Ministry of Defense v. Cubic Defense Sys, et al

Plaintiff: The Ministry of Defense and Support for the Armed Forces of the Islamic Republic of Iran
Defendant: Cubic Defense Systems, Inc.
Claimant: Jenny Rubin, Daniel Miller, Abraham Mendelson, Stuart E Hersh, Noam Rozenman, Deborah Rubin, Renay Frym, Elena Rozenman, Tzvi Rozenman, France Mokhateb Rafii and Deborah D. Peterson
Case Number: 3:1998cv01165
Filed: June 25, 1998
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Rudi M. Brewster
Referring Judge: Louisa S Porter
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 3, 2013 287 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Petitioner's Motions for Prejudgment Interest and Attorney's Fees Re: Docs 242 and 244 . The Court Grants MOD's Motion for Prejudgment Interest in the amount of $316,007.02. Postjudgment interest at a rate of 4.9 66% accrues on the $316,007.02 award from 8/10/1999 to the date of payment at a daily rate of $42.99. The Court Grants MOD's Motion for Attorney's Fees in the amount of $131,083.50. Cubis shall deposit the funds with Clerk of the Court in same account. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 1/3/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
June 12, 2012 235 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) Granting Cubic's Motion To Deposit Funds With Court And (2) Denying Iran's Ex Parte Application For An Extension Of Time (Re Docs. 203 , 227 ): The Court acknowledges receipt of $8,803,744.55, paid to the Clerk of the Court , from Cubic on 4/18/2012. By this deposit, Cubic satisfied the Judgment entered on 8/10/1999 as to sums due for the principal, arbitration costs, pre-award interest, and post-judgment interest (Doc. 51 ); however, this declaration is without prejud ice to the potential future award of pre-judgment interest (including any claim for interest on interest) and/or attorney's fees, which will be resolved by separate motion. The Court discharges and exonerates Cubic's supersedeas bond. (Doc. 53 ). Cubic shall bear all obligations to report to Office of Foreign Assets Control (or any other federal agency) under its license. Cubic may contact the Financial Department of the Clerk's Office to obtain information about the status of th e funds. The Clerk is directed to provide information about the status of the deposited funds when Cubic requests information to comply with its reporting obligation to OFAC. The Court denies Iran's ex parte application for an extension of time to oppose the Lien Claimants' motion. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 6/12/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.)(mdc)(jrd)
April 17, 2012 208 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) Granting Joint Motion To Determine Amount Of Principal And Certain Interest; (2) Granting Ex Parte Application To Deposit Funds With Clerk Of Court; (3) Setting Briefing Schedule On Remaining Motions; And (4) Serving Copy Of This Order On Parties In Related Matter: The Court grants the joint motion to determine the amount of principal and certain undisputed items of interest. (Doc. 202 ) The Court grants Cubic's ex parte application to deposit funds with clerk of court. (Doc. [2 04]) Cubic may deposit the sum of due on the date of deposit as set forth in the joint motion along with the additional accrued interest to the actual date of deposit. The Clerk of the Court shall accept the funds and, as soon as practical, deposit t hem into a passbook savings account until further Order of the Court. The Court will hear oral argument on the remaining issues in Cubic's motion to deposit judgment into Court on 5/21/2012 at 10:30 AM in a courtroom to be determined. Any party who wishes to oppose the motion shall do so in accordance with the schedule set forth in Local Civil Rule 7.1. The Court will hear Iran's motion for attorney's fees and pre-judgment interest on 6/12/2012 at 09:30 AM, in a courtroom to be de termined, with briefs due as set forth in this Order. The Court will hear Lien Claimants' motions regarding their claims on 6/12/2012 at 9:30 AM, in a courtroom to be determined, with briefs due as set forth in this Order. In all other respects, the Court's stay on the execution of judgment remains in effect. The Clerk of the Court shall serve a courtesy copy of this Order on the parties in Heiser v. Iran. Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 4/17/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service; ECF registration requirement notice also mailed to Attorney Steve S Gohari; NEF cc and printed copies: Attorneys Brooke Killian, Kurt Ramlo, Randall B Hamud, attorneys on case 08mc491.) (mdc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ministry of Defense v. Cubic Defense Sys, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Ministry of Defense and Support for the Armed Forces of the Islamic Republic of Iran
Represented By: Mina Almassi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cubic Defense Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Charles A Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jenny Rubin
Represented By: James E. McElroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Daniel Miller
Represented By: James E. McElroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Abraham Mendelson
Represented By: James E. McElroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Stuart E Hersh
Represented By: James E. McElroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Noam Rozenman
Represented By: James E. McElroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Deborah Rubin
Represented By: James E. McElroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Renay Frym
Represented By: James E. McElroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Elena Rozenman
Represented By: James E. McElroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Tzvi Rozenman
Represented By: James E. McElroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: France Mokhateb Rafii
Represented By: Steve S Gohari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Deborah D. Peterson
Represented By: David Julian Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?