Scharringhausen v. The United States of America et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv02167
Filed: September 29, 2006
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Taxes Office
Referring Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Presiding Judge: Janis L. Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 05:552 Freedom of Information Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 5, 2010 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 69 Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 10/5/10. (lmt)
September 25, 2010 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) denying 81 Motion to Stay, (2) finding as moot 82 Motion to Expedite and (3) vacating hearing re 69 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings: The motion hearing concerning Defendant's motion for judgment on the pleadings, set for 9/30/10 is hereby vacated, and the motion is taken under submission without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1(d)(1). Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 9/25/10. (lmt)
August 30, 2010 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 71 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration: the Court denies Plaintiff's motion to reconsider. The Court further denies Plaintiff's motion to continue the hearing on the pending motion for judgment on the pleadings. The hearing remains as scheduled for 9/30/10. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/30/10. (lmt)
July 12, 2010 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 62 Defendant's Motion to Reconsider: The Court dismisses Plaintiff's first cause of action alleged in its Second Amended Complaint insofar as it is based on alleged violations of 26 U.S.C. sectio n 7602 (c)(2) and 26 C.F.R. section 301.7602-1(c)(3)(ii). The Court denies defendant's motion to reconsider its Order denying defendant's motion to dismiss the first cause of action to the extent it is based on a violation of 26 U.S.C. section 7491(c). Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 7/12/10. (lmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scharringhausen v. The United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?