Bryant v. Ochoa et al

Plaintiff: Stanford P Bryant
Defendant: J Mudra, G J Janda, Tim Ochoa, Stuart J Ryan, R Hopper, B C Ries, D R Gonzales, M Jimenez, E Best, S Brown, H Mangum, G D Stanford, M McNair, J Bastida, J E Olivarez, K Williams, -, J Carnes, R Harmon, Romero, M Barra, K Raske and John Does 1 - 20
Case Number: 3:2007cv00200
Filed: April 17, 2007
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Imperial
Referring Judge: Peter C. Lewis
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 1, 2011 216 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 215 Motion to Alter or Amend the Judgment. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 1/28/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ecl)
January 4, 2011 209 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in its entirety and the court enters judgment in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 1/4/2011.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl)
December 17, 2010 207 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT - the court adopts the Report and Recommendation in its entirety. The Clerk of Court is instructed to enter judgment in favor of Defendants, and against Plaintiff (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl)
May 3, 2010 157 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 155 Plaintiff's Motion for order directing U.S. Marshal to serve summons and second amended complaint on Defendant Best. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis on 5/3/2010. IFP package mailed 5/4/2010 (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl)
July 15, 2009 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 91 Motion to Compel Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis on 7/15/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl)(jrl).
June 22, 2009 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 56 Motion to file supplemental pleading. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 6/22/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl) (jrl).
May 14, 2009 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 104 Motion for sanctions; granting 109 Motion to compel discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis on 5/14/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl) (jrl).
May 7, 2009 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 103 as moot Motion to Compel discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis on 5/7/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl)(jrl).
March 16, 2009 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 80 dft's Motion to Stay as moot; granting dft's ex parte application 85 to withdraw motion to stay proceedings. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 3/16/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl) (jrl).
January 5, 2009 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in its entirety, denies Defendants' Objections and denies Plaintiff's Objections.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 1/5/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl)
April 17, 2007 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, inposing no initial partial filing fee, garishing $350 from prisoner's trust account; denying 4 pla's motion for TRO without prejudice; and directing U.S. Marshal to effect service of summons and cmp pursuant to FRCP 4(c)(2)and 28 USC 1915(d). Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 4/17/07; (IFP package mailed) (tkl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryant v. Ochoa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Mudra
Represented By: Susan E Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G J Janda
Represented By: Susan E Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Ochoa
Represented By: Susan E Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart J Ryan
Represented By: Susan E Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Hopper
Represented By: Susan E Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B C Ries
Represented By: Susan E Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D R Gonzales
Represented By: Susan E Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Jimenez
Represented By: Susan E Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E Best
Represented By: Susan E Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Brown
Represented By: Susan E Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H Mangum
Represented By: Susan E Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G D Stanford
Represented By: Susan E Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M McNair
Represented By: Susan E Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Bastida
Represented By: Susan E Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J E Olivarez
Represented By: Susan E Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K Williams, -
Represented By: Susan E Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Carnes
Represented By: Susan E Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Harmon
Represented By: Susan E Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Romero
Represented By: Susan E Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Barra
Represented By: Susan E Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K Raske
Represented By: Susan E Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1 - 20
Represented By: Susan E Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanford P Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?