-1242 VRW, 07-1243 VRW, 07-1324 VRW, 07-1326 VRW, 07-1396 VRW, 07-2029 VRW, 07-2538 VRW. FILED UNDER SEAL. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2007)
December 14, 2007 413 Featured Case DOCUMENT SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL. by Qwest Communications International, Inc. re 393 Order (gsa, COURT STAFF) 07-1324 VRW. FILED UNDER SEAL.(Filed on 12/14/2007)
December 14, 2007 412 Featured Case Declaration of Ilan Maazel in Compliance with Preservation Order filed byVirginia Shubert, Noha Arafa, Sarah Dranoff, Hilary Botein. re:07-693 VRW. FILED UNDER SEAL. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2007)
December 14, 2007 411 Featured Case Statement in Response to the Court's Interim Order on Preservation of Documents by Nextel West Corp., Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P., Sprint Nextel Corporation re 393 Order. Re: 06-6222 VRW, 06-6224 VRW, 06-6254 VRW, 06-6295 VRW, 07-464 VRW FILED UNDER SEAL. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2007)
December 14, 2007 410 Featured Case Declaration of Lee Tien in Support of 393 Order filed by Hepting plaintiffs. Re: 06-6224 VRW and 06-6253 VRW. FILED UNDER SEAL. (Related document(s) 393 ) (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2007) Modified on 12/21/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
December 14, 2007 409 Featured Case Declaration of Ann Brick in Support of 393 Order filed byAT&T Communications, Verizon Communications, Inc.(a corporation). re: 06-3574 VRW and 063596 VRW. FILED UNDER SEAL. (Related document(s) 393 ) (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2007)
December 14, 2007 408 Featured Case DOCKETED IN ERROR - See #418 - DOCUMENT SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL re 393 Order (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2007) Modified on 12/21/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/21/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
December 14, 2007 407 Featured Case Declaration of Jodi Westbrook Flowers in compliance with Preservation Order in Support of 393 Order filed by Verizon Subscribers. FILED UNDER SEAL. (Related document(s) 393 ) (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2007) Modified on 12/21/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
December 14, 2007 406 Featured Case Declaration of Barry R. Himmelstein in Compliance with Preservation Order by MCI Class re (393 in M:06-cv-01791-VRW) Order (gsa, COURT STAFF) FILED UNDER SEAL(Filed on 12/14/2007) Modified on 12/19/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/21/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
December 14, 2007 402 Featured Case NOTICE by Cingular Wireless Corporation, BellSouth Corp., AT&T Corp. PROOF OF SERVICE BY E-MAIL (Axelbaum, Marc) (Filed on 12/14/2007)
December 14, 2007 401 Featured Case NOTICE by Dennis P. Riordan et al (Brick, Ann) (Filed on 12/14/2007)
December 14, 2007 400 Featured Case NOTICE by Tom Campbell et al (Brick, Ann) (Filed on 12/14/2007)
December 14, 2007 399 Featured Case NOTICE by Pamela A. Mahoney(individually, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Darryl Hines, Charles F. Bissit, Sandra Bissit, George Hayek, III, June Matrumalo, Gerard Thibeault, Arthur Bouchard, Mary Ann Bouchard, Aldo Caparco, Janice Caparco, Jenna Caparco, Rose DeLuca, Nicole Mirabella, Patricia Pothier, Marshall Votta, Vincent Matrumalo, Paula Matrumalo, Jennifer Thomas, Christine Douquette, Maryanne Klaczynski, Rhea Fuller(on behalf of herself and all othres similarly situated), Jit Gill, Todd Graff, Susan Grossman, Stephanie Gustave, Ian Walker, Don Hawkings, Donna Hawkings, Charmaine Crockett, A. Joris Watland, Joyce Jackson, Mark P. Solomon, Roslyn Payne, Sean Basinski, Eleanor M. Lynn, Esq, Terry Mancour, All Plaintiffs, Charlene Mann, Rev, Brad Martson, Alicia McCollum, Joe McMurray, Kim Coco Iwamoto, Stephanie Meket, Theodore Jonathan Morris, Robert Newby, Serge Popper, Michael Reusch, Merrilyn Rome, Michele Rosen, Michele S. Rothmel, Greg L. Smith, Harris Sondak, James Van Alstine, Pamela A. Mahoney, Ray Anderson, Edward Marck, Carol Waltuch, John Barrett, Trudy Bond, Michael Brooks, Peter Catizone, Sharon L. Davis, Toni DiDona, Theresa R. Duffy, Thomas S. Dwyer, Margaret Franklin, Diane Gavlinski, Brad Marston, Chris Von Obernauer, Dan Patton, Martin Razo, Daniel Reimann, Mark Richards, Fred Rogers, Darlene Rogers, Gregory L. Smith, Paul Sunberg, Regina Sunberg, Barry W. Tribble, Fred Trinkoff, Vickie Votaw, Leon Dwight Wallace, Achieng Warambo, Ulrich Geister, Beth White, Kevin Wright, James Flynn, Elizabeth Arnone, Jay H. Rowell, Vivian Phillips, Jeffrey G. Marsocci, Paul Pothier, Lloyd Brown, Stephen M. Kampmann, Rhea Fuller, Pamela A. Mahoney(on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated) of Manual Filing of Declaration of Jodi Westbrook Flowers in compliance with Preservation Order, on behalf of Plaintiff Verizon Subscribers (Parrett, Vincent) (Filed on 12/14/2007)
December 14, 2007 398 Featured Case NOTICE by Nextel West Corp., Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P., Sprint Nextel Corporation Manual Filing Notification (Kester, John) (Filed on 12/14/2007)
December 14, 2007 397 Featured Case NOTICE by Cingular Wireless LLC, BellSouth Corp., AT&T Corp. Manual Filing Notification (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 12/14/2007)
December 14, 2007 396 Featured Case NOTICE by Virginia Shubert, Noha Arafa, Sarah Dranoff, Hilary Botein of Manual Filing (Maazel, Ilann) (Filed on 12/14/2007)
December 14, 2007 395 Featured Case NOTICE by Verizon Global Networks, Inc., Verizon Northwest, Inc., MCI Communications Services, Inc., Verizon Maryland, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Florida, Inc., MCI, LLC of Manual Filing of Verizon's Statement in Response to the Court's Interim Order on Preservation of Documents (Rogovin, John) (Filed on 12/14/2007)
December 14, 2007 394 Featured Case NOTICE by United States of America re 393 Order of Manual Filing (Haas, Alexander) (Filed on 12/14/2007)
November 6, 2007 393 Featured Case ORDER ON MOTION FOR ORDER TO PRESERVE EVIDENCE. Signed by Judge VRW on 11/5/07. (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2007)
November 1, 2007 392 Featured Case RESPONSE in Support re 373 MOTION Motion for Order to Preserve Evidence; Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Order to Preserve Evidence filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 11/1/2007)
October 26, 2007 391 Featured Case Joinder of AT&T, Cingular and Bellsouth Defendants in 373 United States' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for an Order to Preserve Evidence (Dkt. 386) by AT&T Corp.. (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 10/26/2007) Modified on 10/31/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
October 25, 2007 390 Featured Case Joinder in 373 United States' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Order To Preserve Evidence by Sprint Nextel Corporation. (Kester, John) (Filed on 10/25/2007) Modified on 10/31/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
October 25, 2007 389 Featured Case Joinder OF AT&T, CINGULAR AND BELLSOUTH DEFENDANTS IN 386 UNITED STATES OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO PRESERVE EVIDENCE by AT&T Corp.. (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 10/25/2007) Modified on 10/31/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
October 25, 2007 388 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition Verizon's Opposition To 373 Plaintiffs' Motion For Order To Preserve Evidence filed byVerizon. (Feinberg, Aimee) (Filed on 10/25/2007) Modified on 10/31/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
October 25, 2007 387 Featured Case NOTICE by United States Of America re 386 Memorandum in Opposition,, of Lodging of Classified Supplement & accompanying Declaration (Haas, Alexander) (Filed on 10/25/2007)
October 25, 2007 386 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition re 373 MOTION Motion for Order to Preserve Evidence; Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Order to Preserve Evidence, 384 MOTION to Amend/Correct 373 MOTION Motion for Order to Preserve Evidence; Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Order to Preserve Evidence MOTION to Amend/Correct 373 MOTION Motion for Order to Preserve Evidence; Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Order to Preserve Evidence filed byUnited States Of America. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Coppolino Declaration & Exhibits Thereto)(Haas, Alexander) (Filed on 10/25/2007)
October 5, 2007 385 Featured Case Reply Memorandum re 347 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint filed byTina M. Foster, Gitanjali S. Gutierrez, Seema Ahmad, Maria LaHood, Rachel Meeropol, Center for Constitutional Rights. (Kadidal, Shayana) (Filed on 10/5/2007)
October 3, 2007 384 Featured Case RENOTICE OF 373 MOTION Motion for Order to Preserve Evidence; Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Order to Preserve Evidence filed by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 10/3/2007) Modified on 11/6/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
October 1, 2007 383 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/30/2007 before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter: Katherine A. Powell.. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2007)
October 1, 2007 382 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 377 filed by All Plaintiffs. Pursuant to stipulation and good cause appearing, the Court hereby orders the following documents will be unsealed: Declaration of Mark Klein (dkt no. 230); Declaration of Mark Klein's exh A pp 1,4, exh B pp 6,20 and exh C pp 1,3,45-6; Declaration of J Scott Marcus (dkt no. 231); Declaration of J Scott Marcus' exh L-P and exh U. Plaintiffs may file public versions, or in some cases public redacted versions, of the documents identified in para 1 and attached as exhibits 1-4 to the stipulation. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 10/1/2007. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2007)
September 28, 2007 381 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition re 347 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint filed byUnited States of America. (Haas, Alexander) (Filed on 9/28/2007)
September 27, 2007 380 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR VERIZON DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINTS. Signed by Judge VRW on 9-26-07. (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2007)
September 27, 2007 379 Featured Case ORDER by Judge VRW terminating 268 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2007)
September 26, 2007 378 Featured Case ORDER ON MOTIONS IN HEPTING CASE. Signed by Judge VRW on 9/26/07. (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2007)
September 25, 2007 377 Featured Case Proposed Order re 376 Stipulation by All Plaintiffs. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 9/25/2007)
September 25, 2007 376 Featured Case STIPULATION by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4)(Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 9/25/2007)
September 20, 2007 375 Featured Case Proposed Order [Proposed] Interim Order to Preserve Evidence by All Plaintiffs. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 9/20/2007)
September 20, 2007 374 Featured Case Declaration of Cindy A. Cohn in Support of 373 Plaintiffs' Motion for Order to Preserve Evidence filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 9/20/2007) Modified on 9/26/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
September 20, 2007 373 Featured Case MOTION Motion for Order to Preserve Evidence; Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Order to Preserve Evidence filed by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 10/25/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 9/20/2007)
September 12, 2007 372 Featured Case NOTICE by Verizon Communications Inc, MCI, LLC (Filed Jointly with Plaintiffs) Regarding Verizon's Motion To Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Rogovin, John) (Filed on 9/12/2007)
September 10, 2007 371 Featured Case NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Motion for Order to Preserve Evidence (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 9/10/2007)
September 10, 2007 370 Featured Case ORDER Practice & procedure order (revised). Signed by Judge VRW on 9-10-07. (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2007)
September 5, 2007 369 Featured Case ORDER setting briefing schedule on plaintiffs' motion to supplement complaint. Signed by Judge VRW on 9/5/07. (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2007)
September 4, 2007 367 Featured Case ORDER re: motion by the United States to intervene in Bready et al v Verizon Maryland, Inc, C 06-6313. Signed by Judge VRW on 9/4/07. (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2007)
August 30, 2007 368 Featured Case Minute Entry: Motions Hearing held on 8/30/2007 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker. PROCEEDINGS:1. Verizon's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. 2. Verizon's Motion toDismiss Complaint in Chulsky, Riordan and Bready. 3. Verizon's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Master Complaint.4. United States' Motion to Dismiss Complaints on State Secrets Grounds (Chulsky, Riordan, Bready). 4. United States' Motion to Dismiss in Shubert. 5. United States' Motion to Intervene - granted. RESULTS:The Court heard argument from counsel. The Court took the matter(s) under-submission.Court to issue written ruling. (Court Reporter Kathy Powell.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/30/2007)
August 30, 2007 366 Featured Case ORDER approving 251 stipulation filed by United States Of America permitting the United States to intervene in all actions against the MCI and Verizon defendants in the Master MCI and Verizon Consolidated Complaint and in the Chulsky action (C 06-6570). Signed by Judge VRW on 4/20/2007. (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2007)
August 29, 2007 365 Featured Case Brief Response of the United States to Plaintiffs' 363 Supplemental Requests for Judicial Notice filed byUnited States Of America. (Haas, Alexander) (Filed on 8/29/2007) Modified on 9/6/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
August 28, 2007 364 Featured Case RESPONSE to 363 Plaintiffs' Supplemental Request For Judicial Notice and Supplemental Authorities by Verizon. (Feinberg, Aimee) (Filed on 8/28/2007) Modified on 9/5/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
August 27, 2007 363 Featured Case Request for Judicial Notice re 253 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment, 273 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Master Consolidated Complaint (Second Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice) filed byElaine Spielfogel-Landis(on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated). (Related document(s) 253 , 273 ) (Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 8/27/2007)
August 27, 2007 362 Featured Case Proposed Order re 360 MOTION for Leave to File PLAINTIFFS' SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FOR THE MOTIONS TO DISMISS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA AND VERIZON by Elaine Spielfogel-Landis(on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated). (Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 8/27/2007)
August 27, 2007 361 Featured Case STIPULATION re 360 MOTION for Leave to File PLAINTIFFS' SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FOR THE MOTIONS TO DISMISS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA AND VERIZON by Elaine Spielfogel-Landis(on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated). (Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 8/27/2007)
August 27, 2007 360 Featured Case MOTION for Leave to File PLAINTIFFS' SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FOR THE MOTIONS TO DISMISS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA AND VERIZON filed by Elaine Spielfogel-Landis(on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated). (Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 8/27/2007)
August 24, 2007 359 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/9/2007 before Judge Vaughn R. Walker re 07-1115 VRW. Court Reporter: Katherine A. Powell.. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2007)
August 23, 2007 358 Featured Case STIPULATION and Proposed Order To Extend Time for Verizon Defendants To Respond to Complaints by Verizon Communications Inc. (Rogovin, John) (Filed on 8/23/2007)
August 22, 2007 357 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 6/21/2007 before Judge Vaughn R. Walker as it relates to 06-3574 VRW, 06-6313 VRW, and 06-6570 VRW. Court Reporter: Katherine Wyatt.. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2007)
August 20, 2007 356 Featured Case Request for Judicial Notice re 253 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment, 273 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Master Consolidated Complaint filed byElaine Spielfogel-Landis. (Related document(s) 253 , 273 ) (Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 8/20/2007)
