Jackson v. Woodford, et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv00513
Filed: March 14, 2005
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Referring Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 25, 2015 198 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Certifying Appeal as Frivolous. In accordance with the Ninth Circuit's referral notice, the Clerk of the Court shall immediately notify the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals and the parties of this order. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 9/25/2015.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service; CC: Appeals Clerk)(sjt). (Modified on 9/25/2015: USCA Case Number 15-56441. Order electronically transmitted to the US Court of Appeals via regenerated NEF.) (akr).
September 2, 2015 193 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 180 Rule 60 Motion. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 9/1/2015.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(sjt)
July 7, 2009 164 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 89 Defendants' MOTION for Summary Judgment: Plaintiff has not raised a genuine issue of material fact regarding the causation element of his claim. The court therefore need not consider whether Plaintiff was successful in overcoming Defendants motion with respect to the injury element. Defendants motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 7/7/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(mjj) (av1).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Woodford, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?