Cardinal, et al v. Buchnoff, et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv00072
Filed: January 12, 2006
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
Presiding Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Referring Judge: Leo S. Papas
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 14, 2010 164 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 156 Motion for Summary Judgment Re: Plaintiffs' Negligence Claim Against Defendant San Diego County. For the reasons stated herein, the Court grants Defendants' motion for summary judgment as to Plaintiffs' common law negligence claim against Defendant San Diego County. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 9/14/2010. (leh)
August 23, 2010 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part (Doc. 106 ) Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 3 (To Exclude Evidence Regarding The Dismissal Of Kyle Cardinal's Criminal Case). Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 8/23/2010. (srm)
April 5, 2010 149 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Without Prejudice 127 Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 9. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 4/5/2010. (mjj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cardinal, et al v. Buchnoff, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?