August 20, 2007 355 Featured Case Proposed Order re 353 MOTION for Leave to File PLAINTIFFS' MISCELLANEOUS ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE AND SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES FOR THE MOTIONS TO DISMISS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY THE UN by Elaine Spielfogel-Landis. (Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 8/20/2007)
August 20, 2007 354 Featured Case STIPULATION re 353 MOTION for Leave to File PLAINTIFFS' MISCELLANEOUS ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE AND SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES FOR THE MOTIONS TO DISMISS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY THE UN by Elaine Spielfogel-Landis. (Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 8/20/2007)
August 20, 2007 353 Featured Case MOTION for Leave to File PLAINTIFFS' MISCELLANEOUS ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE AND SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES FOR THE MOTIONS TO DISMISS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA AND VERIZON filed by Elaine Spielfogel-Landis. (Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 8/20/2007)
August 20, 2007 352 Featured Case ORDER continuing date for defendants to respond to complaints in 07-1324 (US v Rabner), 07-1326 (US v Palermino) and 07-1396 (US v Volz). Signed by Judge VRW on 8/17/07. (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2007)
August 16, 2007 351 Featured Case Reply to Opposition re 295 MOTION to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment filed byUnited States. (Tumlin-Bhattacharyya, Tracy Rupa) (Filed on 8/16/2007)
August 16, 2007 350 Featured Case Reply to Opposition of Bready Plaintiffs regarding United States' 292 Motion to Intervene [Dkt 252] filed byUnited States Of America. (Haas, Alexander) (Filed on 8/16/2007) Modified on 8/20/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
August 14, 2007 349 Featured Case STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR AT&T AND CINGULAR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINTS by AT&T Corp.. (Axelbaum, Marc) (Filed on 8/14/2007)
August 10, 2007 347 Featured Case MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint filed by Center for Constitutional Rights, Tina M. Foster, Gitanjali S. Gutierrez, Seema Ahmad, Maria LaHood, Rachel Meeropol. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Supplemental Complaint)(Kadidal, Shayana) (Filed on 8/10/2007)
August 9, 2007 348 Featured Case Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 8/9/2007 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker in C07-1115 CCR v Bush. The Court heard argument from counsel. The Court submitted the matter(s).Court to issue written ruling. (Court Reporter Kathy Powell.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/9/2007)
August 9, 2007 346 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 287 . Pursuant to the parties stipulation, items 1 through 8, IT IS SO ORDERED, that the motions that are the subject of the stipulation will heard on 8/30/2007 at 2:00 PM. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 8/9/2007. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2007)
August 8, 2007 345 Featured Case NOTICE by United States of America in Center for Constitutional Rights v. Bush (07-1115) of Statutory Amendments to the Foreign Intelligence Surveillance Act (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Tannenbaum, Andrew) (Filed on 8/8/2007)
August 3, 2007 344 Featured Case Request for Judicial Notice Second Request For Judicial Notice filed byVerizon. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Feinberg, Aimee) (Filed on 8/3/2007)
August 3, 2007 343 Featured Case Reply Memorandum In Support Of Verizon's 273 Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs' Master Consolidated Complaint filed byVerizon. (Feinberg, Aimee) (Filed on 8/3/2007) Modified on 8/7/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
August 3, 2007 342 Featured Case MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply Memorandum in All Cases Against Verizon and MCI Defendants filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Tannenbaum, Andrew) (Filed on 8/3/2007)
August 3, 2007 341 Featured Case NOTICE by United States of America of Lodging of Classified Reply Memorandum in All Cases Against Verizon and MCI Defendants (Tannenbaum, Andrew) (Filed on 8/3/2007)
August 3, 2007 340 Featured Case Reply to Opposition re 253 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment in All Actions Against the Verizon and MCI Defendants filed byUnited States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Tannenbaum, Andrew) (Filed on 8/3/2007)
August 3, 2007 339 Featured Case Reply Memorandum in Support of Verizon's 270 Motion to Dismiss the Chulsky, Riordan, and Bready Complaints filed byVerizon Communications Inc, Verizon Maryland, Inc.. (Rogovin, John) (Filed on 8/3/2007) Modified on 8/7/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
August 3, 2007 338 Featured Case Reply Memorandum in Support of Verizon's 268 Motion To Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed byVerizon Communications Inc, Verizon Global Networks, Inc., MCI, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Declaration of Joseph P. Dunbar)(Rogovin, John) (Filed on 8/3/2007) Modified on 8/7/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
July 24, 2007 337 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 15 filed in C07-1115 CCR v Bush by Department of Homeland Security, Defense Intelligence Agency, John D. Negroponte, Central Intelligence Agency, Federal Bureau of Investigation, National Security Agency, George W. Bush. The page limit on Plaintiffs' Supplemental Memorandum filed on 7/9/2007 shall be extended to the length of 26 pages of text. The page limit on Defendants' Supplemental Reply Memorandum shall be extended to 20 pages. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 7/24/2007. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2007)
July 24, 2007 336 Featured Case AFFIDAVIT in Opposition Declaration of Ilann M. Maazel Pursuant to Rule 56(f) in 335 Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment filed byVirginia Shubert, Noha Arafa, Sarah Dranoff, Hilary Botein. (Maazel, Ilann) (Filed on 7/24/2007) Modified on 7/30/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
July 24, 2007 335 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' 295 Motion to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment filed byVirginia Shubert, Noha Arafa, Sarah Dranoff, Hilary Botein. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2 to Plaintiffs' MOL in Opposition to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment)(Maazel, Ilann) (Filed on 7/24/2007) Modified on 7/30/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
July 24, 2007 334 Featured Case ORDER by Chief Judge Walker denying without prejudice government's motion to dismiss "state cases" and denying as moot the state officials' motions for summary judgment. (vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2007)
July 21, 2007 333 Featured Case NOTICE by Center for Constitutional Rights, Tina M. Foster, Gitanjali S. Gutierrez, Seema Ahmad, Maria LaHood, Rachel Meeropol of Filings Related to Upcoming Hearing (Attachments: # 1 Complaint (stamped copy) [Dkt. No. 1]# 2 Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment [Dkt. No. 5]# 3 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment [Dkt. No. 6]# 4 Affirmation of William Goodman in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment [Dkt. No. 9]# 5 Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss [Dkt. No. 56]# 6 Affirmation of Professor Stephen Gillers [Dkt. No. 58]# 7 Supplemental Affirmation of William Goodman [Dkt. No. 59]# 8 Affirmation of Rachel Meeropol [Dkt. No. 60]# 9 Affirmation of Maria Couri LaHood [Dkt. No. 61]# 10 Plaintiffs Reply Memorandum in Support of Summary Judgment [Dkt. No. 74]# 11 Amicus brief of business leaders [Dkt. No. 14]# 12 Amicus brief of NAACP and other organizations [Dkt. No. 18-1]# 13 Amicus brief of Assn of the Bar of the City of New York (in support of Plaintiffs motion for Summary Judgment) [Dkt. No. 22]# 14 Amicus brief of 72 Members of Congress [Dkt. No. 37]# 15 Amicus brief of Washington Legal Foundation [Dkt. No. 44]# 16 Amicus brief of Assn of the Bar of the City of New York (re. state secrets privilege) [Dkt. No. 53]# 17 Amicus brief of Dr. Louis Fisher and Dr. William Weaver [Dkt. No. 54-1]# 18 Amicus brief of professors of legal ethics et al. [Dkt. No. 63-1])(Kadidal, Shayana) (Filed on 7/21/2007)
July 20, 2007 332 Featured Case STIPULATION and Proposed Order Requesting Extension of Page Limits for Supplemental Briefs in Center for Constitutional Rights v. Bush (07-CV-1115) by United States of America. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 7/20/2007)
July 20, 2007 331 Featured Case Reply Memorandum Defendants Supplemental Reply Memorandum in Center for Constitutional Rights v. Bush (07-CV-1115) filed byUnited States of America. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 7/20/2007)
July 19, 2007 330 Featured Case NOTICE of Change of Address by Reed R. Kathrein (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 7/19/2007)
July 13, 2007 329 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 9 filed by Hilary Botein, Virginia Shubert, Sarah Dranoff, Noha Arafa. On or before 7/20/2007, Plaintiffs will file an opposition to the Government's dispositive motion in Shubert v Bush, C07-0693. On or before 8/16/2007, the Government will file a reply brief in support of its dispositive motion. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 7/13/2007. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2007)
July 9, 2007 Featured Case #327-15 Classified Submission re 327 (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2007)
July 9, 2007 328 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and in Support of Plainitffs' Motion for Summary Judgment (Supplemental) filed byCenter for Constitutional Rights, Tina M. Foster, Gitanjali S. Gutierrez, Seema Ahmad, Maria LaHood, Rachel Meeropol. (Kadidal, Shayana) (Filed on 7/9/2007)
July 9, 2007 327 Featured Case NOTICE by United States of America of Filings Related to Upcoming Hearing in Center for Constitutional Rights v. Bush (No. 07-1115) (Attachments: # 1 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment# 2 Defendants' Motion to Stay Consideration of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment# 3 Defendants' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of State Secrets Privilege, Motion to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment, and Motion to Stay# 4 Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment# 5 Public Declaration of John D. Negroponte, Director of National Intelligence# 6 Public Declaration of Maj. Gen. Richard J. Quirk, Signals Intelligence Director, National Security Agency# 7 Defendants' Notic eof Lodging of In Camera, Ex Parte Material (May 26, 2006)# 8 Defendants' Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment# 9 Defendants' Notice of Lodging of Classified Supplemental Memorandum# 10 Defendants' Notice of Lodging of Classified Declaration of Lt. Gen. Keith B. Alexander, Director, National Security Agency# 11 Defendants' Notice of Prior Lodging of Classified Memorandum# 12 Defendants' Notice of Prior Lodging of Classified Declaration of John D. Negroponte# 13 Defendants' Notice of Prior Lodging of Classified Declaration of Maj. Gen. Richard J. Quirk# 14 Transcript of oral argument held on September 5, 2006)(Tannenbaum, Andrew) (Filed on 7/9/2007)
July 6, 2007 326 Featured Case STIPULATION to Alter Briefing Schedule in Center for Constitutional Rights v. Bush (07-1115) by Center for Constitutional Rights, Tina M. Foster, Gitanjali S. Gutierrez, Seema Ahmad, Maria LaHood, Rachel Meeropol. (Kadidal, Shayana) (Filed on 7/6/2007)
July 3, 2007 325 Featured Case Brief of Appellees filed byAl-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc., Wendell Belew, Asim Ghafoor. (Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 7/3/2007)
June 28, 2007 324 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER [re 9 in 07-1115 CCR v Bush] AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT: On 7/6/2007, Plaintiffs in CCR will file a response to the Govt's submission and their own supplemental points and authority in support of their position on their motion. Defendants will file a reply brief no later than 7/19/2007. Hearing is scheduled for 8/9/2007 at 2:00 PM. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 6/28/2007. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2007)
June 27, 2007 323 Featured Case NOTICE of Change of Address by Reed R. Kathrein (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 6/27/2007)
June 26, 2007 322 Featured Case STIPULATION (MODIFIED) and Proposed Order to Set Briefing and Hearing Schedule in CCR v. Bush et al. (07-cv-1115) by United States of America. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 6/26/2007)
June 24, 2007 321 Featured Case EXHIBITS re 313 Memorandum in Opposition,,, 314 Declaration in Support,,,, by Vincent I. Parrett filed byPamela A. Mahoney(individually, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Darryl Hines, Charles F. Bissit, Sandra Bissit, Rhea Fuller(on behalf of herself and all othres similarly situated), Tina Herron, Donald Herron, Pamela A. Mahoney, James Joll, Greg Conner, Rhea Fuller, Elaine Spielfogel-Landis, Dennis P. Riordan, Elaine Spielfogel-Landis(on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated), Pamela A. Mahoney(on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 23e)(Related document(s) 313 , 314 ) (Parrett, Vincent) (Filed on 6/24/2007)
June 23, 2007 320 Featured Case Appendix re (6 in 3:07-cv-00464-VRW, 5 in 3:07-cv-01187-VRW, 7 in 3:06-cv-06254-VRW, 7 in 3:06-cv-05576-VRW, 5 in 3:06-cv-07934-VRW, 4 in 3:07-cv-02029-VRW, 5 in 3:06-cv-06434-VRW, 6 in 3:06-cv-05269-VRW, 67 in 3:06-cv-03596-VRW, 7 in 3:06-cv-06570-VRW, 13 in 3:06-cv-06224-VRW, 5 in 3:06-cv-06294-VRW, 70 in 3:06-cv-03574-VRW, 6 in 3:06-cv-05268-VRW, 12 in 3:06-cv-06387-VRW, 5 in 3:07-cv-01323-VRW, 7 in 3:06-cv-05066-VRW, 13 in 3:06-cv-06222-VRW, 5 in 3:06-cv-06435-VRW, 7 in 3:06-cv-05063-VRW, 7 in 3:06-cv-06253-VRW, 7 in 3:07-cv-01396-VRW, 7 in 3:07-cv-00693-VRW, 7 in 3:06-cv-06295-VRW, 8 in 3:06-cv-06313-VRW, 7 in 3:06-cv-05065-VRW, 7 in 3:06-cv-05067-VRW, 5 in 3:06-cv-05452-VRW, 6 in 3:06-cv-05340-VRW, 319 in M:06-cv-01791-VRW, 7 in 3:06-cv-05064-VRW, 32 in 3:06-cv-03467-VRW, 5 in 3:07-cv-01326-VRW, 9 in 3:07-cv-00109-VRW, 7 in 3:06-cv-06225-VRW, 5 in 3:07-cv-01242-VRW, 5 in 3:06-cv-06388-VRW, 13 in 3:07-cv-01324-VRW, 351 in 3:06-cv-00672-VRW, 6 in 3:06-cv-05267-VRW, 5 in 3:06-cv-06385-VRW, 6 in 3:06-cv-05341-VRW, 5 in 3:07-cv-01243-VRW, 8 in 3:06-cv-05485-VRW, 7 in 3:06-cv-05343-VRW, 4 in 3:06-cv-06924-VRW, 4 in 3:07-cv-02538-VRW, 14 in 3:06-cv-04221-VRW) Memorandum in Opposition, to Verizon's Motion to Dismiss Master Complaint filed byElaine Spielfogel-Landis(on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Tabs 4-12# 2 Exhibit Tabs 13-20)(Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 6/23/2007)
June 23, 2007 319 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition re (273 in M:06-cv-01791-VRW) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Master Consolidated Complaint filed byElaine Spielfogel-Landis(on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated). (Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 6/23/2007)
June 22, 2007 318 Featured Case Declaration of Jennifer L. Kelly, Esq. in Support of 313 Memorandum in Opposition,,, to Verizon's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed byPamela A. Mahoney(individually, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Darryl Hines, Charles F. Bissit, Sandra Bissit, Rhea Fuller(on behalf of herself and all othres similarly situated), Tina Herron, Donald Herron, Pamela A. Mahoney, James Joll, Greg Conner, Rhea Fuller, Elaine Spielfogel-Landis, Dennis P. Riordan, Elaine Spielfogel-Landis(on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated), Pamela A. Mahoney(on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 313 ) (Parrett, Vincent) (Filed on 6/22/2007)
June 22, 2007 317 Featured Case EXHIBITS re 314 Declaration in Support,,,, of Vincent I. Parrett filed byPamela A. Mahoney(individually, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Darryl Hines, Charles F. Bissit, Sandra Bissit, Rhea Fuller(on behalf of herself and all othres similarly situated), Tina Herron, Donald Herron, Pamela A. Mahoney, James Joll, Greg Conner, Rhea Fuller, Elaine Spielfogel-Landis, Dennis P. Riordan, Elaine Spielfogel-Landis(on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated), Pamela A. Mahoney(on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 22# 2 Exhibit 23a# 3 Exhibit 23b# 4 Exhibit 23c# 5 Exhibit # 6 Exhibit 24# 7 Exhibit 25# 8 Exhibit 26# 9 Exhibit 27# 10 Exhibit 28# 11 Exhibit 29# 12 Exhibit 30# 13 Exhibit 31# 14 Exhibit 32# 15 Exhibit 33# 16 Exhibit 34# 17 Exhibit 35# 18 Exhibit 36# 19 Exhibit 37# 20 Exhibit 38# 21 Exhibit 39# 22 Exhibit 40# 23 Exhibit 41)(Related document(s) 314 ) (Parrett, Vincent) (Filed on 6/22/2007)
June 22, 2007 316 Featured Case Declaration of Candace J. Morey in Support of (315 in M:06-cv-01791-VRW) Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss or In the Alternative for Summary Judgment by the United States filed byDennis P. Riordan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Z# 2 Exhibit AA-II# 3 Exhibit JJ-KK)(Morey, Candace) (Filed on 6/22/2007)
