Tain v. Hennessey, et al

Case Number: 3:2003cv01481
Filed: July 24, 2003
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
Presiding Judge: Irma E. Gonzalez
Referring Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 1, 2009 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Dft Hennessey's 45 Motion to Dismiss. Court denies Dft's motion w/ respect to Claims 1 and 2. Court grants Dft's motion to dismiss and dismisses w/ prejudice Pla's Claim 3. Court gran ts Dft's motion to dismiss and dismisses w/ leave to amend Pla's Claim 4. If Pla wishes to amend its Complaint, it may do so w/in 20 days of the filing of this Order. Court grants Dft's motion to dismiss and dismisses w/ prejudice Pla's Claim 5. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 12/1/2009. (jah)(jrl).
July 16, 2009 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying in its entirety Defendant's 37 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 7/16/2009. (jah) (jrl).
April 30, 2009 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendant Edward Hennessey's Motion to Set Aside Judgment as Void Pursuant to FRCP 55(c) and Rule 60(b)(4). Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 4/30/20009. (jah) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tain v. Hennessey, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?