Hilderman, et al v. Enea Teksci Inc

Case Number: 3:2005cv01049
Filed: May 16, 2005
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
Referring Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Presiding Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 28, 2010 175 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 174 Joint Motion to Dismiss Entire Action With Reservation of Jurisdiction to Enforce Settlement Agreement. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 6/28/10. (vet)
February 10, 2010 164 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 140 Counter-Defendants' motion to exclude the expert opinion and report of Nicholas L. Feakins, CPA, as they relate to Enea Teksci, Inc.'s damages and denying as moot 142 Counter-Defendants' motion to limit trade secret evidence and argument. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 2/10/2010. (tkl) (jrl).
January 8, 2010 158 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE MOTIONS IN LIMINE: Denying Without Prejudice 139 Motion to Exclude Evidence that Agreement Violated BPC Section 16600; Granting [139-1] Motion to Exclude Alan Hoffman and Nietin Gupta from Giving Expert Testimony; Denying Without Prejudice 139 Motion to Exclude Evidence that Hilderman had Right to Solicit ENEA Customers and Employees; Denying Without Prejudice 139 Motion to Exclude Evidence that Trade Secrets Cannot Be Derived from Matters in the Public Domain; Denying Without Pre judice 139 Motion to Exclude Evidence of ENEA's Business to Show Lack of Loss; Deferring ruling on 140 Motion in Limine; Granting Without Prejudice 141 Motion to Exclude Any Evidence or Argument of Enea TekSci's Actual Losses; Deferri ng ruling on 142 Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinion and Report of Nicholas L. Feakins, CPA. On February 1, 2010 at 10:30 a.m., the Court will hold an evidentiary hearing during which Mr. Feakins will testify as to his proposed expert opinion. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 1/8/10. (vet) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hilderman, et al v. Enea Teksci Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?