June 22, 2007 315 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition re (253 in M:06-cv-01791-VRW) MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment on State Secrets Grounds filed byDennis P. Riordan. (Pulgram, Laurence) (Filed on 6/22/2007)
June 22, 2007 314 Featured Case Declaration of Vincent I. Parrett in Support of 313 Memorandum in Opposition,,, to Verizon's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed byPamela A. Mahoney(individually, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Darryl Hines, Charles F. Bissit, Sandra Bissit, Rhea Fuller(on behalf of herself and all othres similarly situated), Tina Herron, Donald Herron, Pamela A. Mahoney, James Joll, Greg Conner, Rhea Fuller, Elaine Spielfogel-Landis, Dennis P. Riordan, Elaine Spielfogel-Landis(on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated), Pamela A. Mahoney(on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10# 11 Exhibit 11# 12 Exhibit 12# 13 Exhibit 13# 14 Exhibit 14# 15 Exhibit 15# 16 Exhibit 16# 17 Exhibit 17# 18 Exhibit 18# 19 Exhibit 19# 20 Exhibit 20)(Related document(s) 313 ) (Parrett, Vincent) (Filed on 6/22/2007)
June 22, 2007 313 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition re 268 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal) filed byPamela A. Mahoney(individually, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Darryl Hines, Charles F. Bissit, Sandra Bissit, Rhea Fuller(on behalf of herself and all othres similarly situated), Tina Herron, Donald Herron, Pamela A. Mahoney, James Joll, Greg Conner, Rhea Fuller, Elaine Spielfogel-Landis, Dennis P. Riordan, Elaine Spielfogel-Landis(on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated), Pamela A. Mahoney(on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Denying Verizon's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction)(Parrett, Vincent) (Filed on 6/22/2007)
June 21, 2007 312 Featured Case Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 6/21/2007 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker which relates to State Defendants motion to dismiss and AT&T's motion to dismiss in C07-1187 (Clayton), C07-1242 (Gaw), C07-1323 (Maine PUC), C07-1324 (O'Donnell), C07-1326 (Palermino), C07-1396 (Volz). The court submitted the matter, court to issue written ruling. (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/21/2007)
June 15, 2007 311 Featured Case NOTICE by James Douglas Cowie REGARDING SUBMITTED MATTER (Paterson, John) (Filed on 6/15/2007)
June 8, 2007 Featured Case #310A Classified Attachment re 310 (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2007)
June 8, 2007 310 Featured Case NOTICE by Andrew H Tannenbaum of Lodging by the United States of Classified Declaration of Lt. Gen. Keith B. Alexander, Director, National Security Agency, in Center for Constitutional Rights v. Bush (No. 07-1115) (Tannenbaum, Andrew) (Filed on 6/8/2007)
June 8, 2007 309 Featured Case NOTICE by Andrew H Tannenbaum of Lodging by the United States of Classified Supplemental Memorandum in Center for Constitutional Rights v. Bush (No. 07-1115) (Tannenbaum, Andrew) (Filed on 6/8/2007)
June 8, 2007 308 Featured Case MEMORANDUM in Support Supplemental Memorandum in Support of 295 Motion to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment in Center for Constitutional Rights v. Bush (07-1115) filed byUnited States of America. (Tannenbaum, Andrew) (Filed on 6/8/2007) Modified on 6/13/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
June 8, 2007 307 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 291 filed by AT&T Communications of the Southwest, Inc. Defendants in Clayton v AT&T, C07-1187, may file a reply in support of their motion to dismiss by 6/1/2007. The motion shall be heard on 6/21/2007. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 6/7/2007. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2007)
June 8, 2007 306 Featured Case Letter from Plaintiffs Dennis P. Riordan, et al. re: 304 Opposition to Verizon's Motion to Dismiss the Chulsky, Riordan, and Bready Complaints. (Pulgram, Laurence) (Filed on 6/8/2007) Modified on 6/13/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
June 8, 2007 305 Featured Case Proposed Order re (304 in M:06-cv-01791-VRW) Memorandum in Opposition to Verizon's Motion to Dismiss the Chulsky, Riordan, and Bready Complaints by Dennis P. Riordan. (Pulgram, Laurence) (Filed on 6/8/2007)
June 8, 2007 304 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition re (270 in M:06-cv-01791-VRW) MOTION to Dismiss the Chulsky, Riordan, and Bready Complaints filed byDennis P. Riordan. (Pulgram, Laurence) (Filed on 6/8/2007)
June 7, 2007 303 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 302 . The 6/21/2007 hearing date for the United States' motion to intervene in Bready is hereby vacated and is reset for 8/30/2007 at 2:00 PM. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 6/7/2007. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2007)
June 5, 2007 302 Featured Case STIPULATION [re Dkt 252] to modify the hearing date for the United States' motion to intervene in Bready by United States Of America. (Haas, Alexander) (Filed on 6/5/2007)
June 1, 2007 301 Featured Case Reply Memorandum in Support of 240 Motion of AT&T Communications of Southwest, Inc., et al. to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Application to Compel filed byAT&T Communications of the Southwest, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), AT&T Communications of the Southwest, Inc., AT&T Communications of the Southwest, Inc.. (Axelbaum, Marc) (Filed on 6/1/2007) Modified on 6/15/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
June 1, 2007 300 Featured Case REPLY to Response to Motion re 265 Brief, State Officials' Response to USA's Supplemental Brief filed byMaine Public Utilities Commission Chairman, Maine Public Utilities Commission Commissioner, Maine Public Utilities Commission Administrative Director. (Taub, Christopher) (Filed on 6/1/2007)
June 1, 2007 299 Featured Case REPLY to Response to Motion re 263 Brief Response to State Officials' Supplemental Brief filed byUnited States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit State Disclosure Orders)(Haas, Alexander) (Filed on 6/1/2007)
May 25, 2007 298 Featured Case NOTICE by United States of America of Lodging of Classified Declaration of Director of the National Security Agency (Bhattacharyya, Rupa) (Filed on 5/25/2007)
May 25, 2007 297 Featured Case NOTICE by United States of America of Lodging of Classified Declaration of Director of National Intelligence (Bhattacharyya, Rupa) (Filed on 5/25/2007)
May 25, 2007 296 Featured Case NOTICE by United States of America of Lodging of Classified Brief (Bhattacharyya, Rupa) (Filed on 5/25/2007)
May 25, 2007 295 Featured Case MOTION to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment filed by Keith B. Alexander, Michael V. Hayden, George W. Bush, United States of America. Motion Hearing set for 8/30/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Brief Part 2# 2 Exhibit Public McConnell Declaration# 3 Exhibit Public Alexander Declaration)(Bhattacharyya, Rupa) (Filed on 5/25/2007)
May 25, 2007 294 Featured Case MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Keith B. Alexander, Michael V. Hayden, George W. Bush, United States of America. (Bhattacharyya, Rupa) (Filed on 5/25/2007)
May 25, 2007 293 Featured Case NOTICE by Verizon Communications Inc, Verizon Global Networks, Inc., Verizon Northwest, Inc., MCI Communications Services, Inc., Verizon Maryland, Inc., Verizon Florida, Inc. of Attorney No Longer Associated with Case (Boynton, Brian) (Filed on 5/25/2007)
May 24, 2007 292 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition to USG's 252 Motion to Intervene filed byChristopher Bready. (Griffin, Edward) (Filed on 5/24/2007) Modified on 5/30/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
May 24, 2007 291 Featured Case STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order re Motion to Dismiss in Clayton v. AT&T Communications of the Southwest, Inc., et al. by AT&T Communications of the Southwest, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 5/24/2007)
May 24, 2007 290 Featured Case CLERK'S NOTICE changing motion hearing for state cases. Hearing now set for 6/21/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2007)
May 24, 2007 289 Featured Case STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Set Briefing and Hearing Schedule in CCR v. Bush et al. (07-1115) filed by the Government Defendants in CCR by George W. Bush(President of the United States), Federal Bureau of Investigation, National Security Agency(Ltg Keith B. Alexander, Director), Defense Intelligence Agency, Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Homeland Security, John D. Negroponte, United States of America. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 5/24/2007)
May 23, 2007 288 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER granting a one week extension for the United States and State Officials to file their Responses re 286 . Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White for Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 5/23/2007. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2007)
May 22, 2007 287 Featured Case STIPULATION re 273 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Master Consolidated Complaint, 268 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal), 253 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment, 270 MOTION to Dismiss the Chulsky, Riordan, and Bready Complaints STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER MODIFYING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE FOR VERIZON MOTIONS TO DISMISS by Elaine Spielfogel-Landis(on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated). (Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 5/22/2007)
May 22, 2007 286 Featured Case STIPULATION re 219 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Extending By One Week Response Briefs of United States and State Officials by United States of America. (Haas, Alexander) (Filed on 5/22/2007)
May 14, 2007 285 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING to extend briefing and hearing schedule in Shubert v. Bush re 283 Stipulation, filed by Alberto Gonzales,, George W. Bush,, Keith B. Alexander,, Michael V. Hayden. On or 5/25/2007, the Government will file a dispositive motion, opposition to be filed on or before 7/13/2007, any reply in support of the dispositive motion shall be filed on or before 8/3/2007. The hearing is set for 8/30/2007 at 2:00 PM. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 5/11/2007. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2007)
May 11, 2007 284 Featured Case AMENDED COMPLAINT Class Action and Demand for Jury Trial against Keith B. Alexander, Michael V. Hayden, Alberto Gonzales, George W. Bush, Mark Baker, United States Of America. Filed byVirginia Shubert, Noha Arafa, Sarah Dranoff, Hilary Botein, Trudy Bond. (Maazel, Ilann) (Filed on 5/11/2007)
May 9, 2007 283 Featured Case STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Briefing and Hearing Schedule in Shubert v. Bush, Case. No. 07-00693, filed by Government Defendants in their official capacity by Keith B. Alexander, Michael V. Hayden, Alberto Gonzales, George W. Bush. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 5/9/2007)
May 4, 2007 282 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 279 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Catherine M.A. Carroll. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2007)
May 4, 2007 281 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING NEW CASES AGAINST AT&T DEFENDANTS re 262 filed by AT&T Corp. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 5/4/2007. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2007)
May 4, 2007 280 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 277 by United States of America. The United States and State Officials shall e-file their responses to the opposing side's consolidated brief no later than 5/25/2007. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 5/4/2007. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2007)
May 2, 2007 278 Featured Case ERRATA Table of Authorities - Errata by Robert Clayton, Steve Gaw, Steve Gaw, Robert M. Clayton, III. (Whipple, Peggy) (Filed on 5/2/2007)
May 1, 2007 279 Featured Case MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice; proposed order ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 3461100583.) filed by Verizon Global Networks, Inc., Verizon Northwest, Inc., MCI Communications Services, Inc., Verizon Maryland, Inc., MCI, LLC. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2007) Modified on 5/2/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
May 1, 2007 277 Featured Case STIPULATION re 219 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief to Clarify Response Date by United States of America. (Haas, Alexander) (Filed on 5/1/2007)
May 1, 2007 275 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition Missouri State Officials' Brief of Points and Authorities in Opposition to 240 AT&T's Motion to Dismiss filed byRobert Clayton, Steve Gaw. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Whipple, Peggy) (Filed on 5/1/2007)
April 30, 2007 276 Featured Case ORDER of USCA - The court has reviewed the motion for reconsideration and responses thereto, includng the opposition to consolidation filed by the non-party plaintiff's appellees in Hepting v. AT&T. appeals No, 06-17132. 06-17137. The motion for reconsideration seeking to lift the stay of appellate proceedings is granted. Appellants' April 20, 2007 motion for leave to file an opposition to appellees' proposed briefing scheduled in appeal No. 06-36083 is granted. Appellants' opposition has been filed. The Clerk shall consolidate and calendar this appeal with the appeals Hepting v. AT&T Corp. appeal No. 06-17132, and Hepting v. United States appeal No. 06-17137. The briefing schedule in appeal Nos. 06-17132 and 06-17137 remains as previously established. The following briefing schedule shall be set for appeal No. 06-36083; the opening brief and excerpts or record are due June 6, 2007, the answering brief is due July 6, 2007; and the optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the answering brief. The provisions of Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(a) shall not be applicable to appeal No. 06-36083; any Rule 31-2.2(b) request is strongly disfavored. The Clerk shall calendar these consolidated appeals during the week of August 13-17. 2007, in San Francisco, California. No motions for reconsideration, modification or clarification of this order shall be filed or entertained. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2007)
April 30, 2007 274 Featured Case MEMORANDUM in Support re 273 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Master Consolidated Complaint filed byVerizon Communications Inc, Verizon Northwest, Inc., MCI Communications Services, Inc.. (Related document(s) 273 ) (Rogovin, John) (Filed on 4/30/2007)
April 30, 2007 273 Featured Case MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Master Consolidated Complaint filed by Verizon Communications Inc, Verizon Northwest, Inc., MCI Communications Services, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/21/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rogovin, John) (Filed on 4/30/2007)
April 30, 2007 272 Featured Case Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Verizon's Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs' Master Consolidated Complaint filed byVerizon Communications Inc, Verizon Northwest, Inc., MCI Communications Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3)(Rogovin, John) (Filed on 4/30/2007)
April 30, 2007 271 Featured Case MEMORANDUM in Support re 270 MOTION to Dismiss the Chulsky, Riordan, and Bready Complaints filed byVerizon Communications Inc, Verizon Maryland, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 270 ) (Rogovin, John) (Filed on 4/30/2007)
April 30, 2007 270 Featured Case MOTION to Dismiss the Chulsky, Riordan, and Bready Complaints filed by Verizon Communications Inc, Verizon Maryland, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/21/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rogovin, John) (Filed on 4/30/2007)
April 30, 2007 269 Featured Case MEMORANDUM in Support re 268 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal) filed byVerizon Communications Inc, Verizon Global Networks, Inc., MCI, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Joseph P. Dunbar)(Related document(s) 268 ) (Rogovin, John) (Filed on 4/30/2007)
April 30, 2007 268 Featured Case MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal) filed by Verizon Communications Inc, Verizon Global Networks, Inc., MCI, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 6/21/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rogovin, John) (Filed on 4/30/2007)
April 27, 2007 267 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Letter of April 13, 2007 (Docket No. 246) filed byUnited States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bhattacharyya, Rupa) (Filed on 4/27/2007)
April 27, 2007 266 Featured Case NOTICE of Appearance by Rupa Bhattacharyya (Bhattacharyya, Rupa) (Filed on 4/27/2007)
