Roybal v. Woodford, et al

Petitioner: Rudolph Jose Roybal
Respondent: Steven Ornoski
Case Number: 3:1999cv02152
Filed: October 5, 1999
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T Miller
Referring Judge: case Unassigned
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 28, 2016 297 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Respondent's 290 Motion to Stay Court's Order Granting Writ of Habeas Corpus Pending Appeal. Respondent's motion for a stay of the Courts 12/2/2015 Order to retry or re-sentence Petitioner is Granted. Pursuant to Local Rule HC.3(g)(6), the Court's order of a stay of execution remains in effect pending appellate court action on that stay or on the appeal. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 1/28/2016. (rlu)
December 2, 2015 285 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL ORDER: (1) Granting Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; (2) Issuing Certificate of Appealability; and (3) Ordering Stay of Execution Pending Appeal. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 12/2/2015.(rlu)
August 5, 2014 261 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 246 APPLICATIONFOR A STAY IN THE FEDERALHABEAS PROCEEDING. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 8/5/14. (av1)
December 16, 2013 240 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Petitioner's 220 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 12/16/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah)
March 30, 2009 166 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 165 the parties' joint Motion to reschedule status conference to 5/21/2009 03:30 PM in Courtroom 16 before Judge Jeffrey T. Miller. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 3/30/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roybal v. Woodford, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rudolph Jose Roybal
Represented By: John Owen Lanahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Steven Ornoski
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?