Thorns v. Ryan et al

Plaintiff: Bruce Thorns
Defendant: R.N. Nelson, Jr., T.E. Brown, J.J. Jimenez, G Trujillo, M E Ruan, Mr. Kelly, S Brown, R A Davis, B.C. Reis, T Ochoa, G Janda, S D Leapheart, S Ryan, Mr. Whitmans, W.O. Connell, A Casillas, T. Rivas, S Ritter, S. Crittendon, R Harmon, Z. Lemas, A. Elizondo, M Ramirez, R.M. Alvarez, F. Kellerman and F.A. Williams
Case Number: 3:2007cv00218
Filed: March 29, 2007
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Presiding Judge: Marilyn L. Huff
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2010 168 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re 167 Plaintiff's Request for Transcripts. The Court denies Plaintiff's request for transcripts at this time, as there is no substantial question for appeal. In lieu of transcripts, the Court directs the Clerk to provide Plaintiff with a copy of the recorded proceedings before the Court in a CD format. Additionally, the Court notes that Defendants on appeal may provide relevant portions of transcripts to the Ninth Circuit. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 9/30/2010. (USCA Case No. 10-55495. Order electronically transmitted to US Court of Appeals. Copy of Order and CD sent in the same mailing to Plaintiff. All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (akr)
February 23, 2010 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding Plaintiff's Exhibits. The Court held a Status hearing on 02/22/2010. A Trial in this case is set for 2/23/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 13 before Judge Marilyn L. Huff. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 2/23/10.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao) (jrl).
September 28, 2009 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 86 Motion to Dismiss. Defendants' motion to dismiss Plaintiff's request for injunctive relief is granted. The Court orders Defendants OConnell, Casillas, Borem and Whitman to file their Answer to the remaining claims remaining in Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint within thirty (30) days of this Order. If Plaintiff has any additional facts on any of the dismissed claims, he may file a motion for reconsideration, submitting new facts or new law, within thirty (30) days of this Order. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 09/28/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(ag) (jrl).
January 23, 2009 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and Granting in Part and Denying in Part 62 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. The Court sua sponte dismisses with leave to amend. Plaintiff shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file a second amended complaint. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 01/23/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(ag)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thorns v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.N. Nelson, Jr.
Represented By: John F Bazan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T.E. Brown
Represented By: John F Bazan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.J. Jimenez
Represented By: John F Bazan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G Trujillo
Represented By: John F Bazan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M E Ruan
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Kelly
Represented By: John F Bazan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Brown
Represented By: John F Bazan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R A Davis
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B.C. Reis
Represented By: John F Bazan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Ochoa
Represented By: John F Bazan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G Janda
Represented By: John F Bazan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S D Leapheart
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Ryan
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Whitmans
Represented By: John F Bazan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W.O. Connell
Represented By: John F Bazan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Casillas
Represented By: John F Bazan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Rivas
Represented By: John F Bazan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Ritter
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Crittendon
Represented By: John F Bazan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Harmon
Represented By: John F Bazan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Z. Lemas
Represented By: John F Bazan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Elizondo
Represented By: John F Bazan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Ramirez
Represented By: John F Bazan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.M. Alvarez
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Kellerman
Represented By: John F Bazan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F.A. Williams
Represented By: John F Bazan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Thorns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?