United States of America v. Lang et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv02648
Filed: December 4, 2006
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Referring Judge: Leo S. Papas
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401 IRS: Tax Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 28, 2012 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 152 Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 2/28/12. (ecs) (jrl).
January 3, 2011 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 119 Motion for Payment of Homestead Claim. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 1/3/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lmt)
May 10, 2010 102 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER granting 96 Motion to reopen discovery re: the validity of a secured interest of National Property Trust (NPT) in the Foreclosed Property. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 5/10/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl)
December 9, 2009 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 94 United States' Motion for Confirmation of Sale 94 . Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 12/9/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl) (jrl).
September 29, 2009 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 90 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 9/29/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl) (jrl).
September 2, 2008 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 83 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 83 Motion to Stay order of foreclosure pending appeal. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 9/2/08. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl)
February 1, 2008 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Leo S. Papas on 2/1/08. Mr. Langs request to extend he deadline for completion of discovery and the deadline for filing motions is granted.The February 29, 2008, motion filing deadline is vacated and reset for April 15, 2008. All motions, other than motions to amend or join parties, or otions in limine, shall be filed on or before April 15, 2008.(tkl) (av1, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Lang et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?