Uriarte v. Schwarzenegger, et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv01558
Filed: August 2, 2006
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
Referring Judge: William McCurine
Presiding Judge: Thomas J. Whelan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 4, 2012 261 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 251 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Location of Defendant Crawford. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 5/4/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ecs)(jrd)
February 24, 2012 255 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Without Prejudice 238 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 2/23/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ecs)(jrd)
December 19, 2011 246 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 211 Report and Recommendation; and Denying 192 Motion for Leave to File a Third Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 12/19/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
October 18, 2011 214 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER Re: 158 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint. The Court grants in part and denies in part Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. It is hereby ordered that in sum, Plaintiff's Eighth Amendment excessive force clai m against Defendants Martinez and Hurm has not been dismissed. Plaintiffs Eighth Amendment deliberate indifference claim against Defendants Martinez, Hurm, Spence, Williams, Reed, Jones, Jenkin, Camacho, Ramirez, Bracamonte, Stricklin, Oliveros, Raup e, and Ritter has not been dismissed. These are the only remaining claims and defendants in this case. The remaining Defendants shall file an answer to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by 11/11/2011. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 10/18/2011.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
September 29, 2011 204 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 180 Motion to Compel Discovery. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 9/29/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)(jrd)
August 26, 2010 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 142 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. It is ordered that: (i) The Clerk of Court shall docket Plaintiff's second amended complaint, which he filed as an exhibit to his pending motion for leave to amend (Doc. No. 142-1), upon entering this order. (ii) The Clerk shall add Norment Security Group, Inc. as a defendant, and thereafter issue a summons upon the company and forward it to Plaintiff along with a blank U.S. Marshal Form 285. (iii) The Clerk shall dismi ss Defendants J. Tilton, R. Hickman, J. Woodford, P. Farber-Szekreny, N. Grannis, and A. Schwarzenegger from this action. The caption for this action shall remain unchanged, despite Defendant Schwarzeneggers dismissal; (iv) Defendant Larry William Green shall be substituted in place of existing Defendant Mark Greene. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 8/25/2010. (Pro per package prepared) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
July 14, 2010 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying (Doc. 115 ) Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 7/14/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cap)
February 4, 2008 57 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION regarding (1) Defendants' MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint 47 ; (2) Plaintiff's MOTION for Default 43 . Objections to R&R due by 2/25/2008; Replies due by 3/7/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine Jr. on 2/3/08. (aje)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Uriarte v. Schwarzenegger, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?