Kelly v. Provident Life, et al

Case Number: 3:2004cv00807
Filed: April 19, 2004
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Referring Judge: James F. Stiven
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 11, 2012 248 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Overruling Plaintiff's 244 Objection to Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Rule 37 Sanctions filed by Richard Howard Kelly. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 6/11/12.(cge)(jrd)
July 8, 2011 203 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Defendant's 178 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 7/8/11. (cge)
June 20, 2011 197 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on 174 Joint Motion for Discovery. Provident must produce a witness or witnesses for deposition on a date mutually convenient for Plaintiff's counsel, but in any event no later than July 11,2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 06/20/11. (cge)
August 12, 2010 158 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendant's (Doc. 106 ) Motion for Summary Judgment is denied. The parties shall contact the Magistrate Judge to schedule a status conference to set a schedule to complete discovery. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 8/12/2010. (mdc)
February 9, 2010 122 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Overruling 103 Defendant's Objection to the Non-Dispositive Order of the Magistrate Judge and Granting 108 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion to Continue Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. # 106) is due on or before April 19, 2010. Defendant's reply is due on or before April 26, 2010. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 2/9/2010. (knh)(mam).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelly v. Provident Life, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?