United States of America v. Distribuidora Batiz, S.A. De C.V. et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Greenver, S.A. de C.V., Distribuidora Batiz, S.A. De C.V., Grupo Batiz CGH, S.A. de C.V., Invernaderos La Pequena Joya, S.A. De C.V., Pedro Batiz Guillen, Silvia Del Carmen Batiz Esquer, Rodolfo Batiz Guillen, Raul Batiz Echavarria, Raul Guillermo Batiz Guillen, Raul Guillermo Batiz Gamboa, Ricardo Batiz Gamboa, Olga Elena Batiz Esquer, Jorge Guillermo Batiz Guillen, Jorge Guillermo Batiz Esquer, Gabriela Maria Batiz Gamboa, Angela Maria Batiz Gamboa and Gerardo Batiz Esquer
Case Number: 3:2007cv00370
Filed: February 27, 2007
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
0 Judge:
Referring Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Default of Promissory Note
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 21, 2011 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: It is hereby ordered that the 97 Motion to Dismiss is hereby denied. It is further ordered that Plaintiff shall file a status report within 10 days following Plaintiff's receipt of the response of the Mexican Central Authority regardin g Plaintiff's latest request for service as to certain Defendants. No later than 90 days from the date of this Order, if no response has been received from the Mexican Central Authority as to five defendants, Plaintiff shall file a status report. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 4/20/2011. (leh)
November 3, 2010 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 93 Motion for Specially Authorized Service and 94 Motion for Issuance of an Amended Summons. Plaintiff is authorized to serve the thirteen unserved Defendants via certified mail directed to their counsel of record, Robert Ted Parker. No later than ninety (90) days from the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff shall file a Status report regarding Plaintiff's efforts to serve the unserved Defendants. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 11/3/10. (lao)
August 10, 2009 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Motion to Withdraw the Motion for Default Judgment as to Thirteen of Fourteen Defendants (Doc. 66 ) is granted. The Motion for Default Judgment (Doc. 59 ) is granted as to Defendant Pedro Batiz Guillen only. Plaintiff is awarded $4, 071,840.82 plus additional interest which has accrued at the contractual default rate since 3/20/2009. Plaintiff shall file a proposed judgment in accordance with this Order within 15 days of the date of this Order. The Motion to Set Aside Clerk' ;s Default and Dismiss Action as to Moving Defendants (Doc. 61 ) is granted in part and denied in part. The entry of default (Doc. 56 ) shall be set aside as to the following Defendants: Distribuidora Batiz; Grupo Batiz CGH, S.A. de C.V.; Greenver, S.A. de C.V.; Invernaderos la Pequena Jolla, S.A. de C.V.; Silvia del Carmen Batiz Esquer; Raul Guillermo Batiz Guillen; Raul Guillermo Batiz Gamboa; Olga Elena Batiz Esquer; Jorge Guillermo Batiz Guillen; Jorge Guillermo Batiz Esquer; Gabriela Mari a Batiz Gamboa; Angela Maria Batiz Gamboa; and Gerardo Batiz Esquer. Service upon these Defendants is quashed. The Motion for Limited Early Discovery (Doc. 67 ) is denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 8/10/2009. (mdc) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Distribuidora Batiz, S.A. De C.V. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenver, S.A. de C.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Distribuidora Batiz, S.A. De C.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grupo Batiz CGH, S.A. de C.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Invernaderos La Pequena Joya, S.A. De C.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pedro Batiz Guillen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silvia Del Carmen Batiz Esquer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodolfo Batiz Guillen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raul Batiz Echavarria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raul Guillermo Batiz Guillen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raul Guillermo Batiz Gamboa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricardo Batiz Gamboa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olga Elena Batiz Esquer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge Guillermo Batiz Guillen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge Guillermo Batiz Esquer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriela Maria Batiz Gamboa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Maria Batiz Gamboa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerardo Batiz Esquer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?