April 26, 2007 265 Featured Case Brief re 219 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Supplemental Brief of the United States Regarding the State Cases filed byUnited States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Exh A - Declaration of Lt. Gen. Alexander)(Related document(s) 219 ) (Haas, Alexander) (Filed on 4/26/2007)
April 26, 2007 264 Featured Case NOTICE by United States of America re 240 MOTION to Dismiss of Filing of Statement of Interest in support of motion to dismiss (Haas, Alexander) (Filed on 4/26/2007)
April 26, 2007 263 Featured Case Brief State Officials' Consolidated Brief of Ninth Circuit Law In Further Support of Pending Dispositive Motions filed byRobert Clayton, Steve Gaw, Steve Gaw, Robert M. Clayton, III. (Whipple, Peggy) (Filed on 4/26/2007)
April 25, 2007 262 Featured Case Proposed Order Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding New Cases Against AT&T Defendants by AT&T Corp.. (Axelbaum, Marc) (Filed on 4/25/2007)
April 25, 2007 261 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 251 filed by United States Of America. Having considered the parties stipulation to permit intervention by the United States pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 24, the United States is allowed to intervene in the actions covered by the stipulation as a defendant. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 4/24/2007. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2007)
April 23, 2007 260 Featured Case ORDER by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 237 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Randal S Milch. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2007)
April 23, 2007 259 Featured Case ORDER by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 236 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of William P Barr. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2007)
April 21, 2007 258 Featured Case MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by United States of America. Motion Hearing set for 6/21/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 4/21/2007)
April 21, 2007 257 Featured Case NOTICE by United States of America of Lodging of Classified Declaration of the Director of the National Security Agency (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 4/21/2007)
April 21, 2007 256 Featured Case NOTICE by United States of America of Lodging of Classified Declaration of the Director of National Intelligence (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 4/21/2007)
April 21, 2007 255 Featured Case NOTICE by United States of America of Lodging of Classified Brief (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 4/21/2007)
April 20, 2007 254 Featured Case MEMORANDUM in Support of 253 Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment filed byUnited States Of America. (Attachments: # 1 Brief Part 2# 2 Declaration of the Director of National Intelligence# 3 Declaration of the Director of the National Security Agency)(Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 4/20/2007) Modified on 4/24/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
April 20, 2007 253 Featured Case MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment filed by United States Of America. Motion Hearing set for 6/21/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 4/20/2007)
April 20, 2007 252 Featured Case MOTION to Intervene in Bready (MDL 06-6313) filed by United States Of America. Motion Hearing set for 6/21/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Haas, Alexander) (Filed on 4/20/2007)
April 20, 2007 251 Featured Case STIPULATION Permitting the United States to Intervene by United States Of America. (Haas, Alexander) (Filed on 4/20/2007)
April 20, 2007 250 Featured Case Letter from John M.R. Paterson. (Paterson, John) (Filed on 4/20/2007)
April 19, 2007 249 Featured Case STIPULATION re 246 Letter Setting Schedule for United States to Respond to Plaintiffs' Filing by United States, George W. Bush, National Security Agency, United States Of America. (Haas, Alexander) (Filed on 4/19/2007)
April 18, 2007 248 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 244 filed by Qwest Communications International, Inc. Defendant QWest Communications International Inc need not answer or otherwise respond to the complaint in United States v Rabner Case No. 07-1324 until sixty days after this Court issues an order resolving the dispositive motions set for hearing by the Order of 3/26/2007. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 4/18/2007. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2007)
April 17, 2007 247 Featured Case Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-6) - Howard Jacobs, et al. v AT&T Corop., et al., S.D. Florida, C.A. No. 0:07-60365 signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/18/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
April 13, 2007 246 Featured Case Letter from Attorneys for Plaintiffs Requesting Administrative Relief. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Re Government Ex Parte, In Camera Filings)(Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 4/13/2007)
April 13, 2007 245 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING PAGE LIMITS FOR BRIEFING VERIZON'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' MASTER CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT. Verizon shall be permitted to file a brief not to exceed 50 pages in support of its motion to dismiss master complaint. The Verizon and MCI Plaintiffs shall be permitted to file a brief not to exceed 50 pages in opposition to Verizon's motion to dismiss master complaint. Verizon shall be permitted to file a reply brief not to exceed 30 pages. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 4/13/2007. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2007)
April 13, 2007 244 Featured Case STIPULATION by Qwest Communications International, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order To Extend Time For Defendant Qwest Communications to Respond to Complaint# 2 Affidavit Certificate of Service of Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Extend Time for Qwest to Respond to Complaint)(Benson, Robert) (Filed on 4/13/2007)
April 11, 2007 243 Featured Case CLERK'S NOTICE Advising Counsel of Receipt of the Case Anderson, et al -v- Verizon Communications Inc., et al from the Southern District of New York. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2007)
April 10, 2007 Featured Case Receipt from Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr LLP in the amount of $420.00 for 2 pro hac vice applications for William P. Barr and Randal S. Milch. Receipt #34611005160 (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2007)
April 10, 2007 242 Featured Case STIPULATION re 208 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Verizon Communications Inc, Verizon Northwest, Inc., MCI Communications Services, Inc.. (Rogovin, John) (Filed on 4/10/2007)
April 9, 2007 241 Featured Case Proposed Order re 240 MOTION to Dismiss by AT&T Communications of the Southwest, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), Southwestern Bell Telephone, L.P.(a Texas limited partnership), SBC Advanced Solutions, Inc., TCG St. Louis Holdings, Inc., TCG Kansas City, Inc., SBC Long Distance, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company doing business as AT&T Long Distance). (Axelbaum, Marc) (Filed on 4/9/2007)
April 9, 2007 240 Featured Case MOTION to Dismiss filed by AT&T Communications of the Southwest, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), Southwestern Bell Telephone, L.P.(a Texas limited partnership), SBC Advanced Solutions, Inc., TCG St. Louis Holdings, Inc., TCG Kansas City, Inc., SBC Long Distance, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company doing business as AT&T Long Distance). Motion Hearing set for 6/14/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Axelbaum, Marc) (Filed on 4/9/2007)
April 9, 2007 239 Featured Case NOTICE by United States of America of Lodging of Classified Submission (Tannenbaum, Andrew) (Filed on 4/9/2007)
April 9, 2007 238 Featured Case NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Matthew Boynton for William P. Barr, Randal S. Milch, Henry Weissmann, Susan Szabo, and Aimee Feinberg (Boynton, Brian) (Filed on 4/9/2007)
April 9, 2007 237 Featured Case MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Randal S. Milch (Filing fee $ 210.) filed by Verizon Communications Inc, Verizon Global Networks, Inc., Verizon Northwest, Inc., MCI Communications Services, Inc., Verizon Maryland, Inc., MCI, LLC. (Boynton, Brian) (Filed on 4/9/2007)
April 9, 2007 236 Featured Case MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by William P. Barr (Filing fee $ 210.) filed by Verizon Communications Inc, Verizon Global Networks, Inc., Verizon Northwest, Inc., MCI Communications Services, Inc., Verizon Maryland, Inc., MCI, LLC. (Boynton, Brian) (Filed on 4/9/2007)
April 6, 2007 235 Featured Case NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Embarq Corporation by Richard D. Suchanek, III (Mason, Gary) (Filed on 4/6/2007)
April 5, 2007 234 Featured Case NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Michael Nicholas Donofrio (Donofrio, Michael) (Filed on 4/5/2007)
April 5, 2007 233 Featured Case Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed byJames Volz, David C. Coen, John D. Burke, David O'Brien. (Donofrio, Michael) (Filed on 4/5/2007)
April 5, 2007 232 Featured Case Reply Memorandum in support of summary judgment (US v. Volz) filed byUnited States of America. (Haas, Alexander) (Filed on 4/5/2007)
April 5, 2007 231 Featured Case Reply Memorandum in support of summary judgment (US v. Palermino) filed byUnited States of America. (Haas, Alexander) (Filed on 4/5/2007)
April 5, 2007 230 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 223 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by All Plaintiffs. This document to all actions brought against MCI Defendants and Verizon Defendants. Plaintiffs, by counsel, pursuant to FRCP Rule 41(a)(1), hereby voluntarily dismisses without prejudice defendants Cellco Partnership dba Verizon Wireless, NYNEX Corp, GTE Wireless Inc, GTE Wireless of the South Inc, NYNEX PCS Inc, Verizon Wireless of the East LP, Verizon Internet Services Inc, Bell Atlantic Entertainment and Information Services Group, Verizon Internet Solutions Inc, Verizon Technology Corp and Verizon Advanced Data Inc.. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 4/5/2007. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2007)
April 5, 2007 229 Featured Case Reply to Opposition CT-OCC's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byOffice of Consumer Counsel-CT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit CT-DPUC Draft Decision 030707)(Vallee, William) (Filed on 4/5/2007)
April 5, 2007 228 Featured Case Reply to Opposition to ACLU-CT's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byAmerican Civil Liberties Union of CT. (Boulton, Wayne) (Filed on 4/5/2007)
April 4, 2007 227 Featured Case NOTICE by United States of America of Order by Court of Appeals Granting the Government's Motion for a Stay Pending Appeal in Al-Haramain v. Bush (Attachments: # 1 April 4, 2007 Order of the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit)(Tannenbaum, Andrew) (Filed on 4/4/2007)
April 2, 2007 226 Featured Case NOTICE by Tash Hepting NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY AFFILIATION (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 4/2/2007)
March 30, 2007 225 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED RE MOTION TO DISMISS IN CLAYTON v AT&T COMMUNICATIONS OF THE SOUTHWEST, INC : This order relates to C07-1187 (Clayton): Defendants in Clayton v. AT&T Communications of the Southwest Inc shall file its motion to dismiss the complaint by 4/9/2007. Plaintiffs shall file an opposition by 5/1/2007. Defendants may file a reply by 5/25/2007. The motion shall be heard on 6/14/2007 at 2:00 PM, the same day set for hearing the dispositive motions in the state cases. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 3/30/2007. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2007)
March 30, 2007 224 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR AT&T AND CINGULAR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINTS. This document relates to C07-1324 (US v Rabner), C07-1326 (US v Palermino) and C07-1396 (US v Volz): The AT&T and Cingular Defendants need not answer or otherwise respond to the complaints until 60 days after this court issues an order resolving the dispositive motions set for hearing by the court's Order of 3/26/2007. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 3/30/2007. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2007)
March 30, 2007 223 Featured Case NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Verizon Wireless and Verizon Internet Entities by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Parrett, Vincent) (Filed on 3/30/2007)
March 29, 2007 222 Featured Case STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE MOTION TO DISMISS IN CLAYTON V. AT&T COMMUNICATIONS OF THE SOUTHWEST, INC., ET AL. by AT&T Communications of the Southwest, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), Southwestern Bell Telephone, L.P.(a Texas limited partnership), SBC Long Distance LLC, SBC Advanced Solutions, Inc., TCG St. Louis Holdings, Inc., TCG Kansas City, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Axelbaum, Marc) (Filed on 3/29/2007)
March 28, 2007 221 Featured Case STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Extend Time for AT&T and Cingular Defendants to Respond to Complaints by AT&T Communications, AT&T Teleholdings, Cingular Wireless Corporation, Cingular Wireless LLC, Illinois Bell, Indiana Bell, Pac Bell Telephone Co., SBC Communications, SBC Long Distance LLC, AT&T Corp., AT&T Operations, Inc., New Cingular Wireless Services, Inc., AT&T Communications of California, AT&T Inc.. (Axelbaum, Marc) (Filed on 3/28/2007)
March 28, 2007 220 Featured Case Reply Memorandum Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Administrative Motion Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-11 for an Interim Stay of Briefing Pending the Court of Appeals' Consideration of Defendants' Stay Motion filed byAl-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc., Wendell Belew, Asim Ghafoor. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 3/28/2007)
March 26, 2007 Featured Case Set/Reset Hearings: Hearing on dispositive motions in state cases set for 6/14/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2007)
March 26, 2007 219 Featured Case ORDER by Chief Judge Walker regarding 190 motion for scheduling order (vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2007)
March 26, 2007 218 Featured Case MOTION Administrative Motion for an Interim Stay of Briefing Pending the Court of Appeals' Consideration of Defendants' Stay Motion filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Government's Motion to Ninth Circuit for Stay Pending Appeal)# 2 Declaration of Andrew H. Tannenbaum in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion for an Interim Stay# 3 Proposed Order)(Tannenbaum, Andrew) (Filed on 3/26/2007)
March 22, 2007 Featured Case Set/Reset Hearings: Hearing on Verizon motions set for 6/21/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2007)
March 22, 2007 217 Featured Case ORDER by Chief Judge Walker granting 194 motion for extension of time to file. (vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2007)
March 22, 2007 213 Featured Case NOTICE by Richard D. Suchanek, III of Change of Address and Firm Name for Alexander Barnett and Change of Firm Name for Gary E. Mason (Barnett, Alexander) (Filed on 3/22/2007)
March 22, 2007 212 Featured Case Reply to Opposition re 208 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed byVerizon Wireless, LLC, Verizon Northwest, Inc., MCI Communications Services, Inc., Verizon Maryland, Inc., Cellco Partnership. (Rogovin, John) (Filed on 3/22/2007)
March 21, 2007 216 Featured Case ORDER by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 206 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ty Cobb. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2007)
March 21, 2007 215 Featured Case ORDER by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 205 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christopher R. Zaetta. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2007)
March 21, 2007 214 Featured Case ORDER by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 204 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christine Varney. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2007)
March 21, 2007 211 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition re 208 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed byElaine Spielfogel-Landis. (Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 3/21/2007)
March 20, 2007 210 Featured Case IT IS SO ORDERED AS MODIFIED TO EXTEND DEADLINES FOR MOTION TO DISMISS AND RELATED BRIEFING IN SHUBERT v. BUSH (C07-0693). Pursuant to the stipulation: On or before 5/18/2007, the Government may file a dispositive motion and any assertion of the military and state secrets privilege in Shubert v. Bush, Case C07-0693; on or before 6/29/2007, Plaintiffs in Shubert may file an opposition to the dispositive motion; on or before 7/20/2007, the Government may file their reply brief in support of its dispositive motion. Oral argument on the dispositive motion has been set for 8/16/2007 at 2:00 PM. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 3/20/2007. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2007)
