Mitchell v. AOL Time Warner, et al
Plaintiff: Paul Andrew Mitchell
Defendant: Adit Seth, James R Bramson, Neil T Nordbrock, Joe Szemiot, Lennert Leader, Tzolkin Corporation, Telalink Corporation, University of Texas, University of Georgia, Carnegie-Mellon University, NEBONET.com, Darren B Pocsik, Daniel Schmidt, Pennsylvania State University, Bob Issacson, Stanford University, ., Simple Network Communications, Inc., Cyborganic Media, AOL Prime Host, Midwest Internet Exchange, DOES 121 - 2,500, Carrie Malcolm, Lynne Meredith, . Mark Keller, DEOXY.org, Dave Alexander, Maui Global Communications, University of Wisconsin, Jason Scott, University of Arkansas, John Kechejian, Internet Online Services, Msen Inc, Mitchell A Goodkin, Thomson Financial Services, Irvin H Paugh, Larry Smith, ., Kearney, Castillo & Blake, Clairvoyance Corp, James H Daugherty, Jeff Head, William Harrity, Provide Net, AOL Time Warner, Teresa Giordano, Michael McFarland, David A Evans, Indiana University, Richard J Harrington, Herbert Crawford, Northeastern University, Paul Southworth, Eugene A Burns, The Thomson Corporation, Justsystem Corp, Cosmic Awareness Communications, Snow Hill Enterprises, Inc., Embry-Riddle Aeronautical University, William M Kemp, University of Oregon, Dimitri Dimitri, Earthlink Inc, Elizabeth Broderick, WorldNetDaily.com, Inc., Network Solutions, Incorporated, Sheila T Wallen, Daniel Levy, Todd R Eigenschink, William D Rippy, Dan Turkette, Lawrence E Condit, Leander Pearson, David Feustel, Mike McArthur, Stetson University, David W Starr, Four Peaks Technology Groups, John L Dortch, Princeton University, Donald D Hoffman, Chris Hansen, Intac Internet Access Corp., Miami University of Ohio, Parascope Inc, Karl Kleinpaste, Joseph Farah, University of Michigan, ., X Mission, Sprawlnet.com Inc, Florida Insitute of Technology, University of Kansas, Floyd W Shackelford, Scott Fahlman, Randall J Boe, David Thornburn-Gundlach, Cybergate Inc, George R Boyce, Ruffin Prevost, University of CA, -, Rob Martin, Anthony L Hargis, Justsystem Pittsburg Research Center, Joseph E Lepetich, TEK Interactive Group, Inc., Thirteen Technologies, LLC., Jonathan Steuer, Christopher Kankel, Ram Samudrala, Gary L Huss, Steve Case, ParabolaX Research Group, Donald E Wishart, Josh Bempechat, C I Host, Cornell University, Lonnie G Schmidt, Easylink Services Corp., Image FX Productions, Inc., Sean Strasburg, California Institute of Technology and Burntfork Rural Systems
Case Number: 3:2003cv00993
Filed: May 15, 2003
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Irma E Gonzalez
Referring Judge: Leo S Papas
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2004. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2004 Filing 90 Letter dated 7/29/04 to Court from Superior Court of CA, County of San Diego re: documents submitted by pla (Case transferred to Eastern District of CA on 7/9/03 per Order 87-1]) (jah)
July 8, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 89 DISCREPANCY ORDER by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez rejecting document: letter re: Miranda warning from plaintiff Paul Andrew Mitchell, non-compliance with local rule; Case transferred to Eastern District of Ca; No ex parte communication w/ judges (jah)
July 23, 2003 Filing 88 Acknowledgement of Letter regarding case CIV.S 03-1513 MCE DAD-PS, Eastern District of CA (jah)
July 9, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 87 Order by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez granting Dft's motion to transfer venue under 28 USC 1404(a) [21-1]; Case transferred to District of Eastern District of CA ; Hearings previously set of Court's calendar for 7/25/03 and 8/25/03 are vacated; Certified copy of this Order and documents mailed to Eastern District of CA (jah)
July 9, 2003 Filing 86 Attorney Substitution: Dft Internet Online Services substitutes Claude Stern of Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Oliver and Hedges as atty of record in place of Fenwick and West. (ATTY MAINT) (jah)
July 9, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Order by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez granting Internet Online's request for substitution of atty; Withdrawing attorney Evette D Pennypacker for Internet Online and substituting attorney Claude M Stern (ATTY MAINT) (jah)
July 7, 2003 Filing 84 Further Notice by defendant Gary L Huss to court of pla's oppressive tactics and procedural abuses. (jah)
July 3, 2003 Filing 83 Documents Refused by plaintiff Paul Andrew Mitchell for cause, no certificate of oath, endorsement and license to practice law. (jah)
July 2, 2003 Filing 82 MAIL RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE as to Paul Andrew Mitchell re: order [72-1] (dkt clerk)
July 2, 2003 Filing 81 MAIL RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE as to Paul Andrew Mitchell re: order [74-1] (dkt clerk)
