Green v. Harrison

Case Number: 3:2005cv01485
Filed: July 25, 2005
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Referring Judge: Leo S. Papas
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 17, 2009 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 108 Petitioner's Motion for Certificate of Appealability. This Court finds that a certificate of appealability is not warranted in this instance because the dismissal of the instant petition under the circumstances here is not an issue debatable among jurists of reason nor could any other court resolve the issue in a different manner. Accordingly, the Court hereby DECLINES to issue a certificate of appealability. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 11/17/2009. (USCA Case No. 09-56207. Order electronically transmitted to US Court of Appeals. All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (akr)
July 6, 2009 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 104 Report and Recommendation and Denying 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 7/6/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(pdc) (av1).
May 6, 2009 104 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Recommending that the Court issue an Order directing that Judgment be entered denying the Petition. No later than June 8, 2009, any party to this action may file written objections with the Court and serve a copy on all parties. Any reply to the objections shall be filed with the Court and served on all parties no later than June 29, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo S. Papas on 5/6/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(pdc) (jrl).
September 3, 2008 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Finding Claim Exhausted; Order to Respond to Petition: Respondent Charles M Harrison's answer due 11/3/2008. Petitioner's Traverse due by 12/3/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo S. Papas on 9/3/2008. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(mjj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?