Quillar v. People of the State, et al

Petitioner: Lee V Quillar
Respondent: The State of California
Case Number: 3:2001cv00968
Filed: May 30, 2001
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Solano
Referring Judge: Roger T. MJ Benitez
Presiding Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 3, 2012 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 91 Motion For Relief From Judgment. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 1/3/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ecs)(jrd)
December 30, 2010 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re Certificate of Appealability. Petitioner has made no showing that reasonable jurists would find that the Court's decision to deny his Rule 60(b)(6) motion is debatable or wrong. Accordingly, a certificate of appealability is DENIED. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 12/30/2010. (Order electronically transmitted to the US Court of Appeals. All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (akr)
December 7, 2010 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 83 Motion for Relief from Final Judgment. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 12/6/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quillar v. People of the State, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lee V Quillar
Represented By: Steven A Feldman(Designation CJA Appointment)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: The State of California
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?