June 26, 2003 Filing 80 Notice by defendant Gary L Huss to court of plaintiff's oppresive tactics and procedural abuses (bar)
June 26, 2003 Filing 77 MAIL RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE as to Paul Andrew Mitchell re: discrepancy order (bar)
June 25, 2003 Filing 79 JOINDER by defendant University of WI joining "University Defendants" motion to transfer venue under 28 USC 1404(a) [21-1] (jrl)
June 25, 2003 Filing 78 JOINDER by defendant University of WI joining AOL Time Warner, Inc.'s motion to dismiss [31-1] (jrl)
June 23, 2003 Filing 76 Declaration of Michael J. Daponde by defendants California Institute, Embry-Riddle, Indiana University, Mitchell A Goodkin, Northeastern, Pennsylvania State, Princeton University, Stanford University, Stetson University, University of AK, University of MI re motion reply [75-1] (jah)
June 23, 2003 Filing 75 Reply Brief by defendants California Institute, Embry-Riddle, Indiana University, Mitchell A Goodkin, Northeastern, Pennsylvania State, Princeton University, Stanford University, Stetson University, University of AK, University of MI to opposition to motion to transfer venue under 28 USC 1404(a) [21-1] (jah)
June 19, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Order by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez; Court vacates oral argument scheduled for 6/30/03 re motion to transfer venue under 28 USC 1404(a) [21-1] and will decide the motion w/o argument. (jah)
June 19, 2003 Filing 73 Affidavit of Lawrence E. Condit; NUNC PRO TUNC 6/16/03 (jah)
June 19, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 72 DISCREPANCY ORDER by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez accepting document: affidavit of Lawrence E. Condit from defendant Lawrence E Condit, non-compliance with local rule 5.1, document is to be filed nunc pro tunc to the date received; Per Local Rule 5.1 - tabs must be placed at bottom of all documents. (jah)
June 17, 2003 Filing 71 Memorandum of Points and Authorities by defendant Lawrence E Condit in support of motion to dismiss pursuant to FRCP Rule 12(B)(2) [70-1] (jah)
June 17, 2003 Filing 70 Notice of Motion and Motion by defendant Lawrence E Condit to dismiss pursuant to FRCP Rule 12(B)(2) , [motion(s) referred to Judge Irma E. Gonzalez]; Motion hrg set for 8/25/03 at 10:30am (jah)
June 11, 2003 Filing 69 MAIL RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE as to Paul Andrew Mitchell re: order [59-1] (jrl)
June 9, 2003 Filing 68 JOINDER by defendant Gary L Huss joining University defendants' motion to transfer venue under 28:USC 1404(a) filed 5/22/03; [21-1] (jrl)
June 9, 2003 Filing 67 JOINDER by defendant Gary L Huss joining motion to dismiss pursuant to rule 12(b)(6) of FRCP filed 5/22/03 by dfts AOL Time Warner Inc., et al [31-1] (jrl)
June 6, 2003 Filing 66 MAIL RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE as to Paul Andrew Mitchell re: Order [54-2]; Delivery refused for cause by Pla; No jurisdiction, 18 USC 1964(a). (jah)
June 6, 2003 Filing 65 MAIL RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE as to Paul Andrew Mitchell re: discrepancy order [55-1]; Delivery refused for cause by Pla; No jurisdiction, 18 USC 1964(a). (jah)
June 5, 2003 Filing 64 MAIL RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE as to Paul Andrew Mitchell re: pro hac vice order [38-1]; Delivery refused by Pla under protest and for fraud, no jurisdiction (jah)
June 4, 2003 Filing 63 Notice of Party with Financial Interest by defendants Clairvoyance Corp, David A Evans, Justsystem Corp, Justsystem Pittsburg, Scott Fahlman (jah)
June 4, 2003 Filing 62 Notice by defendants Clairvoyance Corp, David A Evans, Justsystem Corp, Justsystem Pittsburg, Scott Fahlman of related case(s) S-01-1480-WBS DAD PS filed in the Eastern District of CA. (jah)
June 4, 2003 Filing 61 JOINDER by defendants Clairvoyance Corp, David A Evans, Justsystem Corp, Justsystem Pittsburg, Scott Fahlman joining University Dfts' motion transfer venue under 28 USC 1404(a) [21-1] (jah)
June 4, 2003 Filing 60 JOINDER by defendants Clairvoyance Corp, David A Evans, Justsystem Corp, Justsystem Pittsburg, Scott Fahlman joining AOL Dfts' motion dismiss [31-1] (jah)
June 2, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 59 DISCREPANCY ORDER by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez accepting document: motion to dismiss from defendant Lawrence E Condit , non-compliance with local rule 5.1.j.4 and 7.1.f or 47.1.b.3, document is to be filed nunc pro tunc to the date received (jah)
May 30, 2003 Filing 58 JOINDER by defendant Irvin H Paugh joining motion to transfer venue under 28 USC 1404(a) [21-1] (jah)
May 29, 2003 Filing 57 JOINDER by defendant University of CA joining University Dfts' motion to transfer venue under 28 USC 1404(a) [21-1]; NUNC PRO TUNC 5/27/03 (jah)
