Lomack v. Scribner

Petitioner: Kevin Lomack
Respondent: L E Scribner
Case Number: 3:2007cv00017
Filed: January 3, 2007
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Imperial
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Referring Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 20, 2009 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 28 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. Petitioner has not made a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right as required by 28 USC §2253(c)(2). The court therefore declines to issue a certificate of appealability. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 2/20/2009. (cc: US Court of Appeals). (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service). (akr)
January 5, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 23 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and Denying Petition: The Report and Recommendation is ADOPTED, Petitioners objections are OVERRULED, and the Petition is DENIED. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 1/5/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(mjj)
January 11, 2007 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER requiring response to petition Signed by Judge Nita L. Stormes on 1/11/07. Rspondent shall file a motion to dismiss no later than 2/26/07. If respondent files a motion to dismiss, Petitioner shall file his opposition to motion no later than 3/19/07. Respondent shall not file a reply to the opposition to dismiss. Answer to the petition is due no later than 3/12/07. Petitioner may file a traverse no later than 4/6/07.(av1, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lomack v. Scribner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: L E Scribner
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kevin Lomack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?