Krueger v. Wyeth Inc, et al

Case Number: 3:2003cv02496
Filed: December 12, 2003
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
Referring Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Presiding Judge: John S. Rhoades
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 7, 2015 295 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 278 279 on Supplemental Briefs: Plaintiff satisfies the ascertainability and predominance requirements, and has met allother requirements for class certification; Defendants' request to decertify the class is denied; Plaintiff's request to modify the class definition is granted. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 10/7/15. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
September 20, 2012 216 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 214 Joint MOTION for Discovery Dispute Determination - Plaintiff's Motion for Additional Depositions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 9/20/12. (Dembin, Mitchell)
August 22, 2012 201 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 181 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Rebuttal Experts. As provided herein, the Court finds that the reports of Drs. McCorvey and Papperman are not proper rebuttal. The Court also denies Plaintiff's request for leave to designate these experts as initial experts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 8/22/12. (Dembin, Mitchell)
June 1, 2012 168 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 164 Defendants' Motion for Leave to Re-Depose Plaintiff April Krueger. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 6/1/12. (Dembin, Mitchell)
March 20, 2007 9 Opinion or Order of the Court Conditional MDL ORDER 1507, Case reopened. Case remanded from the Eastern District of Arkansas. (bar, ) Modified on 3/20/2007 re Judge infomation(bar, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krueger v. Wyeth Inc, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?