May 29, 2003 Filing 56 JOINDER by defendant University of CA joining AOL Dfts' motion to dismiss [31-1]; NUNC PRO TUNC 5/27/03 (jah)
May 29, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 55 DISCREPANCY ORDER by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez accepting document: joinders to AOL Dfts' motion to dismiss and University Dfts' motion to transfer venue from defendant University of CA, non-compliance with local rule 7.1.f or 47.1.b.3, document is to be filed nunc pro tunc to the date received (jah)
May 29, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Order by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez; Because of conflict in Court's calendar, hearing for AOL Dfts' motion to dismiss [31-1] is continued to 10:30 on 7/25/03 before Judge Irma E. Gonzalez; Court orders no further motions, other than notices of joinder to existing motions shall be filed, unless party obtains a motion hrg date from the Court's law clerk; Court grants University of WI's request for enlargement of time to answer [39-1]; University of WI shall Answer to Complaint by 6/26/03 (jah)
May 27, 2003 Filing 53 Amended Proof of Service by defendants California Institute, Embry-Riddle, Indiana University, Mitchell A Goodkin, Pennsylvania State, Princeton University, Northeastern, Stanford University, Stetson University, University of AK, University of MI of: joinder, motion to tranfser venue t/w supporting documents (Rec'd in Docketing 5/29/03) (jah)
May 27, 2003 Filing 52 Notice by defendant Internet Online of related case(s) S-0101480-WBS DAD PS (Mitchell I) filed in the Eastern District of CA (jah)
May 27, 2003 Filing 51 JOINDER by defendant Internet Online joining AOL Dfts' motion to dismiss [31-1] (jah)
May 27, 2003 Filing 50 JOINDER by defendant Internet Online joining University Dfts' motion to transfer venue under 28 USC 1404(a) [21-1] (jah)
May 27, 2003 Filing 49 NOTICE OF JOINDER by defendant Carnegie-Mellon joining AOL Time Warner motion to dismiss [31-1] (jah)
May 27, 2003 Filing 48 NOTICE OF JOINDER by defendant Carnegie-Mellon joining University Dfts' motion to transfer venue under 28 USC 1404(a) [21-1] (jah)
May 27, 2003 Filing 45 Request for Judicial Notice by defendant University of Texas re: motion to dismiss [43-1] (jah)
May 27, 2003 Filing 44 Declaration of Lysha N. Weston by defendant University of Texas in support of motion to dismiss [43-1] (jah)
May 27, 2003 Filing 43 Notice of Motion and Motion by defendant University of Texas to dismiss , [motion(s) referred to Judge Irma E. Gonzalez ]; Motion hrg set for 7/25/03 at 10:30am (jah)
May 27, 2003 Filing 42 Notice by defendant University of Texas of filing motion to dismiss. (jah)
May 27, 2003 Filing 41 JOINDER by defendant University of Texas joining motion to transfer venue under 28 USC 1404(a) [21-1] (jah)
May 27, 2003 Filing 40 JOINDER by defendant University of Texas joining notice of removal (jah)
May 27, 2003 Filing 38 Pro Hac Vice approved on behalf of defendant University of WI for Sandra L Tarver (dkt clerk)
May 23, 2003 Filing 47 Independant Motion by defendant University of Oregon to dismiss , [motion(s) referred to Judge Irma E. Gonzalez]; Motion hrg set for 7/21/03 10:30am t/w Joinder in AOL's Motion to Dismiss. (ATTY MAINT) (jah)
May 23, 2003 Filing 46 JOINDER by defendant University of Oregon joining motion to transfer venue under 28 USC 1404(a) [21-1] (jah)
May 23, 2003 Filing 39 Request by defendant University of WI for: enlargement of time to answer or respond to complaint t/w Notice of Appearance. (jah)
May 23, 2003 Filing 37 Memorandum of Points and Authorities by defendant Network Solutions in support of motion to dismiss [36-1], and motion for joinder in AOL dfts' motion to dismiss [31-1] [36-2] (jah)
May 23, 2003 Filing 36 Notice of Motions and Motions by defendant Network Solutions to dismiss , and for joinder in AOL dfts' motion to dismiss [31-1] , [motion(s) referred to Judge Irma E. Gonzalez]; Motion hrg set for 7/21/03 at 10:30am (jah)
May 23, 2003 Filing 35 JOINDER by defendant Network Solutions joining University Dfts motion to transfer venue under 28 USC 1404(a) [21-1] (jah)
May 22, 2003 Filing 34 Notice by defendants AOL Time Warner, James R Bramson, Randall J Boe, Steve Case, Lennert Leader of related case(s) S-01-1480-WBS DAD PS filed in the Eastern District of CA (jah)
May 22, 2003 Filing 33 Request for Judicial Notice by defendants AOL Time Warner, James R Bramson, Randall J Boe, Steve Case, Lennert Leader motion dismiss [31-1] (jah)
May 22, 2003 Filing 32 Memorandum of Points and Authorities by defendants AOL Time Warner, James R Bramson, Randall J Boe, Steve Case, Lennert Leader in support of motion to dismiss [31-1] (jah)
