Snipes v. Tilton

Petitioner: Ben Alan Snipes
Respondent: James E Tilton
Case Number: 3:2006cv02531
Filed: April 18, 2007
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 25, 2011 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 56 , and Denying Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; the Petitioner's objections to the Report and Recommendation are overruled; the Certificate of Appealability is denied; Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 2/25/11.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)
April 30, 2007 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER requiring response to petition (2254); motion to dismiss due 6/5/07; opposition to motion due 7/1/07, or Answer due 6/20/07, Traverse due 7/20/2007; Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 4/25/07. (kaj)
April 25, 2007 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER requiring response to petition (2254); motion to dismiss due 6/5/07, opposition to motion due 7/1/07; or answer due 6/20/2007, Traverse due 7/20/2007; Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 4/25/07. (kaj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snipes v. Tilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ben Alan Snipes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James E Tilton
Represented By: Bradley Allen Weinreb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?