March 20, 2007 209 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR BELLSOUTH DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT. It is hereby Ordered that the BellSouth Defendants shall have until May 29, 2007 to answer or otherwise respond to the BellSouth Consolidated Complaint, or shall have 28 days after the Court's decision on any motion to dismiss the Master Consolidated Complaint against MCI Defendants and Verizon Defendants brought by any defendant named by docket #125 (Master Consolidated Complaint). This order shall apply to the following cases: C06-5343 (Herron); C06-5485 (Joll); C06-5576 (Conner); C06-6253 (Derosier); C07-0464 (Lebow) and Mayer v Verizon Communications Inc (06-3650 S.D.N.Y). Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 3/20/2007. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2007)
March 19, 2007 208 Featured Case MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Verizon Wireless, LLC, Verizon Northwest, Inc., MCI Communications Services, Inc., Verizon Maryland, Inc., Cellco Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Affidavit of John A. Rogovin in Support of Motion)(Rogovin, John) (Filed on 3/19/2007)
March 15, 2007 202 Featured Case Joinder in the Administrative Motion of the United States for a Scheduling Order by Verizon Communications Inc, Verizon Global Networks, Inc., Verizon Northwest, Inc., MCI Communications Services, Inc., Verizon Wireless Services, Inc., Verizon Wireless LLC, Verizon Maryland, Inc., Cellco Partnership, MCI, LLC. (Rogovin, John) (Filed on 3/15/2007)
March 15, 2007 201 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition to US Administrative Motion filed byTash Hepting. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit # 4 Exhibit # 5 Proposed Order)(Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 3/15/2007)
March 14, 2007 207 Featured Case CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Qwest Communications International, Inc. re Proposed Order, 205 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 3461100409.), 203 Notice of Appearance, Proposed Order, 206 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 3461100409.), 204 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 3461100409.), Proposed Order (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2007)
March 14, 2007 Featured Case Proposed Order re 206 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 3461100409.) by Qwest Communications International, Inc.. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2007)
March 14, 2007 206 Featured Case MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Ty Cobb ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 3461100409.) filed by Qwest Communications International, Inc.. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2007)
March 14, 2007 Featured Case Proposed Order re 205 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 3461100409.) by Qwest Communications International, Inc.. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2007)
March 14, 2007 205 Featured Case MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Christopher R. Zaetta( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611004097.) filed by Qwest Communications International, Inc.. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2007)
March 14, 2007 Featured Case Proposed Order re 204 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 3461100409.) by Qwest Communications International, Inc.. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2007)
March 14, 2007 204 Featured Case MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611004097.) filed by Qwest Communications International, Inc.. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2007)
March 14, 2007 203 Featured Case NOTICE of Appearance - Robert J. Benson - Qwest Communications International, Inc. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2007)
March 14, 2007 200 Featured Case EXHIBITS re 197 Status Report (EXHIBIT A ONLY) filed byBellSouth Corporation, AT&T Corp.. (Related document(s) 197 ) (Axelbaum, Marc) (Filed on 3/14/2007)
March 14, 2007 199 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER STAYING ALL CASES (EXCEPT HEPTING) AGAINST AT&T DEFENDANTS. This order will apply to the following cases: C06-3467(Roe), C06-3596(Campbell), C06-5065(Mahoney), C06-5067(Souder), C06-5268(Trevino), C06-5269(Dolberg), C06-5340(Terkel), C06-5343(Herron), C06-5452(Harrington), C06-5485(Joll), C06-5576(Conner), C06-6222(Cross), C06-6224(Cross), C06-6294(Waxman), C06-6385(Fortnash), C06-6387(Dubois), C06-6570(Chulsky), C06-6924(Hardy), C06-7934(Mink), C07-1234(Roche), and Mayer v Verizon Communications Inc et al. This stay does not affect any claims in any of the referenced cases against non-AT&T Defendants, nor any cases in which the United States is a plaintiff, nor in C07-1187 (Clayton v AT&T Communications of the Southwest, Inc). Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 3/14/2007. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2007)
March 14, 2007 198 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition re 190 MOTION Scheduling Order filed byUnited States of America, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh A -- Proposed Schedule# 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Haas, Alexander) (Filed on 3/14/2007)
March 13, 2007 Featured Case Set/Reset Hearings: Hearing on the motion for partial summary judgment filed by Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation set for 5/3/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2007)
March 13, 2007 197 Featured Case STATUS REPORT MDL Status Report by BellSouth Corporation, AT&T Corp.. (Attachments: *** # 1 Exhibit A FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 200 . *** # 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Axelbaum, Marc) (Filed on 3/13/2007) Modified on 3/15/2007 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
March 13, 2007 196 Featured Case ORDER setting briefing schedule for plaintiffs' motion for partial summary judgment in Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc, et al v Bush, et al, 07-109. Signed by Chief Judge Walker on 3/13/07. (vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2007)
March 13, 2007 195 Featured Case NOTICE by United States of America of Lodging of Classified Supplement in Support of United States' Administrative Motion to Change Time and for a Scheduling Order (Tannenbaum, Andrew) (Filed on 3/13/2007)
March 12, 2007 194 Featured Case MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaints filed by Keith B. Alexander, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Michael V. Hayden, Defense Intelligence Agency, Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Homeland Security, George W. Bush, National Security Agency, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Anthony J. Coppolino# 2 Proposed Order)(Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 3/12/2007)
March 12, 2007 193 Featured Case STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Deadlines in Shubert v. Bush, No. 07-693 by United States of America. (Tannenbaum, Andrew) (Filed on 3/12/2007)
March 12, 2007 192 Featured Case STIPULATION Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Extend Time for BellSouth Defendants to Respond to Consolidated Complaint by BellSouth Telecommunications, Inc., BellSouth Communications Systems, LLC, BellSouth Corp.. (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 3/12/2007)
March 12, 2007 191 Featured Case CLERK'S NOTICE Advising Counsel of Receipt of the Action United Staes of America -v- James Volz, et al from the District of Vermont. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2007)
March 9, 2007 190 Featured Case MOTION Scheduling Order filed by Robert Clayton, Steve Gaw, Steve Gaw, Robert M. Clayton, III. (Whipple, Peggy) (Filed on 3/9/2007)
March 9, 2007 189 Featured Case Proposed order to 190 MOTION Scheduling Order filed by Robert Clayton, Steve Gaw, Steve Gaw, Robert M. Clayton, III. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Whipple, Peggy) (Filed on 3/9/2007) Modified on 3/12/2007 (wv, COURT STAFF).
March 8, 2007 188 Featured Case STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Staying Cases Against AT&T Defendants by AT&T Communications, AT&T Teleholdings, Illinois Bell, Indiana Bell, Pac Bell Telephone Co., SBC Communications, SBC Long Distance LLC, AT&T Corp., AT&T Operations, Inc., AT&T Communications of California, AT&T Inc.. (Axelbaum, Marc) (Filed on 3/8/2007)
March 8, 2007 187 Featured Case Letter Brief Requesting Consideration of Pending Motions to Intervene filed byChristopher Branson, David L. Cowie, James Douglas Cowie, Maureen Dea, Sally Dobres, John H. Donovan, Lisa Hicks, Maine Public Advocate, Thomas Mundhenk, Harold Noel, Gwethalyn M. Phillips, Paul Sarvis, Margaret Siegle, Lou Solebello, Ethan Strimling, Barbara Taylor, Kristen A. Tyson, Paul G. Tyson, James W. Woodworth. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order granting intervention of Cowie, et al., defendants# 2 Proposed Order Proposed order granting intervention of Maine Public Advocate)(Heiden, Zachary) (Filed on 3/8/2007)
March 7, 2007 186 Featured Case CLERK'S NOTICE Advising Counsel of Receipt of Cases from the the District of Maine, District of New Jersey, and the District of Connecticut. (Attachments: #(1) U.S. -v- Adams, et al; #(2) U.S. -v- Farber, et al; #(3) U.S. -v- Palermino, et al) (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2007)
March 5, 2007 185 Featured Case ORDER Granting 181 Notice of Dismissal of Transworld Netowrk Corp. filed by All Plaintiffs. Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1) Defendant Transworld Network Corp is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 3/5/2007. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2007)
March 5, 2007 184 Featured Case ORDER Granting 180 Notice of Dismissal of Comcast Telecommunications, inc. filed by All Plaintiffs. Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1) defendant Comcast Telecommunications, Inc is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 3/5/2007. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2007)
March 2, 2007 183 Featured Case CLERK'S NOTICE Advising Counsel of Receipt of cases from the Eastern District of Missouri and the District of Minnesota. (Attachments: #(1) U.S. -v- Gaw, et al; #(2) Roche -v- AT&T Corp) (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2007)
March 1, 2007 182 Featured Case CLERK'S NOTICE Advising Counsel of Receipt of the Case Robert Clayton, et al -v- AT&T Communications, et al from the Western District of Missouri. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2007)
February 28, 2007 181 Featured Case NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Transworld Network Corp. by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Parrett, Vincent) (Filed on 2/28/2007)
February 28, 2007 180 Featured Case NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Comcast Telecommunications, Inc. by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Parrett, Vincent) (Filed on 2/28/2007)
February 26, 2007 179 Featured Case CLERK'S NOTICE Advising Counsel of Receipt of the Case Center for Constitutional Rights, et al -v- Bush, et al from the Southern District of New York. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2007)
February 22, 2007 178 Featured Case ORDER re 166 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Electron Tubes, Inc. (C06-6433). Plaintiff, by counsel, pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, hereby files this notice of dismissal without prejudice of Defendants Verizon Communications, Cellco Partnership and the National Security Agency. As there are no other active defendants in this case, this case is hereby dismissed. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 2/22/2007. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2007)
February 22, 2007 177 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER TO STAY CASES AGAINST CINGULAR et al., pending the final appellate ruling on this Court's 7/20/2006 ruling in Hepting et al v AT&T Corp et al. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 2/22/2007. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2007)
February 22, 2007 176 Featured Case NOTICE by Keith B. Alexander(its Director), George W. Bush, National Security Agency, United States of America, United States Of America Notice of Loding of Classified Declaration of Lt. Gen. Keith B. Alexander (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 2/22/2007)
February 22, 2007 175 Featured Case NOTICE by Keith B. Alexander, George W. Bush, National Security Agency, United States of America, United States of America Notice of Filing of Public Declaration of Lt. Gen. Keith B. Alexander (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 2/22/2007)
February 21, 2007 174 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 2/9/2007 before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter: Connie Kuhl.. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2007)
February 21, 2007 173 Featured Case TRANSFER ORDER. Signed by William Terrell Hodges, Chairman, Multidistrict Litigation on 2/21/2007. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2007)
February 20, 2007 172 Featured Case ORDER by Chief Judge Walker granting in part and denying in part 67 motion to stay. (vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2007)
February 20, 2007 171 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part motions to intervene and unseal. Doc ##133, 139, CV-06-672-VRW. Signed by Chief Judge Walker on 2/20/2007. (vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2007)
February 16, 2007 170 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER : Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the parties stipulate to the dismissal of Defendant Charter Communications, LLC without prejudice in this action. Each party will bear its own costs and attorney's fees. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 2/16/2007. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2007)
February 16, 2007 169 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER : Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the parties stipulate to the dismissal of defendant Bright House Networks, LLC without prejudice, in the action. Each party will bear its own costs and attorney's fees. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 2/16/2007. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2007)
February 16, 2007 168 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER : Pursuant to the Stipulation of Dismissal filed by the parties, and good cause appearing, Bright House Networks LLC is hereby dismissed without prejudice from this action. Each party will bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on February 16, 2007. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2007)
February 16, 2007 167 Featured Case NOTICE by Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Gregory Hicks NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY AFFILIATION (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 2/16/2007)
February 16, 2007 166 Featured Case NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Electron Tubes, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Parrett, Vincent) (Filed on 2/16/2007)
February 16, 2007 165 Featured Case NOTICE by Keith B. Alexander, George W. Bush, National Security Agency, United States of America, United States Of America of Decision by Judicial Panel on Transfer of State Cases (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh A -- JPML 021507 Transfer Order)(Haas, Alexander) (Filed on 2/16/2007)
February 14, 2007 164 Featured Case ORDER Granting re 159 Voluntary Dismissal of T-Mobile USA, Inc. filed by All Plaintiffs. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 2/14/2007. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2007)
February 14, 2007 163 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING TO STAY CASES AGAINST SPRINT. Cases C06-6222, C06-6224, C06-6254, C06-6295, C07-0464 stayed. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 2/14/2007. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2007)
February 14, 2007 162 Featured Case ORDER granting re 158 Voluntary Dismissal of McLeod USA Telecommunications Services, Inc. filed by All Plaintiffs. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 2/14/2007. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2007)
February 9, 2007 161 Featured Case Minute Entry: Order to Show Cause and Motion Hearing held on 2/9/2007 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker re 100 MOTION for Joinder in United States' Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Disposition of Interlocutory Appeals In Hepting v. AT&T Corp.; Memorandum of Law filed by AT&T Corp.,, 67 MOTION to Stay MDL Proceedings filed by National Security Agency,, George W. Bush,, United States Of America,, Keith B. Alexander. The Court heard argument from counsel. The Court took the matter(s) under-submission. Court to issue written ruling. (Court Reporter Connie Kuhl.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/9/2007)
