Williams v. Costco Wholesale, et al

Case Number: 3:2002cv02003
Filed: October 9, 2002
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
Referring Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Presiding Judge: Napoleon A. Jones
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Labor/Mgmnt. Relations
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 7, 2010 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 72 Motion for Attorney Fees and Class Representative Service Payment; granting 73 Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement. Court grants certification of the applicable class, grants final approval of the settlement, gr ants the request for attorney's fees and costs and awards class counsel attorneys' fees in the amount of $110,000.00 and grants the request for a service fee and awards Plaintiff Williams a class representative enhancement award in the amount of $5,000. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 7/7/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jah)
March 4, 2010 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's 66 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement and Order Directing Notice of Class Members. Pla's request for preliminary certification of the class for purposes of the proposed settlement is gra nted. Pla's request for preliminary approval of the proposed settlement is granted. Pla's request to appoint Scott Williams as representative of the class members is granted. Pla's request to appoint The Garden City Group, Inc. as clai ms administrator is granted. Pla's request to appoint Frank J. Coughlin and Earl R. Wallace as class counsel is granted. Form and manner of giving notice of proposed settlement, applications for attys' fees and disbursements, and the hearin g to the class is approved. Final Approval Hearing on the proposed settlement set for 6/28/2010 10:30am in Courtroom 1 before Judge Irma E. Gonzalez. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 3/4/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jah) (kaj).
September 11, 2009 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 56 Motion Lifting Stay. Signed by Judge Napoleon A. Jones, Jr on 9/11/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(ksr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Costco Wholesale, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?