Trunk, et al v. City of San Diego, et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv01597
Filed: August 9, 2006
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
Referring Judge: William McCurine
Presiding Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983cv Civil Rights Act - Civil Action for Deprivation of Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 12, 2013 364 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 353 Ex Parte Motion to Stay and Entering Judgment in Favor of Plaintiffs and Specifying Remedy. The Defendants are now PERMANENTLY ENJOINED from displaying or continuing to allow the display of the current cross on federal land as par t of the Mount Soledad Veterans Memorial. Within 90 days of the date of this order, Defendants are ORDERED to remove the cross. At Defendants' suggestion, and with Plaintiffs' consent, the order to remove the current cross is STAYED pending the resolution of any appeal. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of Plaintiffs and against Defendants. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 12/12/13. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)
December 12, 2012 327 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Mount Soledad Memorial Association's Motion to Intervene, denying San Diegans for the Mt. Soledad National War Memorial's Motion to Intervene, granting leave to proceed as amici curiae. San Diegans for the Mt. Soledad Memoria l and Representatives Bilbray and Hunter may file briefs as amici. The two Representatives should file one brief for the two of them, rather than two separate briefs. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 12/12/12 (Nunc Pro Tunc 10/22/12) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)
October 22, 2012 324 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Mount Soledad Memorial Association's 315 Motion to Intervene, denying San Diegans for the Mt. Soledad National War Memorial's 316 Motion to Intervene, granting Brian Bilbray, Duncan Hunter's 314 Motion for Le ave to Proceed as Amici Curiae. San Diegans for the Mt. Soledad Memorial and Representatives Bilbray and Hunter may file briefs as amici. The two Representatives should file one brief for the two of them, rather than two separate briefs. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 10/19/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)(jrd)
February 5, 2008 246 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule for 226 Ex Parte Application to Strike. Plaintiffs may file a brief in opposition no later than 2/25/08. No separate hearing will be required. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 1/31/08. (vrp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trunk, et al v. City of San Diego, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?