May 22, 2003 Filing 31 Notice of Motion and Motion by defendants AOL Time Warner, James R Bramson, Randall J Boe, Steve Case, Lennert Leader to dismiss , [motion(s) referred to Judge Irma E. Gonzalez ]; Motion hrg set for 7/21/03 at 10:30am (jah)
May 22, 2003 Filing 30 JOINDER by defendants AOL Time Warner, James R Bramson, Randall J Boe, Steve Case, Lennert Leader joining motion to transfer under 28 USC 1404(a) [21-1] (jah)
May 22, 2003 Filing 29 JOINDER by defendant Joseph Farah, defendant WorldNetDaily.com joining AOL Time Warner's motion to dismiss (Motion not on File) (jah)
May 22, 2003 Filing 28 JOINDER by defendant Cornell University joining University Dfts' motion to transfer venue under 28 USC 1404(a) [21-1] (jah)
May 22, 2003 Filing 27 JOINDER by defendant Cornell University joining AOL Time Warner's motion to dismiss (Motion to Dismiss not on File) (jah)
May 22, 2003 Filing 26 JOINDER by defendant Cornell University joining Carnegie Mellon's notice of removal (jah)
May 22, 2003 Filing 25 JOINDER by Joseph Farah, WorldNetDaily.com joining University Dfts' motion to transfer venue under 28 USC 1404(a) [21-1] (jah)
May 22, 2003 Filing 24 Request for Judicial Notice by defendants California Institute, Embry-Riddle, Indiana University, Mitchell A Goodkin, Northeastern, Pennsylvania State, Princeton University, Stanford University, Stetson University, University of University of MI re: motion to transfer venue under 28 USC 1404(a) [21-1] (jah)
May 22, 2003 Filing 23 Declaration of Wesley C.J. Ehlers by defendants California Institute, Embry-Riddle, Indiana University, Mitchell A Goodkin, Northeastern, Pennsylvania State, Princeton University, Stanford University, Stetson University, University of AK, University of MI in support of motion to transfer venue under 28 USC 1404(a) [21-1] (jah)
May 22, 2003 Filing 22 Memorandum of Points and Authorities by California Institute, Embry-Riddle, Indiana University, Mitchell A Goodkin, Northeastern, Pennsylvania State, Princeton University, Stetson University, University of AK, University of MI in support of motion to transfer venue under 28 USC 1404(a) [21-1] (jah)
May 22, 2003 Filing 21 Notice of Motion and Motion by defendants California Institute, Embry-Riddle, Indiana University, Mitchell A Goodkin, Northeastern, Pennsylvania State, Princeton University, Stanford University, Stetson University, University of AK, University of MI to transfer venue under 28 USC 1404(a) , [motion(s) referred to Judge Irma E. Gonzalez]; Motion set for 6/30/03 at 10:30am (jah)
May 22, 2003 Filing 20 JOINDER by defendants California Institute, Embry-Riddle, Indiana University, Mitchell A Goodkin, Northeastern, Pennsylvania State, Princeton University, Stanford University, Stetson University, University of AK, University of MI joining motion to dismiss by AOL Time Warner, Randall J Boe, James Bramson, Steve Case and Lennert Leader (jah)
May 21, 2003 Filing 19 Notice of Party with Financial Interest by Network Solutions (jah)
May 21, 2003 Filing 18 JOINDER by defendant Network Solutions joining Carnegie Mellon's notice of removal. (jah)
May 21, 2003 Filing 17 JOINDER by defendant Scott Fahlman joining Carnegie Mellon's notice of removal (jah)
May 20, 2003 Filing 16 JOINDER by defendant Irvin H Paugh joining notice of removal and joinder of dfts AOL-Time Warner, Randell J Boa, Steve Case and James Bramson and Carnegie Mellon. (jah)
May 20, 2003 Filing 15 Notice of Party with Financial Interest by Internet Online (jah)
May 20, 2003 Filing 14 JOINDER by defendant Internet Online joining Carnergie Mellon's notice of removal. (ATTY MAINT) (jah)
May 19, 2003 Filing 13 Notice of Party with Financial Interest by defendants Joseph Farah, WorldNetDaily.com (jah)
May 19, 2003 Filing 12 JOINDER by defendants Joseph Farah, WorldNetDaily.com joining Carnegie Mellon's notice of removal (ATTY MAINT) (jah)
May 15, 2003 Filing 11 JOINDER by defendant Justsystem Corp joining Carnegie Mellon's notice of removal (Rec'd in Docketing 5/19/03) (jah)
May 15, 2003 Filing 10 JOINDER by defendant Clairvoyance Corp joining Carnegie Mellon's notice of removal (Rec'd in Docketing 5/19/03) (jah)
May 15, 2003 Filing 9 JOINDER by defendant Justsystem Pittsburg joining Carnegie Mellon's notice of removal (Rec'd in Docketing 5/19/03) (jah)
May 15, 2003 Filing 8 JOINDER by defendants California Institute, Embry-Riddle, Indiana University, Mitchell A Goodkin, Northeastern, Pennsylvania State, Princeton University, Stanford University, Stetson University, University of AK, University of MI, Mitchell Goodkin joining Carnegie Mellon's notice of removal. (ATTY MAINT) (Rec'd in Docketing 5/15/03) (jah)
May 15, 2003 Filing 7 JOINDER by defendant David A Evans joining dft Carnegie Mellon University's notice of removal (Rec'd in Docketing 5/19/03) (jah)
May 15, 2003 Filing 6 JOINDER by defendants AOL Time Warner, James R Bramson, Randall J Boe, Steve Case, Lennert Leader joining dft Carnegie Mellon University's notice of removal. (ATTY MAINT) (Rec'd in Docketing 5/19/03) (jah)
