Neathery v. Chevron Texaco Corp, et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv01883
Filed: September 30, 2005
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Labor: E.R.I.S.A. Office
Referring Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T Miller
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 4, 2010 201 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting joint motion to post supersedeas bond to stay the enforcement of the judgment in the amount of $1,242,808.60 200 . Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 1/4/2010. (tkl) (jrl).
December 18, 2009 199 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED JUDGMENT in a civil case re 198 Motion. Judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiff, Teresa E. Neathery, and against Defendant Voluntary Group Accident Insurance Plan and Defendant On-the Job Accident Insurance Plan, erroneously sued as Chevron Texaco Corporation Group Accident Policy No. OK 826458 and defendant Accident Policy No. SLG-000784, in the total judgment amount of $1,242,808.60. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 12/18/09. (lao) av1).
November 2, 2009 194 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 10/30/09. The court grants Plaintiff's motion for prejudgment interest, attorney's fees, and costs 170 . Prejudgment interest is awarded in the amount of $142,365. Attorney's fees are awarded in the amount of $314, 516. Non-statutory costs are awarded in the amount of $9,750. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 10/30/09. (tkl)(jrl).
September 10, 2009 181 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 180 joint Motion to Continue hearing date to 10/9/09 at 1:30 p.m. of plaintiff's motion for interest, attorney's fees and costs 170 . Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 9/10/09. (tkl) (jrl).
August 12, 2009 168 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT the court finds, based on a de novo review of the administrative record in place at the time this litigation was initiated, Neathery's death was caused by an "accident" covered under the Plans. LINA's denial of benefits to Plaintiff under the Plans is therefore reversed. Judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiff(tkl) (av1).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neathery v. Chevron Texaco Corp, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?