Sony Electronics Inc, et al v. Guardian Media Tech

Case Number: 3:2005cv01777
Filed: September 14, 2005
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
Referring Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Presiding Judge: Rudi M. Brewster
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 24, 2009 246 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 240 Joint Motion for Entry of Final Judgment. Court approves the Final Judgment submitted by the parties. Clerk is directed to file the Final Judgment in the case. Non-Guardian's 208 Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of the '160 patent is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 9/24/2009. (jah)(av1).
August 31, 2009 233 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 182 Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringememt of U.S. Patent No. 4,930,158. Court grants summary judgment of non-infringement of the '158 patent because the accused players do not contain an "auxiliary device" an d grants summary judgment of the non-infringement of the '158 patent because the accused devices do not "compare a detected code to a set of codes". Court declines to reach the issue whether the accused devices "cause playing of the video program to be suspended". Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 8/31/2009. (jah) (jrl).
April 27, 2009 179 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 4/24/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(jah) (jrl).
April 23, 2009 177 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Striking Paragraph 13 of Proposed Protective Order w/o Prejudice and Entering Protective Order as Amended. Granting Defendant Guardian Media Tech's 175 Motion for Protective Order. Guardian's request to strike paragraph 13 of the pr oposed protective order is granted w/o prejudice to the Non-Guardian parties subsequent renewal of the challenge of the confidential classification of this material at some later date when an articulated need for the disclosure to in-house counsel can be demonstrated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 4/23/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(jah) (jrl).
September 21, 2007 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting briefing schedule following remand and consolidating newly filed complaint. Case consolidated with 07cv1613-B(AJB). Hearing for 74 Dft's Motion to Dismiss is set for 10/17/07 at 9:00AM. Responses due by 10/3/2007. Replies due by 10/10/2007.Signed by Judge Rudi M. Brewster on 9/20/07. (vrp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sony Electronics Inc, et al v. Guardian Media Tech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?