February 8, 2007 160 Featured Case STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Stay Cases Against Sprint by Sprint Nextel Corporation. (Kester, John) (Filed on 2/8/2007)
February 7, 2007 159 Featured Case NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of T-Mobile USA, Inc. by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Parrett, Vincent) (Filed on 2/7/2007)
February 7, 2007 158 Featured Case NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of McLeodUSA Telecommunications Services, Inc. by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Parrett, Vincent) (Filed on 2/7/2007)
February 5, 2007 157 Featured Case RESPONSE in Support Surreply in Opposition to Motion to Stay filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 2/5/2007)
February 1, 2007 156 Featured Case Declaration of BARRY HIMMELSTEIN in Support of 155 Response to Order to Show Cause, AND REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EXHIBITS P-Z)(Related document(s) 155 ) (Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 2/1/2007)
February 1, 2007 155 Featured Case Response to Order to Show Cause 112 Order,,,, 79 Order CLASS PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY RULINGS ON HEPTING MOTIONS TO DISMISS SHOULD NOT APPLY byAll Plaintiffs. (Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 2/1/2007)
February 1, 2007 154 Featured Case RESPONSE TO 112 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by United States Of America. (Tannenbaum, Andrew) (Filed on 2/1/2007) Modified on 2/12/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
February 1, 2007 153 Featured Case RESPONSE TO 112 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by BellSouth Communications Systems, LLC, BellSouth Telecommunications, Inc., Cingular Wireless Corporation, Cingular Wireless LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Mobility Corporation, BellSouth Corp., New Cingular Wireless Services, Inc.. (Axelbaum, Marc) (Filed on 2/1/2007) Modified on 2/12/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
February 1, 2007 152 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER DEFERRING RESPONSES TO CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINTS. Pursuant to the foregoing Stipulation, and good cause appearing, the Court orders the following: 1. At the hearing on the United States' motion for stay, currently scheduled for 2/9/2007, the Court will address when Defendants must respond to the complaints filed against them. 2. No Defendants need respond to any complaints until the Court sets a date for such a response. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 2/1/2007. (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2007)
February 1, 2007 151 Featured Case RESPONSE TO 112 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Verizon Communications Inc, Verizon Global Networks, Inc., Verizon Northwest, Inc., MCI Communications Services, Inc., Verizon Wireless Services, Inc., Verizon Wireless LLC, Verizon Maryland, Inc., Cellco Partnership, MCI, LLC. (Boynton, Brian) (Filed on 2/1/2007) Modified on 2/12/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
February 1, 2007 150 Featured Case Response to 112 Order to Show Cause byComcast Telecommunications, Inc.. (Soriano, Christopher) (Filed on 2/1/2007) Modified on 2/12/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
February 1, 2007 149 Featured Case RESPONSE TO 112 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Sprint Nextel Corporation. (Kester, John) (Filed on 2/1/2007) Modified on 2/12/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
February 1, 2007 148 Featured Case RESPONSE TO 112 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Pacific Bell Telephone Co., SBC Long Distance LLC, AT&T Communications, AT&T Teleholdings, Illinois Bell, Indiana Bell, SBC Communications, AT&T Operations, Inc., AT&T Communications of California, AT&T Inc.. (Axelbaum, Marc) (Filed on 2/1/2007) Modified on 2/12/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
February 1, 2007 147 Featured Case Reply to Opposition 67 Reply in Support of United States' Motion for a Stay Pending Appeal filed byUnited States, Keith B. Alexander, Office of Foreign Assets Control, George W. Bush, National Security Agency, United States Of America. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 2/1/2007) Modified on 2/12/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
February 1, 2007 146 Featured Case Joinder re 141 Reply to Opposition Joinder of Cingular and BellSouth Defendants in Sprint's Reply in Support of Motion for Stay by Bellsouth Communication Systems, LLC, Cingular Wireless Corporation, Cingular Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services, Inc., BellSouth Corp., BellSouth Telecomminications, Inc.. (Axelbaum, Marc) (Filed on 2/1/2007)
February 1, 2007 145 Featured Case Reply Memorandum 67 in Support of United States' Motion for a Stay Pending Disposition of Interlocutory Appeal in Hepting v. AT&T filed byVerizon Communications Inc, Verizon Global Networks, Inc., Verizon Northwest, Inc., MCI Communications Services, Inc., Verizon Wireless Services, Inc., Verizon Wireless LLC, Verizon Maryland, Inc., Cellco Partnership, MCI, LLC. (Boynton, Brian) (Filed on 2/1/2007) Modified on 2/12/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
February 1, 2007 144 Featured Case Declaration of Bruce A. Ericson in Support of 143 Stipulation to Stay Cases Against Cingular filed byCingular Wireless Corporation, Cingular Wireless LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Mobility Corporation, New Cingular Wireless Services, Inc.. (Related document(s) 143 ) (Axelbaum, Marc) (Filed on 2/1/2007)
February 1, 2007 143 Featured Case STIPULATION to Stay Cases Against Cingular by AT&T Mobility Corporation, Cingular Wireless Corporation, Cingular Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services, Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC. (Axelbaum, Marc) (Filed on 2/1/2007)
February 1, 2007 142 Featured Case Reply Memorandum re 100 MOTION for Joinder in United States' Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Disposition of Interlocutory Appeals In Hepting v. AT&T Corp.; Memorandum of Law filed byAT&T Corp.. (Axelbaum, Marc) (Filed on 2/1/2007)
February 1, 2007 141 Featured Case Reply to Opposition 67 in Support of Motion for Stay filed bySprint Nextel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1)(Kester, John) (Filed on 2/1/2007) Modified on 2/12/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
January 31, 2007 140 Featured Case NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Marc H. Axelbaum for the BellSouth Defendants (Axelbaum, Marc) (Filed on 1/31/2007)
January 30, 2007 139 Featured Case STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER DEFERRING RESPONSES TO CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINTS by AT&T Corp.. (Axelbaum, Marc) (Filed on 1/30/2007)
January 30, 2007 138 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED. The Government and the Major Carriers shall e-file their replies on the motion to stay no later than 2:00 p.m. PST (5:00 p.m. EST) on 2/1/2007. The Plaintiffs shall e-file their single sur-reply, limited to responding to arguments, if any, in the replies that are based on the Notice of the Foreign Intelligence Surveillance Act Orders, which was filed on 1/17/2007 no later than 2:00 p.m. PST (5:00 p.m. EST) on 2/5/2007. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 1/30/2007. (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2007)
January 29, 2007 137 Featured Case NOTICE of Appearance by R. James George, Jr for Gary L. Lewis (George, R.) (Filed on 1/29/2007)
January 29, 2007 136 Featured Case STIPULATION to Extend Deadline for Replies for Motion to Stay by United States, George W. Bush(President of the United States), National Security Agency, George W. Bush, National Security Agency, United States Of America, United States of America, United States of America. (Haas, Alexander) (Filed on 1/29/2007)
January 29, 2007 135 Featured Case NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas A Migliaccio on behalf of Richard D. Suchanek, III (Migliaccio, Nicholas) (Filed on 1/29/2007)
January 25, 2007 134 Featured Case NOTICE of Change of Address by Justin Isreal Woods Notice of Change of Address by Sidney Bach (Woods, Justin) (Filed on 1/25/2007)
January 25, 2007 133 Featured Case CLERK'S NOTICE Advising Counsel of Receipt of the Case Lebow, et al -v- BellSouth Corp., et al from the Northern District of Georgia. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2007)
January 24, 2007 132 Featured Case NOTICE by Verizon Communications Inc, Verizon Global Networks, Inc., Verizon Northwest, Inc., MCI Communications Services, Inc., Verizon Maryland, Inc., Cellco Partnership, MCI, LLC of Attorney No Longer Associated with this Case (Boynton, Brian) (Filed on 1/24/2007)
January 22, 2007 131 Featured Case NOTICE by Keith B. Alexander, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Robert W. Werner, Federal Bureau of Investigation, George W. Bush, National Security Agency Regarding Transcript Orders in Case No. C-07-0109-VRW (Tannenbaum, Andrew) (Filed on 1/22/2007)
January 18, 2007 130 Featured Case ORDER denying motion to remand brought by plaintiffs in Riordan (06-3574) and Campbell (06-3596). Signed by Chief Judge Walker on 1/18/07. (vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2007)
January 17, 2007 129 Featured Case AFFIDAVIT in Opposition to Gov't Motion to Stay filed byTash Hepting. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Salon Article# 2 Exhibit Ex 2 - CNET article)(Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 1/17/2007)
January 17, 2007 128 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition to Gov't Motion to Stay filed byTash Hepting. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 1/17/2007)
January 17, 2007 127 Featured Case NOTICE by United States Of America of Attorney General's Letter to Congress (Attachments: # 1 Letter from the Attorney General to Senators Leahy and Specter (Jan. 17, 2007))(Tannenbaum, Andrew) (Filed on 1/17/2007)
January 16, 2007 126 Featured Case AMENDED COMPLAINT MASTER CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT AGAINST BELLSOUTH DEFENDANTS against Bellsouth Communication Systems, LLC, BellSouth Telecommunications, Inc., BellSouth Communications Systems, LLC, BellSouth Corp., BellSouth Telecomminications, Inc.. Filed byLinda Gettier, Melissa Scroggins, James Nurkiewicz, Carolyn R. Hensley, Douglas S. Hensley, Heather Derosier, Lisa Lockwood, Joe McMurray, Cathy Bruning, Steven Bruning, Steven Lebow, Clyde Michael Morgan, Ilene Pruett, Anthony Bartelemy, Stephen M. Kampmann, Tina Herron, Brandy Sergi, John Clark, Thomas Michael Fain, John Fitzpatrick. (Schwarz, Steven) (Filed on 1/16/2007)
January 16, 2007 125 Featured Case AMENDED COMPLAINT MASTER CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT AGAINST MCI DEFENDANTS AND VERIZON DEFENDANTS against Verizon Northwest, Inc.(an active Washington Corporation), Verizon Communications, Inc.(an active Delaware corporation), Verizon Communications Inc, Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Wireless, LLC, Verizon, Verizon Northwest, Inc., MCI Communications Services, Inc., Verizon Wireless Services, Inc., Verizon Wireless LLC, Verizon Maryland, Inc., MCI, LLC, Verizon Communications, Inc.(a corporation), Verizon Communications, Inc., MCI, LLC, Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc.. Filed byElaine Spielfogel-Landis. (Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 1/16/2007)
January 16, 2007 124 Featured Case AMENDED COMPLAINT Consolidated against Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Nextel Corporation. Filed byRichard D. Suchanek, III. (Mason, Gary) (Filed on 1/16/2007)
January 16, 2007 123 Featured Case AMENDED COMPLAINT MASTER CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT against T-Mobile USA, Inc., Comcast Telecommunications, Inc., McLeodusa Telecommunications Services, Inc., Transworld Network Corp.. Filed byTravis Cross, Sam Goldstein, Libertarian party of Indiana, Carolyn W. Rader, Sam Goldstein Insurance Agency, Inc., Sean Shepherd, Christopher Yowtz, Rebecca Yowtz. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 1/16/2007)
January 16, 2007 122 Featured Case NOTICE by Benson B. Roe(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL (Finberg, James) (Filed on 1/16/2007)
January 16, 2007 121 Featured Case AMENDED COMPLAINT MASTER COMPLAINT AGAINST CINGULAR WIRELESS against AT&T Mobility LLC, Cingular Wireless Corporation, Cingular Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services, Inc.. Filed byBrian Bradley, Cathy Bruning, Steven Bruning, Kim Coco Iwamoto, Anakalia Kaluna, Steven Lebow, Alan Toly Sapoznik, Sam Goldstein Insurance Agency, Inc., Heather Derosier, Paul Robilotti, Louis Black, Richard A. Grigg, James C. Harrington, Michael Kentor, The Austin Chronicle. (George, R.) (Filed on 1/16/2007)
January 13, 2007 120 Featured Case NOTICE by United States Of America of Lodging (Tannenbaum, Andrew) (Filed on 1/13/2007)
January 12, 2007 118 Featured Case STIPULATION of Dismissal filed by Charter Communications, LLC. (Caldwell, Adam) (Filed on 1/12/2007)
January 12, 2007 117 Featured Case STIPULATION of Dismissal related to case number 3:06-cv-06224 filed by Bright House Networks, LLC. (Caldwell, Adam) (Filed on 1/12/2007)
January 12, 2007 116 Featured Case STIPULATION of Dismissal filed by Bright House Networks, LLC. (Caldwell, Adam) (Filed on 1/12/2007)
January 11, 2007 119 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 12/21/2006 before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter: Connie Kuhl.. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2007)
January 11, 2007 115 Featured Case NOTICE of Appearance by Sam Jonathan Alton (Alton, Sam) (Filed on 1/11/2007)
January 10, 2007 114 Featured Case CLERK'S NOTICE Advising Counsel of Receipt of the Case Al Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc., et al -v- George W. Bush, et al from the District of Oregon. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2007)
January 9, 2007 113 Featured Case Letter from Jon Eisenberg to Judge Walker re: pending motions and discovery conference. (Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 1/9/2007)
January 5, 2007 112 Featured Case ORDER re 104 filed by All Plaintiffs. Upon the oral stipulation of counsel and agreement of the Court reached during the hearing in this case on 12/21/2006, the Court sets the following schedule, superseding the one contained in its pretrial order, docket #79. Master Complaints to be served and filed by Plaintiffs: 1/16/2007. Opposition to Motion for Stay filed and served: 1/17/2007. Reply to Motion for Stay: 1/30/2007. All parties to Show Cause in writing why the Hepting order should not apply to all cases and claims to which the government asserts the state secrets privilege: 2/1/2007. Hearing on Stay Motion and on the Court's OSC: 2/9/2007 at 2:00 PM. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 1/5/2007. (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2007)
January 5, 2007 111 Featured Case NOTICE by Bright House Networks, LLC of Change of Affiliation of Counsel Relating to Case No. 3:06-CV-06222VRW (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 1/5/2007)
January 5, 2007 110 Featured Case NOTICE by Bright House Networks, LLC of Change of Affiliation of Counsel Relating to Case No. 3:06-CV-06224VRW (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 1/5/2007)
January 5, 2007 109 Featured Case NOTICE by Charter Communications, LLC of Change of Affiliation of Counsel Relating to Case No. 5:06-CV-0085 (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 1/5/2007)
December 22, 2006 107 Featured Case Letter to Chief Judge Vaughn Walker from Shayana Kadidal, Esq. dated 12/21/2006 regarding a case that has not yet arrived in San Francisco - CCR v. Bush (06-383) (SDNY), but that has recently transferred to this Court by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to an order dated 12/15/2006. Lead counsel and co-counsel will be absent until 1/19/2006. Counsel requests that any inquires be directed to William Goodman, Esq. at 212-614-6427 until lead and co-counsel returns. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2006)
December 22, 2006 106 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 56 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Thomas R. Burke for Bright House Networks, LLC. (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2006)
December 22, 2006 105 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 55 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney David K. Herzog terminated. Thomas Burke substituting. (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2006)
December 22, 2006 104 Featured Case Proposed Order Resetting Deadlines by All Plaintiffs. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 12/22/2006)
December 22, 2006 103 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 54 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Richard Radke, Jr terminated. James P. Walsh substituting. (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2006)
December 22, 2006 102 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition re 94 MOTION for Administrative Relief filed byVerizon Maryland, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Boynton, Brian) (Filed on 12/22/2006)
