-AJB Ayala v. Wong, et al

Petitioner: Reynaldo Medrano Ayala
Respondent: Bill Lockyer, Robert Wong and Robert J Ayers, JR
Case Number: 3:2001cv00741
Filed: November 9, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
Referring Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Presiding Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 7, 2013 477 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Ayala's 476 Notice Re: Removal of Claim 29. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 11/7/2013.(rlu)
March 28, 2013 464 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Habeas Relief on Claims 2, 4, 5, 8, 12, 18-20, 24, 35 and 75 on the merits. Claim 75 is Denied as premature. The Court will, in the final judgment, Grant a Certificate of Appealability ("COA") on Claims 2, 4, 5, 8, 12, 18, 19, 20, and 67, and Deny a Certificate of Appealability on Claims 24, 35 and 75. It is so Ordered. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 3/27/2013. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 3/27/2013.(rlu) Modified signature date, modified claim numbers, and modified to include original order on 3/28/2013 (rlu). (Main Document 464 replaced on 3/28/2013) (rlu).
March 12, 2012 462 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting respondent's 443 Motion for Summary Judgment as to Claim 76 and Denying petitioner's 451 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court will, in the final judgment, Deny a Certificate of Appealability on Claim 76. The Court Denies Respondents 458 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 3/12/12. (ecs)
June 2, 2010 387 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER RE: Selected Documents from San Diego County District Attorney File A88447. The Court's copy of the documents shall be retained by the Court under seal so as to protect the privacy interest and safety of third persons. (Documents numbered P0763 through P0780). Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 6/2/10.(vet) Modified on 6/3/2010 - Edited text (vet).
November 9, 2009 312 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part 305 Motion to Compel With Subpoena Duces Tecum. Within 30 days of the filing of this Order, Eric Hart shall produce to Respondent's counsel a copy of the portions of the manuscript identified above. Respondent shall pay the copying costs. (Copy of order to Eric D. Hart). Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 11/9/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(vet) (jrl).
June 9, 2009 287 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Group Five Claims; Granting In Part and Denying In Part Respondent's Motion for Summary Judgment; Denying Petitioner's Motion for Summary Judgment; and Granting In Part and Denying In Part Petitioner's Motion for an Evidentiary Hearing. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 6/9/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(vet) (jrl).
February 1, 2008 236 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 183 Motion for Summary Judgment on Group Three Claims; Denying 188 Motion for Summary Judgment; Granting in part and Denying in part 188 Motion for an Evidentiary Hearing. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 2/1/2008. (mjj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: -AJB Ayala v. Wong, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Reynaldo Medrano Ayala
Represented By: Michael R Belter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bill Lockyer
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert Wong
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert J Ayers, JR
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?