Gilmore v. Woodford

Case Number: 3:2005cv01863
Filed: September 28, 2005
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
Referring Judge: William McCurine
Presiding Judge: Thomas J. Whelan
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 14, 2006 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 15 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations VACATED, Case reopened. Petitioner granted extension of time to file objections to report and recommendation; Answer to Objections due by 10/27/2006. Objections to R&R due by 10/13/2006. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 9/13/06. (mam)
September 13, 2006 16 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT adopting the Report and Recommendation in its entirety and denying the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (mam)
September 8, 2006 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and denying the petition for writ of habeas corpus. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 9/8/06. (mam) Modified on 9/15/2006 to reopen case as this order has been VACATED by order of 9/14/06(mam).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilmore v. Woodford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?