December 22, 2006 101 Featured Case Joinder re 67 MOTION to Stay MDL Proceedings by Verizon Communications Inc, Verizon Global Networks, Inc., Verizon Northwest, Inc., MCI Communications Services, Inc., Verizon Wireless Services, Inc., Verizon Maryland, Inc., Cellco Partnership, MCI, LLC. (Boynton, Brian) (Filed on 12/22/2006)
December 22, 2006 100 Featured Case MOTION for Joinder in United States' Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Disposition of Interlocutory Appeals In Hepting v. AT&T Corp.; Memorandum of Law filed by AT&T Corp.. Motion Hearing set for 2/9/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A and B)(Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 12/22/2006)
December 22, 2006 99 Featured Case RESPONSE in Support re 67 MOTION to Stay MDL Proceedings filed byComcast Telecommunications, Inc.. (Soriano, Christopher) (Filed on 12/22/2006)
December 22, 2006 98 Featured Case RESPONSE in Support re 67 MOTION to Stay MDL Proceedings filed bySprint Nextel Corporation. (Kester, John) (Filed on 12/22/2006)
December 21, 2006 108 Featured Case Minute Entry: Motions Hearing held on 12/21/2006 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker (Date Filed: 12/21/2006). (Court Reporter Connie Kuhl.) (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/21/2006)
December 20, 2006 96 Featured Case Proposed Order in the Hepting action by Keith B. Alexander, George W. Bush, National Security Agency, United States of America, United States Of America. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 12/20/2006)
December 19, 2006 97 Featured Case Transfer Order signed by William Terrell Hodges, Chairman, Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2006)
December 19, 2006 95 Featured Case CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Christopher Bready re 94 MOTION for Administrative Relief (Whitaker, Joshua) (Filed on 12/19/2006)
December 19, 2006 94 Featured Case MOTION for Administrative Relief filed by Christopher Bready. Motion Hearing set for 1/25/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Whitaker, Joshua) (Filed on 12/19/2006)
December 19, 2006 93 Featured Case ORDER by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker granting Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of LEONDRA R. KRUGER. (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2006)
December 19, 2006 92 Featured Case ORDER by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 28 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of BENJAMIN C. MIZER. (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2006)
December 18, 2006 91 Featured Case STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d Plaintiffs' Joint Statement of Recent Decisions in Support of Motions for Remand filed byDennis P. Riordan, Tom Campbell. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2)(Pulgram, Laurence) (Filed on 12/18/2006)
December 18, 2006 90 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER (Relates to C06-6224 Cross v AT&T). Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1), the parties stipulate to dismissal without prejudice as to only defendant TDS Communications Solutions Inc, each party will bear its own attorneys' fees. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 12/18/2006. (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2006)
December 18, 2006 89 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER (Relates to C06-6222 Cross v AT&T). Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) of the FRCP, the parties stipulate to dismissal as to only of defendant TDS Communications Solutions Inc, without prejudice, each party will bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 12/18/2006. (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2006)
December 15, 2006 88 Featured Case STATUS REPORT re Plaintiffs' List of Interim Class Counsel for Each Defendant Category by Tash Hepting. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 12/15/2006)
December 14, 2006 87 Featured Case CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by TDS Communications Solutions, Inc. re 85 Stipulation of Dismissal, 86 Stipulation of Dismissal (Black, E.) (Filed on 12/14/2006)
December 14, 2006 86 Featured Case STIPULATION of Dismissal re 3:06-cv-06224-VRW by TDS Communications Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wadia, Cyrus) (Filed on 12/14/2006)
December 14, 2006 85 Featured Case STIPULATION of Dismissal re 3:06-cv-06222-VRW by TDS Communications Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wadia, Cyrus) (Filed on 12/14/2006)
December 4, 2006 84 Featured Case STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand filed byAT&T Communications of California, AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2)(Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 12/4/2006)
December 1, 2006 83 Featured Case CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Telephone and Telegraph Company, AT&T Teleholdings, Inc., Cingular Wireless, LLC, AT&T Communications, AT&T Teleholdings, Cingular Wireless Corporation, New Cingular Wireless Services, Inc., Pac Bell Telephone Co., SBC Communications, American Telephone & Telegraph Co., AT&T Communications, Inc., AT&T Operations, Inc., New Cingular Wireless Services, Inc., SBC Long Distance, LLC, AT&T Communications of California, AT&T Corp., AT&T, Inc., AT&T Inc., New Cingular Wireless Services, Inc., SBC Long Distance, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company doing business as AT&T Long Distance), Pacific Bell Telephone Company(a California corporation doing business as AT&T California), AT&T Communications of California, Inc.(a California corporation) re 82 Stipulation,,, Re: Briefing Schedule for Motion to Stay [Dkt. 67-69]; and [Proposed] Order (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 12/1/2006)
December 1, 2006 82 Featured Case STIPULATION Re: Briefing Schedule for Motion to Stay [Dkt. 67-69]; and [Proposed] Order by American Telephone and Telegraph Company, AT&T Teleholdings, Inc., Cingular Wireless, LLC, AT&T Communications, AT&T Teleholdings, Cingular Wireless Corporation, Cingular Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services, Inc., Pac Bell Telephone Co., SBC Communications, American Telephone & Telegraph Co., AT&T Communications, Inc., New Cingular Wireless Services, Inc., Pacific Bell Telephone Company, SBC Long Distance, LLC, AT&T Communications of California, AT&T Corp., AT&T, Inc., AT&T Inc., AT&T Operations Inc., New Cingular Wireless Services, Inc., SBC Long Distance, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company doing business as AT&T Long Distance), Pacific Bell Telephone Company(a California corporation doing business as AT&T California), AT&T Communications of California, Inc.(a California corporation). (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 12/1/2006)
November 29, 2006 80 Featured Case NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Sprint Nextel Corporation from Electron Tubes v. Verizon by Anthony Bartelemy (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 11/29/2006)
November 27, 2006 81 Featured Case Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-5). Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2006)
November 22, 2006 79 Featured Case ORDER on case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Walker on 11/22/06. (vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2006)
November 21, 2006 77 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/17/2006 before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter: Connie Kuhl.. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2006)
November 20, 2006 75 Featured Case Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Daniel J. Becka. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2006)
November 17, 2006 78 Featured Case AMENDED Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 11/17/2006 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker. (Court Reporter Connie Kuhl.) (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/17/2006)
November 17, 2006 Featured Case Set/Reset Hearings: Motions Hearing set for 12/21/2006 02:00 PM. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 2/1/2007 02:00 PM. in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2006)
November 17, 2006 76 Featured Case Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 11/17/2006 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker and set the following schedule: All parties to show cause in writing why the Hepting order should not apply to all cases and claims to which the government asserts the state secrets privilege: 12/14/2006. Hearing on motions to remand brought by plaintiffs in Riordan (06-3574), Campbell (06-3596), Chulsky (06-2530) and Bready (06-6313): 12/21/2006 at 2:00 PM. Hearing on media intervenors' motions to unseal documents in Hepting (06-0672): 12/21/2006 at 2:00 PM. Master Complaints to be served and filed by Plaintiffs: 1/8/2007. Hearing on the government's motion for a stay pending disposition of interlocutory appeal in Hepting: 2/1/2007 at 2:00 PM. Hearing on the court's Order to Show Cause: 2/1/2007 at 2:00 PM. (Court Reporter Connie Kuhl.) (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/17/2006)
November 16, 2006 74 Featured Case ORDER granting application of John D. Seiver to appear and participate as counsel pro hac vice representing Charter Communications Inc. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 11/15/2006. (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2006)
November 16, 2006 73 Featured Case ORDER granting application of Elizabeth A. Drogula to appear and participate as counsel pro hac vice representing Charter Communications Inc. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 11/15/2006. (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2006)
November 16, 2006 72 Featured Case ORDER granting application of Adam S. Caldwell to appear and participate as counsel pro hac vice representing Charter Communications Inc. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 11/15/2006. (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2006)
November 10, 2006 71 Featured Case CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P., Sprint Nextel Corporation re 70 Notice of Appearance (Kester, John) (Filed on 11/10/2006)
November 10, 2006 70 Featured Case NOTICE of Appearance by John G. Kester (Kester, John) (Filed on 11/10/2006)
November 9, 2006 69 Featured Case CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Keith B. Alexander, George W. Bush, National Security Agency, United States Of America re 67 MOTION to Stay MDL Proceedings (Tannenbaum, Andrew) (Filed on 11/9/2006)
November 9, 2006 68 Featured Case ERRATA re 67 MOTION to Stay MDL Proceedings by Keith B. Alexander, George W. Bush, National Security Agency, United States Of America. (Tannenbaum, Andrew) (Filed on 11/9/2006)
November 8, 2006 67 Featured Case MOTION to Stay MDL Proceedings filed by Keith B. Alexander, George W. Bush, National Security Agency, United States Of America. Motion Hearing set for 1/11/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Order granting interlocutory appeal in Hepting v. AT&T (Nov. 7, 2006)))(Tannenbaum, Andrew) (Filed on 11/8/2006)
November 8, 2006 66 Featured Case CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by TDS Communications Solutions, Inc. re 65 Proposed Order, 59 MOTION to Substitute Attorney (Black, E.) (Filed on 11/8/2006)
November 8, 2006 65 Featured Case Proposed Order re 59 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by TDS Communications Solutions, Inc.. (Black, E.) (Filed on 11/8/2006)
November 8, 2006 64 Featured Case CLERK'S NOTICE Advising Counsel of Receipt of the Case D. Clive Hardy -v- AT&T Corp. from the Eastern District of Louisiana. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2006)
November 8, 2006 63 Featured Case CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AT&T Corp., AT&T Teleholdings, Cingular Wireless Corporation, Cingular Wireless LLC, Illinois Bell, Indiana Bell, Pac Bell Telephone Co., SBC Communications, AT&T Communications, Inc., AT&T Inc., AT&T Operations, Inc., New Cingular Wireless Services, Inc., AT&T Communications of California, SBC Long Distance, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company doing business as AT&T Long Distance) re 61 Case Management Statement (Joint), Case Management Statement (Joint), Case Management Statement (Joint) (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 11/8/2006)
November 8, 2006 62 Featured Case *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 63 . *** CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AT&T Communications, AT&T Teleholdings, Cingular Wireless Corporation, Cingular Wireless LLC, Illinois Bell, Indiana Bell, Pac Bell Telephone Co., SBC Communications, New Cingular Wireless Services, Inc., AT&T Communications of California, AT&T Corp., AT&T Operations Inc., AT&T Inc.(a Delaware corporation), SBC Long Distance, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company doing business as AT&T Long Distance) re 61 Case Management Statement (Joint), Case Management Statement (Joint), Case Management Statement (Joint) (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 11/8/2006) Modified on 11/9/2006 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
November 7, 2006 61 Featured Case JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by AT&T Communications, AT&T Teleholdings, Cingular Wireless Corporation, Cingular Wireless LLC, Illinois Bell, Indiana Bell, New Cingular Wireless Services, Inc., Pac Bell Telephone Co., SBC Communications, AT&T Inc., AT&T Communications of California, AT&T Corp., AT&T Operations Inc., SBC Long Distance, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company doing business as AT&T Long Distance). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Axelbaum, Marc) (Filed on 11/7/2006)
November 7, 2006 60 Featured Case CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by TDS Communications Solutions, Inc. re 59 MOTION to Substitute Attorney (Wadia, Cyrus) (Filed on 11/7/2006)
November 7, 2006 59 Featured Case MOTION to Substitute Attorney filed by TDS Communications Solutions, Inc.. (Wadia, Cyrus) (Filed on 11/7/2006)
November 7, 2006 58 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT PLAINTIFFS' JOINT AND AGREED ORGANIZATION PLAN filed by Tash Hepting. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A# 2 Attachment B# 3 Attachment B, Ex. A# 4 Attachment B, Ex. B# 5 Attachment B, Ex. C# 6 Attachment B, Ex. D# 7 Attachment B, Ex. E# 8 Attachment B, Ex. F# 9 Attachment B, Ex. G Part 1# 10 Attachment B, Ex. G Part 2# 11 Attachment B, Ex. H# 12 Attachment B, Ex. I# 13 Attachment B, Ex. J# 14 Attachment B, Ex. K# 15 Attachment B, Ex. L# 16 Attachment B, Ex. M)(Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 11/7/2006)
November 7, 2006 57 Featured Case Letter from Jon B. Eisenberg Re: Potential Tag-Along Action Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc. v. Bush, No. CV-06-274-KI (District of Oregon). (Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 11/7/2006)
November 3, 2006 56 Featured Case Second MOTION to Substitute Attorney filed by Bright House Networks, LLC. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 11/3/2006)
November 3, 2006 55 Featured Case First MOTION to Substitute Attorney filed by Bright House Networks, LLC. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 11/3/2006)
November 3, 2006 54 Featured Case MOTION to Substitute Attorney filed by Charter Communications, LLC. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 11/3/2006)
October 31, 2006 53 Featured Case Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Donald A. Statland (order filed 10/16/06). (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2006)
October 31, 2006 52 Featured Case CLERK'S NOTICE : YOU ARE NOTIFIED THAT the Initial Case Management Conference currently scheduled for November 14, 2006 has been continued to Friday, November 17, 2006 at 10:30 a.m. and shall follow the conditions set forth in the court's October 16, 2006 order (Doc #49). Please report to Courtroom #6, on the 17th floor at 450 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco, California. Case Management Conference set for 11/17/2006 10:30 AM. (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2006)
October 25, 2006 51 Featured Case Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to John Beisner. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2006)
October 20, 2006 50 Featured Case NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of McLeod USA Telecommunications Seervices, Inc. by Travis Cross (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Notice of Dismissal of McLeod USA Telecommunications Services, Inc.)(Sipes, W.) (Filed on 10/20/2006)
October 16, 2006 Featured Case Set Deadlines/Hearings: Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/14/2006 02:30 PM. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2006)
October 16, 2006 Featured Case Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 11/7/2006. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/14/2006 02:30 PM. Location: Courtroom no. 6, 17th floor, 450 Golden Gate Ave., San Francisco, California. (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2006)
October 16, 2006 49 Featured Case ORDER by Chief Judge Walker setting initial case management conference for November 14, 2006, at 2:30pm (vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2006).
