Luna Gaming - San Diego LLC v. Dorsey & Whitney, LLP et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv02804
Filed: December 28, 2006
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
Referring Judge: William McCurine
Presiding Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 19, 2010 288 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 287 joint Motion to Continue the deadline for submitting the final pre-trial order, the pre-trial conference, and the trial date. The trial date, currently scheduled for February 16, 2010, is VACATED. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 1/19/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl)
January 15, 2010 286 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 284 request for one-day extension. Dorsey must still submit the list and exhibits to Plaintiff's counsel by January 18, 2010 at 5:00 p.m. via e-mail or other convenient means, but it may submit the documents to the Court on January 19, 2010. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 1/15/2010. (All non- registered users served via U.S. Mail Service). Modified on 1/15/2010 (tkl)(jrl).
January 13, 2010 283 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The Court SUSTAINS in part and OVERRULES in part Dorsey's Objections to the Magistrate Judge's June 3, 2009 Order Regarding Inadvertent Disclosure 180 . Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 1/13/2010.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl) (jrl).
January 11, 2010 281 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: Plaintiff's Motion In Limine to Preclude Privileged Communications. Granting in part and denying in part 226 Motion in Limine. A Pre-trial Conference is set for January 25, 2010 at 2:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 1/11/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(vet) (jrl).
January 6, 2010 279 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 265 Motion for Relief from Local Rule 7.1(1)(2) and for Leave to File Motion for Limited Reconsideration Based on New Evidence Improperly Withheld by Defendant Dorsey & Whitney, LLP. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 1/5/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(vet) (jrl).
April 17, 2009 157 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: Civil Subpoenas Served on Third Parties for Deposition Testimony. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 4/17/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(vet)(jrl).
March 6, 2009 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part Defendants' 76 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 3/6/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(vet) Modified on 3/6/2009 - To note that no clerk's judgment was prepared per Chambers (vet).(jrl).
January 27, 2009 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part Defendant's Request for Fees and Costs. This Court finds no grounds to order plaintiff's and/or plaintiff's counsel to pay Defendant and defense counsel $14,463 in fees and expenses. However, Plaintiff is ordered to forthwith pay the amount of the $1,263 to Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 1/27/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(vet)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luna Gaming - San Diego LLC v. Dorsey & Whitney, LLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?