Grimes v. Tilton et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv02309
Filed: December 28, 2006
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
Presiding Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Referring Judge: Leo S. Papas
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 26, 2011 177 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 169 Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Defendants Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Plaintiff's Rluipa claims is Granted. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 9/26/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ecs)
September 6, 2011 176 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Defendants' 169 Motion for Judgment as to Plaintiff's First Amended Claims on qualified immunity grounds. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 9/6/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ecs)(jrd)
July 12, 2010 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Dissolving Stay and Issuing Briefing Schedule. Supplemental briefing due by 8/28/10; Plaintiff's Opposition or Notice of Non-Opposition is due by 9/17/10. The Court will then take the matter under submission and will issue its written opinion soon thereafter. Thus, unless otherwise ordered, no appearances are required and no oral argument will be heard. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 7/12/10.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(vet)
March 12, 2009 149 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part Defendants' 129 Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.56. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 3/11/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(vet) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grimes v. Tilton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?