Kearney v. Foley and Lardner, et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv02112
Filed: November 14, 2005
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Referring Judge: Louisa S Porter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983cv Civil Rights Act - Civil Action for Deprivation of Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 28, 2016 314 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) Granting Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment (Doc. Nos. 267 , 287 ); (2) Denying as Moot Defendants' Motions to Exclude (Doc. Nos. 308 , 312 , 313 ); and (3) Denying as Moot Foley Defendants' Oral Request for Leave to Amend Answers. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 9/28/2016. (dls)
November 29, 2012 188 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendant McCarty's 169 Judgment on the Pleadings and Dismissing Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Complaint with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 11/29/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge)
July 27, 2011 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 126 Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint without prejudice. Plaintiff may file a Fourth Amended Complaint on or before August 15, 2011. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 07/22/11. (cge)
March 28, 2011 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting (Doc. 107 ) Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint and Granting Leave to Amend RICO Claim. Plaintiff may file a Third Amended Complaint on or before April 18, 2011. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 3/28/2011. (srm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kearney v. Foley and Lardner, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?