May 15, 2003 Filing 5 JOINDER by defendant University of CA - joining dft Carnegie Mellon University's notice of removal (Rec'd in Docketing 5/19/03) (jah)
May 15, 2003 Filing 4 Local Rule 40.2 Notice by AOL Time Warner (Rec'd in Docketing 5/19/03) (jah)
May 15, 2003 Filing 3 Notice by defendant Carnegie-Mellon of related case(s): S-01-1480-WBS DAD in the Eastern District of CA (Rec'd in Docketing 5/19/03) (jah)
May 15, 2003 Filing 2 Notice of Party with Financial Interest by California Institute (jpp)
May 15, 2003 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Superior Court of CA San Diego County t/w copy of complaint. Court Case Number: GIC 807057 ( to Magistrate Judge Leo S. Papas ) Receipt No/Amt of Fee: #94039/$150. Demand for jury trial by plaintiff and defendant Carnegie Mellon University. (jpp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. AOL Time Warner, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adit Seth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James R Bramson
Represented By: Belinda S Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil T Nordbrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Szemiot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lennert Leader
Represented By: Belinda S Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tzolkin Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Telalink Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Texas
Represented By: Lysha Nicole Weston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Georgia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carnegie-Mellon University
Represented By: Susan H Handelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEBONET.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darren B Pocsik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pennsylvania State University
Represented By: Wesley C. J. Ehlers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Issacson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanford University, .
Represented By: Wesley C. J. Ehlers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simple Network Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyborganic Media
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AOL Prime Host
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Internet Exchange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 121 - 2,500
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrie Malcolm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynne Meredith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Mark Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEOXY.org
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maui Global Communications
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Wisconsin
Represented By: Gregory Sinclair Price
Represented By: Sandra L Tarver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Arkansas
Represented By: Wesley C. J. Ehlers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kechejian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internet Online Services
Represented By: Evette D Pennypacker
Represented By: Claude M Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Msen Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell A Goodkin
Represented By: Wesley C. J. Ehlers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomson Financial Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irvin H Paugh
Represented By: Janis L Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Smith, .
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kearney, Castillo & Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clairvoyance Corp
Represented By: Meryl Macklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James H Daugherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Head
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Harrity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Provide Net
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AOL Time Warner
Represented By: Belinda S Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Giordano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A Evans
Represented By: Meryl Macklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indiana University
Represented By: Wesley C. J. Ehlers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard J Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herbert Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northeastern University
Represented By: Wesley C. J. Ehlers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Southworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene A Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Thomson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justsystem Corp