October 13, 2006 48 Featured Case CLERK'S NOTICE Advising Counsel of Receipt of Cases from the Southern District of Florida, Western District of Michigan, and the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. (Attachments: #(1) Fortnash -v- AT&T Corp.; #(2) Dubois, et al -v- AT&T Corp., et al; #(3) Solomon -v- Verizon Communications, Inc.) (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2006)
October 10, 2006 47 Featured Case CLERK'S NOTICE Advising Counsel of Receipt of the Action Bready, et al -v- Verizon Maryland, Inc. from the District of Maryland. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2006)
October 10, 2006 46 Featured Case CLERK'S NOTICE Advising Counsel of Receipt of Cases from the Northern District of Illinois and Western District of Kentucky. (Attachments: #(1) Waxman -v- AT&T Corp.; #(2) Suchanek -v- Sprint Nextel Corp.) (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2006)
October 6, 2006 45 Featured Case CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AT&T Corp., AT&T, Inc., AT&T Corp., AT&T, Inc., AT&T Corp., AT&T Corp., AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc., AT&T Corp., AT&T, Inc., AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc., AT&T, Inc., AT&T Corp., AT&T Corp.(a New York corporation), AT&T Inc.(a Delaware corporation) re 44 Memorandum in Opposition, AT&T's Response to Hepting Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion for Scheduling Order (Dkt. 39) (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 10/6/2006)
October 6, 2006 44 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition re 39 MOTION Scheduling Order AT&Ts Response to Hepting Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion for Scheduling Order (Dkt. 39) filed byAT&T Corp., AT&T, Inc., AT&T Corp., AT&T, Inc., AT&T Corp., AT&T Corp., AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc., AT&T Corp., AT&T, Inc., AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc., AT&T, Inc., AT&T Corp., AT&T Corp.(a New York corporation), AT&T Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, B, C)(Sorensen, Jacob) (Filed on 10/6/2006)
October 6, 2006 43 Featured Case *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 44 . *** REPLY to Response to Motion AT&T's Response to Hepting Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion for Scheduling Order (Dkt. 39) filed byAT&T Corp., AT&T, Inc., AT&T Corp., AT&T, Inc., AT&T Corp., AT&T Corp., AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc., AT&T Corp., AT&T, Inc., AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc., AT&T, Inc., AT&T Corp., AT&T Corp.(a New York corporation), AT&T Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, B and C)(Sorensen, Jacob) (Filed on 10/6/2006) Modified on 10/10/2006 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
October 6, 2006 42 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition 67 Response of the United States to Hepting Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion for Scheduling Order filed byUnited States, Keith B. Alexander, George W. Bush, National Security Agency, United States of America, United States Of America. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 10/6/2006) Modified on 2/12/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
October 5, 2006 40 Featured Case CLERK'S NOTICE Advising Counsel of Receipt of Cases from the Western District of Washington and the District of Hawaii. (Attachments: #(1) Derosier -v- Cingular Wireless, et al; #(2) Crockett, et al -v- Verizon Wireless, et al) (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2006)
October 4, 2006 41 Featured Case Conditional Transfer ORDER signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2006)
October 3, 2006 39 Featured Case MOTION Scheduling Order filed by Tash Hepting. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit AT&T's Answer)(Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 10/3/2006)
October 3, 2006 38 Featured Case CLERK'S NOTICE Advising Counsel of Receipt of Cases from the Southern District of Indiana and the Northern District of Georgia. (Attachments: #(1) Cross, et al -v- AT&T Communications, Inc., etal; #(2) Cross, et al -v- AT&T Communications, Inc., etal; #(3) Guzzi -v- Bush, et al; #(4) Pretrial Order No. 1) (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2006)
September 25, 2006 37 Featured Case Conditional Transfer Order signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2006)
September 15, 2006 36 Featured Case STATUS REPORT Pursuant to August 14, 2006 Order by Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel, Gregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 9/15/2006)
September 15, 2006 35 Featured Case RESPONSE to Status Report of United States in Response to August 14, 2006 Order in Hepting action (06-cv-676) by George W. Bush, National Security Agency, United States Of America. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 9/15/2006)
September 15, 2006 34 Featured Case RESPONSE to AT&T's Response to August 14, 2006 Order in Hepting, Et al., v. AT&T Corp., et al. (Dkt. No. 366) by AT&T Corp., AT&T, Inc., AT&T Communications, Inc., AT&T Corp., AT&T, Inc., AT&T Corp., American Telephone and Telegraph Company, Bellsouth Communication Systems, LLC, BellSouth Telecommunications, Inc., AT&T Corp., Illinois Bell Telephone Co., BellSouth Communications Systems, LLC, BellSouth Corp., BellSouth Telecomminications, Inc., American Telephone & Telegraph Co., AT&T Communications, Inc., AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc., AT&T Communications of California, Inc., AT&T Operations, Inc., Illinois Bell Telephone Company, New Cingular Wireless Services, Inc., Pacific Bell Telephone Company, SBC Long Distance, LLC, AT&T Corp., AT&T Communications of California, AT&T Corp., AT&T, Inc., AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc., AT&T, Inc., AT&T Corp., AT&T Operations Inc., New Cingular Wireless Services, Inc., AT&T Corp.(a New York corporation), AT&T Inc.(a Delaware corporation), SBC Long Distance, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company doing business as AT&T Long Distance), Pacific Bell Telephone Company(a California corporation doing business as AT&T California), AT&T Communications of California, Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Axelbaum, Marc) (Filed on 9/15/2006)
September 14, 2006 33 Featured Case ORDER by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 18 Motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Leondra R. Kruger representing Verizon Communications et al. (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2006)
September 13, 2006 32 Featured Case CLERK'S NOTICE Advising Counsel of Receipt of the Case Greg Conner, et al -v- AT&T Corp., etal from the Eastern District of California. (Attachments: # 1 Prcatice and Procedure Order) (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2006)
September 13, 2006 31 Featured Case CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Associated Press, Bloomberg News, Los Angeles Times, San Francisco Chronicle, San Jose Mercury News, USA Today re 30 Notice of Appearance BY MAIL (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 9/13/2006)
September 13, 2006 30 Featured Case NOTICE of Appearance by Karl Olson (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 9/13/2006)
September 8, 2006 Featured Case Receipt for Application for Pro Hac Vice [#24] fee #3389813 from Benjamin C. Mizer in the amount of $210.00 (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2006)
September 8, 2006 29 Featured Case NOTICE of Appearance by Marc H. Axelbaum Notice of Appearance on Behalf of the AT&T Defendants (Axelbaum, Marc) (Filed on 9/8/2006)
September 7, 2006 28 Featured Case MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Benjamin C. Mizer filed by Verizon Global Networks, Inc., Verizon Northwest, Inc., Verizon Wireless LLC, Cellco Partnership, Verizon Communications, Inc.(a corporation), Verizon Communications, Inc., MCI, LLC, Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations))(Rogers, Elizabeth) (Filed on 9/7/2006)
September 7, 2006 27 Featured Case CLERK'S NOTICE Advising Counsel of Receipt of the Action Steven Schwarz, et al -v- AT&T Corp., et al from the Northern District of Illinois. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2006)
September 6, 2006 26 Featured Case CLERK'S NOTICE Advising Counsel of Receipt of the Action James C. Harrington, et al -v- AT&T Inc. from the Western District of Texas. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2006)
September 6, 2006 25 Featured Case NOTICE of Appearance by Eric A. Isaacson (Isaacson, Eric) (Filed on 9/6/2006)
September 5, 2006 Featured Case MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Leondra R. Kruger; Proposed Order filed by Verizon Global Networks, Inc., Verizon Northwest, Inc., Verizon Wireless LLC, Cellco Partnership, Verizon Communications, Inc.(a corporation), Verizon Communications, Inc., MCI, LLC. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2006)
September 5, 2006 24 Featured Case NOTICE of Appearance by Jeff D Friedman (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 9/5/2006)
September 5, 2006 23 Featured Case NOTICE of Appearance by Candace J. Morey Mitchell Zimmerman, Jennifer L. Kelley and Saina Shamilov (Morey, Candace) (Filed on 9/5/2006)
September 5, 2006 22 Featured Case NOTICE of Appearance by Maria V. Morris (Morris, Maria) (Filed on 9/5/2006)
September 5, 2006 21 Featured Case NOTICE of Appearance by Shana Eve Scarlett (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 9/5/2006)
September 5, 2006 20 Featured Case NOTICE of Appearance by Reed R. Kathrein (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 9/5/2006)
September 1, 2006 19 Featured Case ORDER vacating pending filing deadlines by Chief Judge Walker granting 5 Motion to Vacate. (vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2006)
September 1, 2006 18 Featured Case MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Leondra R. Kruger filed by Verizon Global Networks, Inc., Verizon Northwest, Inc., Verizon Wireless LLC, Cellco Partnership, MCI, LLC, Verizon Communications, Inc.(a corporation), Verizon Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations))(Rogers, Elizabeth) (Filed on 9/1/2006)
September 1, 2006 17 Featured Case NOTICE of Appearance by Samir Chandra Jain (Jain, Samir) (Filed on 9/1/2006)
August 31, 2006 16 Featured Case CLERK'S NOTICE Advising Counsel of Receipt of Cases from the Northern District of Illinois, District of Oregon, and Eastern District of Louisiana. (Attachments: #(1) Terkel, et al -v- AT&T Inc.; #(2) Hines, et al -v- Verizon Northwest, Inc., etal; #(3) Herron, et al -v- Verizon Global networks, Inc., et al) (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2006)
August 31, 2006 15 Featured Case Practice and Procedure Order. Signed by Chief Judge Walker on 8/31/06. (vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2006)
August 30, 2006 14 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition re 5 MOTION to Vacate Administrative Motion of AT&T and Verizon Defendants to Vacate Pending Filing Deadlines in Cases Transferred by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed byElaine Spielfogel-Landis. (Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 8/30/2006)
August 30, 2006 13 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition to Administrative Motion of AT&T and Verizon Defendants to Vacate Pending Filing Deadlines filed byTash Hepting, Gregory Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 8/30/2006)
August 30, 2006 12 Featured Case CLERK'S NOTICE Advising Counsel of Receipt of Cases from the District of Montana and the Southern District of Texas. (Attachments: #(1) Fuller -v- Verizon Communications Inc., et al; #(2) Trevino, et al -v- AT&T Corp., et al; #(3) Doberg -v- AT&T Corp.) (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2006)
August 28, 2006 10 Featured Case CLERK'S NOTICE Advising Counsel of Receipt of cases from the Eastern District of New York; District of Rhode Island; and the Southern District of California. (Attachments: # 1 Marck, et al -v- Verizon communications, Inc., et al; #(2) Mahoney -v- Verizon Communications; #(3) Mahoney -v- AT&T Communications; # 4 Bissit, et al -v- Verizon Communications, inc., et al; # 5 Souder -v- AT&T corp., et al) (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2006)
August 25, 2006 9 Featured Case CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Verizon Global Networks, Inc., Verizon Northwest, Inc., Verizon Wireless LLC, American Telephone & Telegraph Co., AT&T Communications, Inc., AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc., AT&T Communications of California, Inc., AT&T Operations, Inc., Cellco Partnership, Illinois Bell Telephone Company, MCI, LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services, Inc., Pacific Bell Telephone Company, SBC Long Distance, LLC, Verizon Communications, Inc. re 5 MOTION to Vacate Administrative Motion of AT&T and Verizon Defendants to Vacate Pending Filing Deadlines in Cases Transferred by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (Axelbaum, Marc) (Filed on 8/25/2006)
August 25, 2006 8 Featured Case Proposed Order re 5 MOTION to Vacate Administrative Motion of AT&T and Verizon Defendants to Vacate Pending Filing Deadlines in Cases Transferred by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by Verizon Global Networks, Inc., Verizon Northwest, Inc., Verizon Wireless LLC, American Telephone & Telegraph Co., AT&T Communications, Inc., AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc., AT&T Communications of California, Inc., AT&T Operations, Inc., Cellco Partnership, Illinois Bell Telephone Company, MCI, LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services, Inc., Pacific Bell Telephone Company, SBC Long Distance, LLC, Verizon Communications, Inc.. (Axelbaum, Marc) (Filed on 8/25/2006)
August 25, 2006 7 Featured Case Declaration of Brian M. Boynton in Support of 5 MOTION to Vacate Administrative Motion of AT&T and Verizon Defendants to Vacate Pending Filing Deadlines in Cases Transferred by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed byVerizon Global Networks, Inc., Verizon Northwest, Inc., Verizon Wireless LLC, American Telephone & Telegraph Co., AT&T Communications, Inc., AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc., AT&T Communications of California, Inc., AT&T Operations, Inc., Cellco Partnership, Illinois Bell Telephone Company, MCI, LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services, Inc., Pacific Bell Telephone Company, SBC Long Distance, LLC, Verizon Communications, Inc.. (Related document(s) 5 ) (Axelbaum, Marc) (Filed on 8/25/2006)
August 25, 2006 6 Featured Case Declaration of Marc H. Axelbaum in Support of 5 MOTION to Vacate Administrative Motion of AT&T and Verizon Defendants to Vacate Pending Filing Deadlines in Cases Transferred by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed byVerizon Global Networks, Inc., Verizon Northwest, Inc., Verizon Wireless LLC, American Telephone & Telegraph Co., AT&T Communications, Inc., AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc., AT&T Communications of California, Inc., AT&T Operations, Inc., Cellco Partnership, Illinois Bell Telephone Company, MCI, LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services, Inc., Pacific Bell Telephone Company, SBC Long Distance, LLC, Verizon Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 5 ) (Axelbaum, Marc) (Filed on 8/25/2006)
August 25, 2006 5 Featured Case MOTION to Vacate Administrative Motion of AT&T and Verizon Defendants to Vacate Pending Filing Deadlines in Cases Transferred by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by AT&T Communications of California, Inc., AT&T Operations, Inc., Cellco Partnership, Illinois Bell Telephone Company, MCI, LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services, Inc., Pacific Bell Telephone Company, SBC Long Distance, LLC, Verizon Global Networks, Inc., Verizon Northwest, Inc., Verizon Wireless LLC, American Telephone & Telegraph Co., AT&T Communications, Inc., AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc.. (Axelbaum, Marc) (Filed on 8/25/2006)
August 24, 2006 11 Featured Case ORDER Vacating Transfer Order signed by Wm. Terrell Hodges, Chairman, Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2006)
August 22, 2006 4 Featured Case NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Kenneth Haas for the United States of America (Haas, Alexander) (Filed on 8/22/2006)
August 22, 2006 3 Featured Case NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew H Tannenbaum on behalf of the United States of America (Tannenbaum, Andrew) (Filed on 8/22/2006)
August 22, 2006 2 Featured Case NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Joseph Coppolino , United States Department of Justice, on behalf of Federal Defendants (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 8/22/2006)
August 14, 2006 Featured Case CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2006)
August 14, 2006 1 Featured Case TRANSFER ORDER from Judicial Panel on Multi District Litigation, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, that the action is transferred to the Northern District of California creating MDL No. 06-1791. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/5/2006 (gsa, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re National Security Agency Telecommunications Records Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lycos, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy L. Alger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wired News
Represented By: Timothy L. Alger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Dolberg
Represented By: Timothy M. Bechtold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Klein
Represented By: James J. Brosnahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tash Hepting
Represented By: Richard Roy Wiebe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Hicks
Represented By: Richard Roy Wiebe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Jewel
Represented By: Richard Roy Wiebe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erik Knutzen
Represented By: Richard Roy Wiebe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Anderson
Represented By: Vincent Ian Parrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Baker
Represented By: Carl J. Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Barrett
Represented By: Vincent Ian Parrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Bartelemy
Represented By: Carl J. Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Betz
Represented By: Carl J. Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fran Blamer
Represented By: Carl J. Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trudy Bond
Represented By: Vincent Ian Parrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen Brink
Represented By: Carl J. Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane Brink
Represented By: Carl J. Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Brooks
Represented By: Vincent Ian Parrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Bruney
Represented By: Carl J. Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Catizone
Represented By: Vincent Ian Parrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Christianson
Represented By: Carl J. Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Clark
Represented By: Carl J. Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kingsley Clark
Represented By: Carl J. Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas M. Cleaver
Represented By: Carl J. Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerard P. Clerkin
Represented By: Carl J. Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter B. Collins
Represented By: Carl J. Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kris Costa
Represented By: Carl J. Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Costa
Represented By: Carl J. Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]