SEC v. Presto, et al

Case Number: 3:2004cv00163
Filed: January 27, 2004
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 17, 2010 992 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part Defendant Alfred Louis Vassallo's 980 Motion to Stay Civil Contempt Proceedings. Govt and SEC must each file a status report by 2/14/2011, ex parte and/or under seal as may be appropriate. Court will hold a further hearing, or issue a further ruling on Vassallo's motion to stay, following receipt of the status reports. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 12/17/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jah)
October 26, 2010 975 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Hearing on SEC Motion for Civil Contempt Sanctions. Court finds clear and convincing evidence Vassallo violated the 8/23/2005 Permanent Injunction by failing to pay disgorgement, civil penalties, and Receiver's costs. Hearing set f or 12/9/2010 1:30PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Irma E. Gonzalez, at which time Vassallo may present any defense to the SEC's civil contempt allegations. Vassallo must file a written response to SEC's motion by 11/19/2010. SEC may file a re ply by 11/29/2010. SEC's remaining allegations that Vassallo is in contempt as result of his conduct in violation of the federal securities laws is bifurcated from the civil contempt proceedings. Court will issue a separate notice under Fed.R.Crim.P 42 referring matters for criminal contempt proceedings. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 10/26/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jah)
May 14, 2009 943 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Receiver's 934 Motion to Enforce the Compromise Agreement. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 5/14/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(jah) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SEC v. Presto, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?