Represented By: Meryl Macklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cosmic Awareness Communications
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snow Hill Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Embry-Riddle Aeronautical University
Represented By: Wesley C. J. Ehlers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William M Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Oregon
Represented By: Charles D Ferrari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dimitri Dimitri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earthlink Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Broderick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WorldNetDaily.com, Inc.
Represented By: James F Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Network Solutions, Incorporated
Represented By: Richard C. O'Hare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheila T Wallen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd R Eigenschink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William D Rippy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Turkette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence E Condit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leander Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Feustel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike McArthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stetson University
Represented By: Wesley C. J. Ehlers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David W Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Four Peaks Technology Groups
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John L Dortch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Princeton University
Represented By: Wesley C. J. Ehlers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald D Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intac Internet Access Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami University of Ohio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parascope Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karl Kleinpaste
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Farah
Represented By: James F Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Michigan, .
Represented By: Wesley C. J. Ehlers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: X Mission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprawlnet.com Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Insitute of Technology
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Kansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Floyd W Shackelford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Fahlman
Represented By: Meryl Macklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall J Boe
Represented By: Belinda S Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Thornburn-Gundlach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cybergate Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George R Boyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruffin Prevost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of CA, -
Represented By: Christopher M Patti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony L Hargis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justsystem Pittsburg Research Center
Represented By: Meryl Macklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph E Lepetich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEK Interactive Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thirteen Technologies, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Steuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Kankel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ram Samudrala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary L Huss
Represented By: Gary L Huss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Case
Represented By: Belinda S Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ParabolaX Research Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald E Wishart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Bempechat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C I Host
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cornell University
Represented By: Kimberly Jean Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lonnie G Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Easylink Services Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Image FX Productions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Strasburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Institute of Technology
Represented By: Wesley C. J. Ehlers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burntfork Rural Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Andrew Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?