Ayala v. Ornoski, et al

Petitioner: Hector Juan Ayala
Respondent: Steven Ornoski
Case Number: 3:2001cv01322
Filed: July 20, 2001
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Irma E. Gonzalez
Referring Judge: Peter C. Lewis
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 13, 2009 262 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 261 Petitioner's Application for a Certificate of Appealability and Issuing a Limited COA. Petitioner's Application raises several issues on which reasonable jurists could disagree, or that deser ve encouragement to proceed further. For the foregoing reasons, the Court GRANTS Petitioner's Application for a COA on Claims 1, 2, 4, 5, and 26 and DENIES Petitioner's Application for a COA on Claims 22, 24, and 27. The Court ISSUES a COA limited to Claims 1, 2, 4, 5, and 26. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 5/13/2009. (cc: US Court of Appeals). (akr)
February 17, 2009 258 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that judgment is entered in favor of Respondent against Petitioner. Court denies Petitioner's Motion for Summary Adjudication on Claim 26. Respondent's Motion for Summary Adjudiction on Claim 26 is granted. Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Claim 26 pursuant to Teague v. Lane is granted. Third Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is denied as to all claims. Case is closed. (jah)
February 13, 2009 256 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Petitioner's 252 Motion for Stay and Abeyance. Court finds Petitioner has failed to meet burden of demonstrating that a stay is warranted under Rhines. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 2/13/2009. (jah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ayala v. Ornoski, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Hector Juan Ayala
Represented By: Anthony J Dain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Steven Ornoski
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?