Terry v. City of San Diego, et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv01459
Filed: July 19, 2006
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
Referring Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Presiding Judge: John A. Houston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 24, 2012 314 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Ruling on Plaintiff's Title VII Disparate Impact Claim; and Denying as Moot 286 Motion for Permanent Injunction. Accordingly, the Court rules in favor of Plaintiff on her Title VII disparate impact claim and awards her $1 in backpay. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 1/24/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
July 18, 2011 203 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: 197 Plaintiff's Motion to Clarify and/or For Reconsideration: Because the Court's 5/18/2011 Order did not preclude Plaintiff from offering this evidence in support of her disparate impact claims to establish use of the proxy comparison pool, the Court Denies as Moot Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 7/18/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)(jrd)
May 18, 2011 193 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(d): On 4/4/2011, the Court held a Final Pretrial Conference. The trial date set for 6/1/2011 is vacated, and reset for 10/26/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5. The parties are directed to contact the chambers of Mag istrate Judge Bencivengo to schedule a settlement conference. The Court denies Defendant's (Doc. 133 ) motion in limine to preclude Plaintiff from presenting evidence of disparate impact claims. The Court denies Defendant's (Doc. 130 ) mo tion to bifurcate Plaintiff's claims of disparate impact from her claims of disparate treatment and retaliation. The Court affirms each of its tentative rulings regarding Defendant's objections to Plaintiff's offer of proof regarding p attern and practice evidence in support of her disparate treatment claims. The Court will modify the pretrial order to strike issues of law numbers 1, 4, 9, 14, 15, and 16 from the final pretrial order. Issue of law number 10 will not be stricken fro m the final pretrial order. The Court will strike issues of law numbers 5,6,7, and 8 from the final pretrial order. Paul Zimmer will not be stricken from Defendant's witness list. A final pretrial order shall issue forthwith in accordance with Federal Rule Civil Procedure 16(e), and this Court's order. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 5/18/2011. (mdc)(jrd)
February 25, 2011 180 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE and ORDER Re: Tentative Rulings on Defendant's Pretrial Motions and Motions in Limine (Docs. 138 , 139 , 140 , 141 , 133 , 129 , 136 , 131 , 135 , 130 , 137 , and 134 . The parties are advised the Court's rulings are tentative, and the Court will entertain oral argument at the hearing on February 28, 2011. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 2/25/2011.(leh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Terry v. City of San Diego, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?