Stewart v. Giurbino, et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv01059
Filed: May 17, 2005
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
Referring Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Presiding Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 28, 2010 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) Construing Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal as a Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis in the District Court; Granting Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; and Granting In Part and Denying In Part Motion for Copies of Transcripts. (Copies of pages of the trial transcript mailed to Petitioner as ordered). Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 6/28/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(vet)
April 21, 2010 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) Directing that materials submitted for in camera review be filed under seal; (2) Denying Petitioner's request for Discovery; (3) Dismissing First Amended Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus as untimely for reasons set forth in the Court's May 30, 2008 Order; and (4) issuing a Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 4/21/10.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao)
January 21, 2009 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Petitioner's 65 Motion to Expand the Record, Denying As Moot Petitioner's 64 Motion for Leave to Amend, and Granting In Part and Denying In Part Petitioner's 41 Motion for Discovery. Respondent is directed to submit the material identified in this Order directly to chambers for in camera review within thirty (30) days of the date this Order is filed. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 1/20/09.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(vet)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart v. Giurbino, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?