Evans v. Horn, et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv00877
Filed: April 13, 2006
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
Referring Judge: Ruben B. Brooks
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T Miller
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 3, 2009 136 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT - court hereby adopts the Report and Recommendation in its entirety. Defendants' motion for summary judgment is granted.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl) (kaj).
April 2, 2009 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's Motion for Discovery 111 , Ex Parte Application to Vacate the Motion Filing Date 117 , and Application for Service of Process 115 . The Court grants in part Plaintiff's Application for Enlargement of Time to Fil e an Opposition to dft's Motion for Summary Judgment 119 ; Evans may file any opposition by 5/5/09. Dfts to reply by 5/22/09. The hearing on Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is reset for June 1, 2009, at 10:00 a.m. The pretrial conf erence date of May 1, 2009, and trial date of June 1, 2009, currently set on Judge Millers calendar are vacated. The mandatory settlement conference is reset for September 2, 2009, at 8:30 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 4/2/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl) (jrl).
February 4, 2009 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 95 plaintiff's Motion to Suppress Deposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 2/4/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl)
January 8, 2009 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Pla's 70 Declaration for Entry of Default Against John/Jane Doe #1, Chief Medical Officer. denying Pla's 74 Declaration for Entry of Default Against Bruce Leicht, Medical Administrator. granting Pla's 80 Motion for Extension of Time to File Amended Pleadings; Conditionally granting Pla's 87 Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 1/8/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(jah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. Horn, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?